Claude v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al

Plaintiff: Phenol Claude
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, John Does and Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2013cv00535
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 105 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 119 Motion to Strike; denying 120 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 126 Motion for Leave to File. See attached memorandum of opinion. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/15. (Shechter, N.)
September 29, 2015 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Motion to Dismiss. See attached opinion. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/29/2015. (Shechter, N.)
August 14, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss. See the attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/14/14. (De Palma, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claude v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phenol Claude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?