Carney v. Beracha et al
Plaintiff: John J. Carney
Defendant: Sunny Services Corp., Hermitage Consultants Inc., Fractal Factoring Fund, La Signoria Assets Corp., Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., 4A Star Corp., Bradleyville Ltd., East Coast Consultant Corp., Dobson Management Corp., Fractal Factoring II, Rowberrow Trading Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Moris Beracha and Brave Spirit Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00180
Filed: February 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2016 Filing 177 DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of John J. Carney, in his capacity as court-appointed receiver against Hermitage Consultants Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/16.(Gould, K.)
July 29, 2016 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gould, K.)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #174 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/22/2016: IT IS ORDERED THAT Hermitage is liable to the Receiver for the principal sum of $14,060,842, plus prejudgment interest of $4,269,483.59; the Receiver is hereby awarded a total judgment of $18,330,325.59. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment for the Receiver in such amount. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case.(Pollack, R.)
May 19, 2016 Filing 175 Memorandum in Support re #174 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hermitage Consultants Inc. filed by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
May 19, 2016 Filing 174 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hermitage Consultants Inc. by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. New, #2 Exhibit A. Receiver's First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B. Documentation obtained by the Receiver, #4 Exhibit C. Documentation obtained by the Receiver, #5 Exhibit D. Affirmation of Service of Ana Cristina Arosemena Benedetti, #6 Exhibit E. Newspaper publications, #7 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #172 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 5/19/2016. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2016. (Jaiman, R.)
April 12, 2016 Filing 172 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Hermitage Consultants Inc. by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan B. New, #2 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
January 14, 2016 Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letters Rogatory, Amended Complaint, the Order on Pretrial Deadlines, The Electronic Filing Order, Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Parties and the Amended Summons served on Hermitage Consultants Inc., filed by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
July 22, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party East Coast Consultant Corp. Without Prejudice by John J. Carney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
July 22, 2015 Filing 169 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Dobson Management Corp. With Prejudice by John J. Carney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #167 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/4/2015. (Pollack, R.)
January 30, 2015 Filing 167 MOTION for Ross H. Garber of Shipman & Goodwin LLP to Withdraw as Attorney Nunc Pro Tunc by Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd.. (Garber, Ross)
January 12, 2015 Filing 166 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/12/2015. Total Time: 0 hours and 5 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
January 9, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 1/13/15. Telephone Status Conference set for 1/12/2015 11:00 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel shall place a call to chambers, 203.579.5506, with all necessary parties on the line.(Pollack, R.)
January 6, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2015 11:00 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel shall place a call to chambers, 203.579.5506, with all necessary parties on the line. (Pollack, R.)
December 5, 2014 Filing 163 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Report to the Court on the Status of Service of Process on Remaining Defendants by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
November 21, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (Status Report due by 12/5/2014) Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2014.(Jaiman, R.)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re #159 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by John J. Carney. Stipulation of dismissal approved and so ordered. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/2/2014.(Martin, M.)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Stipulation of Dismissal of Moris Beracha, 4A Star Corp., Rowberrow Trading Corp., Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L. Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern Internat ional Ltd., Brave Spirit Ltd., and Bradleyville, Ltd. filed by John J. Carney Signed by Clerk on 8/27/2014. (Oliver, T.)
August 26, 2014 Filing 159 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Moris Beracha, 4A Star Corp., Rowberrow Trading Corp., Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L. Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International Ltd., Brave Spirit Ltd., and Bradleyville, Ltd. by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Extension of Time until August 11, 2014 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #77 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/14/2014. (Martin, M.)
