Gomez v. Moore et al

Plaintiff: Rick Gomez
Defendant: Metropolitan District, Michael Jefferson and Robert Moore
Case Number: 3:2011cv01934
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Tolland
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendant's Motion 99 for Reconsideration re Order 95 on Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/18/2014. (Morril, Gregory)
March 27, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendant's Motion 63 for Summary Judgment is GRANTED on Counts One and Four, the discriminatory discharge claim in Count Two, and the retaliatory failure to rehire claims in Counts Three and Five; and it is DENIED on the retaliatory discharge claims in Counts Two, Three and Five. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/27/2014. (Morril, Gregory)
November 27, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion for Reconsideration of the Substituted Ruling 70 on Objections to the June 10, 2013 Discovery Ruling. Defendant is ORDERED to produce documents responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 8 and 10 by December 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/27/13. (Morril, Gregory)
June 10, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON DISCOVERY ISSUES. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/10/2013.(Rodko, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Gomez
Represented By: Francis A. Miniter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?