WhitServe LLC v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: WhitServe LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01522
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Alvin W. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2013 Filing 38 WhitServe LLC's ANSWER to 37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by WhitServe LLC.(Sapone, William)
April 5, 2013 Filing 37 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against WhitServe LLC by Apple Inc..(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
April 1, 2013 Filing 36 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sapone, William)
April 1, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE by WhitServe LLC Of Change Of Attorney Address (Sapone, William)
March 18, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Apple's First and Second Counterclaims by WhitServe LLC.Responses due by 4/8/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A Letter of 2-27-13, # 3 Errata B Draft Amended Answer)(Sapone, William)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw Appearance (Doc. No. 32 ) as to Attorney Walter B. Welsh is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 03/06/2013. (Trachtenberg, L)
February 28, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION for Walter B. Welsh to Withdraw as Attorney by WhitServe LLC. (Welsh, Walter)
February 28, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Sapone on behalf of WhitServe LLC (Sapone, William)
February 25, 2013 Filing 30 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against WhitServe LLC by Apple Inc..(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 7, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 25 Certificate of Good Standing, 24 Certificate of Good Standing, 28 Docket Annotation, 26 Certificate of Good Standing, 27 Certificate of Good Standing (Certificate of Electronic Filing) (Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 7, 2013 Filing 28 Docket Entry Correction re 25 Certificate of Good Standing for Bryan Alexander Kohm: REPLACEMENT PDF - original pdf filed in error for another attorney (Ferguson, L.)
February 6, 2013 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin G. Hulse to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 6, 2013 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth J. White to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 6, 2013 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan A. Kohm to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Pisarsky, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2013: # 1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Ferguson, L.).
February 6, 2013 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Teresa M. Corbin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teresa M. Corbin, Esq. 19 is hereby GRANTED; Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan A. Kohm, Esq. 20 is hereby GRANTED; Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth J. White, Esq. 21 is hereby GRANTED; Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin G. Hulse, Esq. 22 is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Certificates of Good Standing due by 4/6/2013. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/5/13. (Smith, S.)
February 4, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin G. Hulse to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 4, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth J. White to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 4, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan A. Kohm to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
February 4, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Teresa M. Corbin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teresa M. Corbin, Esq. 14 ; Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan A. Kohm, Esq. 15 ; Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth J. White, Esq. 16 ; Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin Hulse, Esq. 17 are all hereby DENIED, for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b): failure to provide bar numbers for each court of which attorney is and has ever been a member. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/31/13. (Smith, S.)
January 18, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin Hulse to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2750797) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
January 18, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth J. White to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2750788) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
January 18, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan A. Kohm to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2750782) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
January 18, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Teresa M. Corbin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2750775) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pisarsky, Nicholas)
January 11, 2013 Answer deadline updated for Apple Inc. to 2/25/2013. (Smith, S.)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. No. 12 ) is hereby GRANTED, absent objection, to February 25, 2013. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 01/11/2013. (Trachtenberg, L)
January 8, 2013 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 25, 2013 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint 1 Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Pisarsky, Nicholas)
January 8, 2013 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Pisarsky, Nicholas)
January 8, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Sicilian on behalf of Apple Inc. (Sicilian, James)
January 8, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Pisarsky on behalf of Apple Inc. (Pisarsky, Nicholas)
December 18, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WhitServe LLC. Apple Inc. served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. (Welsh, Walter)
October 26, 2012 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (Ferguson, L.)
October 26, 2012 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Apple Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Walter B. Welsh* *Michaud-Kinney Group LLP* *306 Industrial Park Rd., Suite 206* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Ferguson, L.)
October 26, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by WhitServe LLC, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by WhitServe LLC, 4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/12. (Ferguson, L.)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/25/12. (Ferguson, L.)
October 25, 2012 Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/25/13. Amended Pleadings due by 12/24/2012 Discovery due by 4/26/2013 Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2013. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/12. (Ferguson, L.)
October 25, 2012 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Malone, P.)
October 25, 2012 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Apple Inc.. (Welsh, Walter)
October 25, 2012 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WhitServe LLC. (Welsh, Walter)
October 25, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2668621.), filed by WhitServe LLC.(Welsh, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WhitServe LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WhitServe LLC
Represented By: Walter B. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?