July 11, 2014 Filing 157 Third MOTION for Extension of Time until August 11, 2014 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #77 Amended Complaint by 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Bradleyville Ltd., Brave Spirit Ltd., Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Spears, Brian)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/13/2014. (Martin, M.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 155 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 11, 2014 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #77 Amended Complaint by 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Bradleyville Ltd., Brave Spirit Ltd., Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Spears, Brian)
May 14, 2014 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #150 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam S. Kaufmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3231026) by Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd.. (Spears, Brian)
May 14, 2014 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #149 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric L. Lewis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3230879) by Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd.. (Spears, Brian)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Attorney Adam S. Kaufmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam S. Kaufmann for Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd. added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/30/2014. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2014. (Oliver, T.)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #149 Motion for Attorney Eric L. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/30/2014. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 30, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam S. Kaufmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3231026) by Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spears, Brian)
April 30, 2014 Filing 149 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric L. Lewis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3230879) by Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spears, Brian)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Eric L. Lewis for Fractal Fund Management Ltd.,Eric L. Lewis for Fractal L Holding Ltd.,Eric L. Lewis for Fractal P Holding Ltd.. Attorney Marcelo M. Blackburn and Michael P. Socarras terminated; granting #146 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Eric L. Lewis for Fractal Fund Management Ltd.,Eric L. Lewis for Fractal L Holding Ltd.,Eric L. Lewis for Fractal P Holding Ltd.. Attorney Marcelo M. Blackburn and Michael P. Socarras terminated; granting #147 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Eric L. Lewis for Fractal Fund Management Ltd.,Eric L. Lewis for Fractal L Holding Ltd.,Eric L. Lewis for Fractal P Holding Ltd.. Attorney Marcelo M. Blackburn and Michael P. Socarras terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/29/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
April 25, 2014 Filing 147 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Eric L. Lewis by Fractal P Holding Ltd.. (Spears, Brian)
April 25, 2014 Filing 146 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Eric L. Lewis by Fractal L Holding Ltd.. (Spears, Brian)
April 25, 2014 Filing 145 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Eric L. Lewis by Fractal Fund Management Ltd.. (Spears, Brian)
April 25, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd. (Spears, Brian)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Extension of Time to 6/11/14 to respond to #77 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/25/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
April 24, 2014 Filing 142 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 11, 2014 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the First #77 Amended Complaint of John J. Carney by Bradleyville Ltd.. (Hellman, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/25/2014 TO LINK TO DOC #77 (Oliver, T.).
April 4, 2014 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, First Amended Complaint et al. served on Bradleyville Limited on 3/20/2014, filed by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Motion for Extension of Time until June 11, 2014 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First #77 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/11/2014. (Martin, M.)
March 11, 2014 Answer deadline updated for 4A Star Corp. to 6/11/2014; Moris Beracha to 6/11/2014; Brave Spirit Ltd. to 6/11/2014; Fractal Fund Management Ltd. to 6/11/2014; Fractal L Holding Ltd. to 6/11/2014; Fractal P Holding Ltd. to 6/11/2014; La Signoria Assets Corp. to 6/11/2014; Netvalue Strategy, S.A. to 6/11/2014; Northwestern International, Ltd. to 6/11/2014; Rowberrow Trading Corp. to 6/11/2014. (Martin, M.)
March 7, 2014 Filing 139 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 11, 2014 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First #77 Amended Complaint by 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Spears, Brian) Modified on 3/10/2014 TO LINK TO DOC #77 (Oliver, T.).
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina H. Tsesmelis terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/12/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying #63 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Relief from the Anti-Suit Injunction; denying without prejudice #74 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/10/2014. (Martin, M.)
February 6, 2014 Filing 136 MOTION for Christina H. Tsesmelis, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
July 30, 2013 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #123 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric L. Lewis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2946253) by 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Lewis, Eric)
July 30, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L. Lewis on behalf of 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Lewis, Eric)
July 30, 2013 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #122 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam S. Kaufmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2946244) by 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Kaufmann, Adam)
July 30, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Kaufmann on behalf of 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Kaufmann, Adam)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ross H. Garber and Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/30/13. (Sbalbi, B.)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying as moot #124 Motion to Substitute Attorney; denying as moot #125 Motion to Substitute Attorney; Approving #126 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/29/13. (Sbalbi, B.)
July 24, 2013 Filing 129 MOTION for Ross H. Garber and Sara J. Goldfarb to Withdraw as Attorney by Moris Beracha, Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Garber, Ross)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #123 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorny Eric L. Lewis Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/21/2013. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2013. (Payton, R.)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam S. Kaufmann Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/21/2013. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2013. (Payton, R.)
