Pape v. Amos Financial LLC et al

Plaintiff: Philip Pape
Defendant: Amos Financial LLC and Law Offices of Frank N. Peluso, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00063
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Alfred V. Covello
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 86 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $34,100 plus $1,624.80 in costs (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/25/2016. (Watson, M.) Modified on 2/25/2016, to add text (Campbell, A).
January 5, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in large part Plaintiff's Second Motion In Limine construed as a Motion for Reconsideration in Light of New Evidence [Dkt. #73]. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/5/2016. (Watson, M.)
October 7, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part 70 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, without prejudice to renew at a later time regarding appropriate sanctions; and taking under advisement 73 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Limit Trial to Statutory D amages or for Other Relief, such that the Court will construe this as a Motion for Reconsideration in light of new evidence, and defendant Peluso Law Offices shall file a brief in opposition, which addresses all the legal issues raised in plaintiff's brief on or before October 30, 2015. Plaintiff may file a reply brief, if any, on or before November 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/7/2015. (Watson, M.)
March 4, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the plaintiff's 33 motion for summary judgment; denying the defendants' 48 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on March 4, 2014. (Meskill, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pape v. Amos Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Pape
Represented By: Joanne S. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amos Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Frank N. Peluso, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?