Back9 Network, Inc. v. Altounian et al
Plaintiff: Back9 Network, Inc.
Defendant: Alliance Acquisitions, Inc. and Brian Altounian
Case Number: 3:2012cv00582
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Janet C. Hall
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RULING denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/27/13. (Pesta, J.)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RULING denying 51 Motion for limited discovery and to stay defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating as moot 55 Motion for Protective Order. The court extends the deadline for Back9's opposition to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment to 7/16/2013. If necessary, the court will decide what, if any, discovery should be allowed after it rules on defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/3/2013. (Lewis, D)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RULING denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/13/2013. (Lewis, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Back9 Network, Inc. v. Altounian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Acquisitions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Altounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Back9 Network, Inc.
Represented By: James E. Nealon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?