Henderson v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Plaintiff: Genevieve Henderson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 3:2013cv00378
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/26/16. (Harris, J)
January 27, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion 59 to Dismiss is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claim that Wells Fargo did not hold the Note when it initiated foreclosure proceedings and Plaintiff's abusive foreclosure claim, and otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/27/16. (Harris, J)
February 13, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendant's Motion 28 to Set Aside Default and to Dismiss is GRANTED as to setting aside the Entry of Default 23 and DENIED as to dismissal; Plaintiff's Motion 26 for Default Judgment is DENIED and her Motion 25 for Leave to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to docket Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint [25-1]. The Clerk is further directed to issue a summons, which the Marshals Service shall serve upon Defendant along with a copy of the Third Amended Complaint by March 12, 2015. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/13/2015. (Morril, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?