Lynch v. Ackley et al

Plaintiff: Todd Lynch
Defendant: Margaret Ackley and City of New London
Case Number: 3:2012cv00537
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New London
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Kravitz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. As set forth herein, the Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ackley 92 and Defendant City of New London 91 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's 103 Motion to File a Supplemental Exhibit is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/24/14. (Khan, J)
December 19, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' 81 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/19/2013. (Best, Z)
December 14, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 33 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/13/2012. (Lake, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Ackley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Lynch
Represented By: Christine S. Synodi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Ackley
Represented By: Johanna G. Zelman
Represented By: Michael J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New London
Represented By: Michael J. Rose
Represented By: Johanna G. Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?