July 22, 2013 Filing 126 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Eric L. Lewis by Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Spears, Brian)
July 22, 2013 Filing 125 Amended MOTION to Substitute Attorney Eric L. Lewis by Northwestern International, Ltd.. (Spears, Brian)
July 22, 2013 Filing 124 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Moris Beracha. (Spears, Brian)
July 22, 2013 Filing 123 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric L. Lewis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2946253) by 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spears, Brian)
July 22, 2013 Filing 122 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam S. Kaufmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2946244) by 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spears, Brian)
July 22, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J Buchok on behalf of 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Buchok, Nathan)
July 22, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of 4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Brave Spirit Ltd., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Spears, Brian)
June 3, 2013 Filing 119 Letter from Robertson D. Beckerlegge Dated 04/10/2013 Re: Santiago Javier Montilla Gonzales v. Panamerics Ventures (SL) (Martin, M.)
April 17, 2013 Filing 118 Notice of Additional Authority re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction filed by Moris Beracha. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Socarras, Michael)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney LeeAnn O'Neill terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/7/13. (Sbalbi, B.)
February 21, 2013 Filing 116 Notice of Additional Authority re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction filed by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Michael P. Socarras, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Socarras, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION for LeeAnn O'Neill to Withdraw as Attorney by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (O'Neill, LeeAnn)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #111 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/29/13. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sbalbi, B.)
January 25, 2013 Filing 113 Memorandum in Opposition re #111 Third MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Defendants Located in Panama filed by Northwestern International, Ltd.. (Socarras, Michael)
January 25, 2013 Filing 112 Memorandum in Opposition re #111 Third MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Defendants Located in Panama filed by Northwestern International, Ltd.. (Blackburn, Marcelo)
January 24, 2013 Filing 111 Third MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Defendants Located in Panama by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
January 2, 2013 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. Held on 11/20/12 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2013. (Catucci, S.)
December 14, 2012 Filing 109 Letter from Ross H. Garber, Dated 12/11/2012 Re: Carney v. Beracha et al., 3:12-cv-00180 (SRU) (Martin, M.)
November 20, 2012 Filing 108 AMENDED Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2012 re #63 MOTION to Dismiss, #74 MOTION to Dismiss. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill taking under advisement #63 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; taking under advisement #74 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
November 20, 2012 Filing 107 ENTERED IN ERROR. Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2012 re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction, #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill taking under advisement #63 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; taking under advisement #74 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Total Time: 1 hour and 30 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 12/14/2012 to delete reference to denying in part (Sbalbi, B.).
November 2, 2012 Filing 106 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 10/31/2012 Rescheduled Hearing set for 11/20/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Martin, M.)
October 25, 2012 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction (Sur-Sur-Reply) filed by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Socarras, Michael)
October 16, 2012 Filing 104 Memorandum in Opposition in Further Opposition to Defendants Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management, LTD., Fractal L Holding, LTD, Fractal P Holding LTD., Northwestern International, LTD., Rowberrow Trading Corp., and Bradleyville LTD.'s Motions to Dismiss and for Relief form Anti Suit Injunction re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction, #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; With Certificates of Service, Filed filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss)(New, Jonathan)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply. The sur-reply brief shall be limited to 10 pages and shall be filed by October 16, 2012. A sur-sur-reply brief of up to 10 pages may be filed on or before October 25, 2012. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/9/12. (Sbalbi, B.)
September 28, 2012 Filing 102 Memorandum in Opposition re #101 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Defendants Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management, LTD., Fractal L Holding, LTD., Fractal P Holding LTD., Northwestern International, LTD., Rowberrow Trading Corp., and Bradleyville LTD.'s Replies to the filed by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Goldfarb, Sara)
September 24, 2012 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Defendants Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management, LTD., Fractal L Holding, LTD., Fractal P Holding LTD., Northwestern International, LTD., Rowberrow Trading Corp., and Bradleyville LTD.'s Replies to the Receiver's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss and for Relief from Anti-Suit Injunction by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert D. Beckerlegge in Support of Receiver's Motion for Permission to File a Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
September 21, 2012 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction filed by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jesus Escudero, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Francisco Illarramendi)(Garber, Ross)
September 21, 2012 Filing 99 Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; With Certificates of Service, Filed -- Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support -- filed by Bradleyville Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-Declaration of Richard Gareth Evans with Ex. A, #2 Exhibit 4-Reply Declaration of Luis Otero with Ex. A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cotton, Howard)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/21/12 to File Response/Reply re #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/23/12. (Sbalbi, B.)
