Arnold v. Buck, et al

Plaintiff: William Arnold
Defendant: David Buck and Jeffrey Selander
Case Number: 3:2011cv01343
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on August 2, 2013. (Butler, Ayanna)
November 5, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Order; denying 63 Motion to Compel; and granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on November 5, 2012. (Butler, Ayanna)
August 30, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time ; denying 46 Motion Reimbursement; denying 47 Motion to Strike; and granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on August 30, 2012. (Butler, Ayanna)
July 11, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion Reimbursement. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on July 11, 2012. (Butler, Ayanna)
July 9, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion Non Suit; denying as moot 25 Motion Non Suit; denying 26 Motion to Strike; denying 27 Motion for Leave to File; and denying 28 Motion to Amend/Correct. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on July 9, 2012. (Butler, Ayanna)
March 1, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Amend/Correct. See attached memorandum of decision. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on March 1, 2012. (Butler, Ayanna)
November 18, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court PRISCS-INITIAL REVIEW ORDER, Answer deadline updated for David Buck to 1/30/2012; Jeffrey Selander to 1/30/2012., ( Discovery due by 6/18/2012, Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2012). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/17/2011. (Payton, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Buck, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Selander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?