Lawrence & Memorial Hospital v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence & Memorial Hospital
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius, Marilyn Tavenner and Robert G. Eaton
Case Number: 3:2013cv01495
Filed: October 11, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New London
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order 65 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion 50 for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED, and this case is remanded to the agency for identification and implementation of an appropriate remedy in light of the Second Circuit's decision. The Clerk is requested to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/2/16. (Harris, J)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order 41 ORDER; Plaintiff's Motion 36 for Summary Judgment is DENIED and Defendants' Motion 35 for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/22/2014. (Morril, Gregory)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion 4 for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/6/2013. (Bonneau, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence & Memorial Hospital v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence & Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Steven M. Basche
Represented By: Joseph D. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: Carolyn Aiko Ikari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Tavenner
Represented By: Carolyn Aiko Ikari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Eaton
Represented By: Carolyn Aiko Ikari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?