August 22, 2012 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcelo M. Blackburn on behalf of Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Blackburn, Marcelo)
August 17, 2012 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction, #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; With Certificates of Service, Filed until 9/21/2012 by Bradleyville Ltd.. (Gordon, Michael)
August 16, 2012 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #93 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marcelo M. Blackburn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2595110)MOTION for Attorney(s) Marcelo M. Blackburn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2595110) by Moris Beracha. (Goldfarb, Sara)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Attorney Marcelo M. Blackburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/14/2012. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2012. (Oliver, T.)
August 14, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marcelo M. Blackburn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2595110) by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Blackburn Affidavit)(Garber, Ross)
August 10, 2012 Filing 92 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2012 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Hungerford, A.)
July 27, 2012 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John J. Carney re #87 Affidavit,,,,,,,, #88 Affidavit, #89 Affidavit, #86 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #90 Affidavit (New, Jonathan)
July 27, 2012 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT re #86 Memorandum in Opposition to #63 Motion to Dismiss, #74 Motion to Dismiss. Signed By Di Cong Jiang filed by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan) Modified on 7/31/2012 TO LINK TO DOC #63 AND #74 (Oliver, T.).
July 27, 2012 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT re #86 Memorandum in Opposition to to #63 Motion to Dismiss, #74 Motion to Dismiss. Signed By Hernando Diaz-Candia filed by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan) Modified on 7/31/2012 TO LINK TO DOC #63 AND #74 (Oliver, T.).
July 27, 2012 Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT re #86 Memorandum in Opposition to #63 Motion to Dismiss, #74 Motion to Dismiss. Signed By Seamus Ronald Andrew filed by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan) Modified on 7/31/2012 TO LINK TO DOC #63 AND #74 (Oliver, T.).
July 27, 2012 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT re #86 Memorandum in Opposition to #63 Motion to Dismiss, #74 Motion to Dismiss Signed By Jonathan B. New filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #4 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #5 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #6 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #7 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #8 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #9 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #10 Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #11 Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #12 Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #13 Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #14 Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #15 Exhibit 15 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #16 Exhibit 16 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #17 Exhibit 17 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #18 Exhibit 18 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #19 Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #20 Exhibit 20 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #21 Exhibit 21 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #22 Exhibit 22 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #23 Exhibit 23 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #24 Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #25 Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #26 Exhibit 26 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #27 Exhibit 27 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #28 Exhibit 28 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #29 Exhibit 29 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #30 Exhibit 30 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #31 Exhibit 31 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #32 Exhibit 32 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #33 Exhibit 33 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #34 Exhibit 34 to the Declaration of Jonathan New, #35 Exhibit 35 to the Declaration of Jonathan New)(New, Jonathan) Modified on 7/31/2012 TO LINK TO DOC #63 AND #74 (Oliver, T.).
July 27, 2012 Filing 86 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Morris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management, Ltd., Fractal L Holding, Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp., and Bradleyville Ltd.'s Motions to Dismiss and For Relief From Antisuit Injunction re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction, #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; With Certificates of Service, Filed filed by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER issuing Letters of Request for Service Abroad re #81 Second MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for defendants located in Panama. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/25/12. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sbalbi, B.)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/25/12. (Sbalbi, B.)
July 24, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE by Bradleyville Ltd. re 58 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,,,, of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing for Michael S. Gordon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Michael S. Gordon)(Hellman, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE by Bradleyville Ltd. re 58 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,,,, of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing for Howard E. Cotton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Howard E. Cotton)(Hellman, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2012 Filing 81 Second MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Under the Inter-American Convention on Letters Rogatory and Additional Protocol with Annex and Rules 4(F)(1) and 4(H)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure For an Order Issuing Letters of Request for Service Abroad of Judicial or Extrajudicial Documents on Defendants in Panama by John J. Carney. (New, Jonathan)
July 5, 2012 Filing 80 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *4A Star Corp., Dobson Management Corp., East Coast Consultant Corp., Hermitage Consultants Inc., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan B. New* *Baker & Hostetler LLP - NY* *45 Rockefeller Plaza* *New York, NY 10111*. (Oliver, T.)
July 3, 2012 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 4A Star Corp., Dobson Management Corp., East Coast Consultant Corp., Hermitage Consultants Inc., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A.. (New, Jonathan)
June 14, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 9/19/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Hungerford, A.)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SCHEDULING ORDER: Per the parties' stipulation, the opposition to docs. #63 and #74 will be due July 27, 2012. The defendants' reply will be due August 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/13/12. (Hungerford, A.)
June 11, 2012 Filing 77 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service of the Amended Complaint)(New, Jonathan)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/11/12. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 29, 2012 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #57 MOTION for Attorney(s) Amy Vanderwahl to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2494498) by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
May 24, 2012 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; With Certificates of Service, Filed by Bradleyville Ltd..Responses due by 6/14/2012 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Otero Declaration with Exs. A, B and C, #3 Exhibit 2- Gordon Declaration with Exs. A, B, C and D)(Gordon, Michael)
May 24, 2012 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement , Filed by Bradleyville Ltd.. (Gordon, Michael)
May 24, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Gordon on behalf of Bradleyville Ltd. ; With Certificate of Service, Filed By (Gordon, Michael)
May 24, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard E. Cotton on behalf of Bradleyville Ltd. ;With Certificate of Service, Filed By (Cotton, Howard)
May 23, 2012 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sunny Services Corp. re #67 Certificate of Good Standing, (Riccardulli, Stephen)
May 23, 2012 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sunny Services Corp. re #66 Certificate of Good Standing, (Riccardulli, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Goldfarb, Sara)
May 21, 2012 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark W. Pearlstein and Jennifer Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2479211)MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark W. Pearlstein and Jennifer Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2479211) by Sunny Services Corp.. (Riccardulli, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark W. Pearlstein and Jennifer Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2479211)MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark W. Pearlstein and Jennifer Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2479211) by Sunny Services Corp.. (Riccardulli, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northwestern International, Ltd.. (Goldfarb, Sara)
May 21, 2012 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fractal P Holding Ltd.. (Goldfarb, Sara)
May 21, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp..Responses due by 6/11/2012 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Moris Beracha Fractal Fund Management, LTD., Fractal L Holding, LTD., Fractal P Holding, LTD., Northwestern International, LTD., and Rowberrow Trading Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss and for Relief from Antisuit Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Goldfarb, Sara)
May 21, 2012 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fractal L Holding Ltd.. (Goldfarb, Sara)
May 21, 2012 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fractal Fund Management Ltd.. (Goldfarb, Sara)
May 21, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Ann O'Neill on behalf of Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (O'Neill, Lee Ann)
May 21, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Socarras on behalf of Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Socarras, Michael)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Howard E. Cotton to Appear pro hac vice; granting #56 Motion for Micheal S. Gordon to Appear pro hac vice; granting #57 Motion for Amy E. Vanderwahl to Appear pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/9/2012. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2012. (Lewis, D)
May 9, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION for Attorney(s) Amy Vanderwal to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2494498) by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona) Modified on 5/10/2012 to correct spelling of the name. (Grady, B.).
May 9, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael S. Gordon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2494113) by Bradleyville Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hellman, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2012 Filing 55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Howard E. Cotton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2494096) by Bradleyville Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hellman, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #48 Motion to amend briefing schedule. Jurisdictional motions shall be due 5/24/12, opposition by 6/28/12, replies by 7/19/12. Page limit on memorandum of law and replies shall be 50 pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/7/12. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 4, 2012 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Socarras, LeeAnn O'Neill to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2488725) by Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Goldfarb, Sara)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Michael Soccarras and Lee Ann O'Neill to Appear pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/3/2012. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2012. (Lewis, D)
May 3, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Socarras, LeeAnn O'Neill to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2488725) by Moris Beracha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Garber, Ross)
May 2, 2012 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bradleyville Ltd. re #45 Notice of Appearance (Hellman, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #42 Motion Jennifer Taylor and Mark W. Pearlstein to Appear pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/29/2012. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2012. (Lewis, D)
April 27, 2012 Answer deadline updated for Sunny Services Corp. to 6/30/2012. (Fazekas, J.)
April 27, 2012 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 24, 2012 Initial Schedule and for Approval of Consensual Briefing Schedule by Moris Beracha, Bradleyville Ltd., Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp.. (Garber, Ross)
April 27, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb on behalf of Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Goldfarb, Sara)
April 27, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross H. Garber on behalf of Moris Beracha, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp. (Garber, Ross)
April 27, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Hellman on behalf of Bradleyville Ltd. (Hellman, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time #43 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2012 for Sunny Services to Answer the Complaint, or otherwise plead #1 Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2012. (Fazekas, J.)
April 26, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2012 for Sunny Services to Answer the Complaint, or otherwise plead #1 Complaint by Sunny Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Riccardulli, Stephen)
April 25, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark W. Pearlstein and Jennifer Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2479211) by Sunny Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark W. Pearlstein, #2 Affidavit of Jennifer Taylor)(Riccardulli, Stephen)
April 23, 2012 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sunny Services Corp. re #40 Notice of Appearance (Riccardulli, Stephen)
April 23, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Riccardulli on behalf of Sunny Services Corp. (Riccardulli, Stephen)
April 3, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy Fokas on behalf of John J. Carney (Fokas, Jimmy)
April 3, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of John J. Carney (Hirschfield, Marc)
April 3, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Day on behalf of John J. Carney (Day, James)
April 3, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca M. Harker on behalf of John J. Carney (Harker, Francesca)
April 3, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis O. Cohen on behalf of John J. Carney (Cohen, Dennis)
April 3, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina H. Tsesmelis on behalf of John J. Carney (Tsesmelis, Christina)
April 3, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. New on behalf of John J. Carney (New, Jonathan)
April 3, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Barr on behalf of John J. Carney (Barr, Jonathan)
April 3, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Robertson D Beckerlegge on behalf of John J. Carney (Beckerlegge, Robertson)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER issuing Letters of Request for Service Abroad re #11 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Defendants Located in Panama. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/21/12. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 3/21/2012 to indicate Letters Rogatory issued (Sbalbi, B.).
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Jonathan R. Barr,Robertson D Beckerlegge,Dennis O. Cohen,James W. Day,Jimmy Fokas,Francesca M. Harker for John J. Carney added.; granting #24 Motion for Christina H. Tsemelis to Appear pro hac vice, Attorneys Marc E. Hirschfield, Jonathan B. New for John J. Carney added. Signed by Clerk on 3/20/2012. (Lewis, D)
March 19, 2012 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John J. Carney re #25 Certificate of Good Standing, #26 Certificate of Good Standing (Wang, Ona)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/19/12. (Sbalbi, B.)
March 14, 2012 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Barr, Beckerlegge, Cohen, Day, Fokas, Harker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2432518) by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
March 14, 2012 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hirschfield, New, Tsesmelis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2432524) by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
March 13, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hirschfield, New, Tsesmelis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2432524) by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
March 13, 2012 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Barr, Beckerlegge, Cohen, Day, Fokas, Harker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2432518) by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
March 9, 2012 Filing 22 Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
March 8, 2012 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Brave Spirit Ltd. served on 2/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 8, 2012 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Bradleyville Ltd. served on 2/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 8, 2012 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Rowberrow Trading Corp. served on 2/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 8, 2012 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Fractal L Holding Ltd. served on 2/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 8, 2012 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Fractal Fund Management Ltd. served on 2/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 8, 2012 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Fractal P Holding Ltd. served on 2/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 8, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Northwestern International, Ltd. served on 2/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 6, 2012 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Moris Beracha served on 2/22/2012, answer due 3/15/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 5, 2012 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sunny Services Corp. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/29/2012 filed by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
March 5, 2012 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Moris Beracha served on 2/23/2012, answer due 3/15/2012. (Wang, Ona)
March 2, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Defendants Located in Panama by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
February 28, 2012 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Moris Beracha served on 2/22/2012, answer due 3/14/2012. (Wang, Ona)
February 27, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ona Theresa Wang on behalf of John J. Carney (Wang, Ona)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: treating #6 Notice of Related Case as a motion to transfer to Judge Arterton. That motion is denied. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/24/12. (Hungerford, A.)
February 21, 2012 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Order on Pre-Trial Deadlines, Electronic Filing Order, Notice to Counsel, Electronic Summons served on Fractal Advisors LLC by serving Ignacio Dwindt, Secretary authorized to accept service served on Fractal Advisors LLC on 2/13/2012, filed by John J. Carney. (Bieler, Philip)
February 21, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE by John J. Carney Notice of Related Case: Related to 11-cv-78 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
February 6, 2012 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *4A Star Corp., Moris Beracha, Bradleyville Ltd., Brave Spirit Ltd., Dobson Management Corp., East Coast Consultant Corp., Fractal Factoring Fund, Fractal Factoring II, Fractal Fund Management Ltd., Fractal L Holding Ltd., Fractal P Holding Ltd., Hermitage Consultants Inc., La Signoria Assets Corp., Netvalue Strategy, S.A., Northwestern International, Ltd., Rowberrow Trading Corp., Sunny Services Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Philip H. Bieler* *Baker & Hostetler LLP - NY* *45 Rockefeller Plaza* *New York, NY 10111*. (Fazekas, J.)
February 6, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by John J. Carney, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2012. (Fazekas, J.)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/3/2012. (Fazekas, J.)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 5/3/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2012. Discovery due by 8/4/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2012. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2012. (Fazekas, J.)
February 3, 2012 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Malone, P.)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2392164.), filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Bieler, Philip)
February 3, 2012 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Bieler, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carney v. Beracha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Services Corp.
Represented By: Mark W. Pearlstein
Represented By: Stephen J. Riccardulli
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hermitage Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fractal Factoring Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Signoria Assets Corp.
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Nathan J. Buchok
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fractal Fund Management Ltd.
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Represented By: Michael P. Socarras
Represented By: LeeAnn O'Neill
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern International, Ltd.
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Represented By: Michael P. Socarras
Represented By: LeeAnn O'Neill
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Nathan J. Buchok
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fractal P Holding Ltd.
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Represented By: Michael P. Socarras
Represented By: LeeAnn O'Neill
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4A Star Corp.
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Nathan J. Buchok
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradleyville Ltd.
Represented By: Michael S. Gordon
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hellman
Represented By: Howard E. Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Coast Consultant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dobson Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fractal Factoring II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowberrow Trading Corp.
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Represented By: Michael P. Socarras
Represented By: LeeAnn O'Neill
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Nathan J. Buchok
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netvalue Strategy, S.A.
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Nathan J. Buchok
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fractal L Holding Ltd.
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Represented By: Michael P. Socarras
Represented By: LeeAnn O'Neill
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moris Beracha
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Represented By: Michael P. Socarras
Represented By: LeeAnn O'Neill
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Nathan J. Buchok
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Sara Jaclyn Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brave Spirit Ltd.
Represented By: Adam S. Kaufmann
Represented By: Nathan J. Buchok
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Carney
Represented By: Dennis O. Cohen
Represented By: Christina H. Tsesmelis
Represented By: Francesca M. Harker
Represented By: Jonathan R. Barr
Represented By: Jimmy Fokas
Represented By: Robertson D. Beckerlegge
Represented By: Amy E. Vanderwal
Represented By: James W. Day
Represented By: Jonathan B. New
Represented By: Marc E. Hirschfield
Represented By: Philip H. Bieler
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?