Westchester Fire Insurance Co. v. Enviroguard, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Westchester Fire Insurance Co. |
Defendant: |
Michelle Marini, Mario Marini, Lisa Costantini, Mark Costantini, Silvermine Equities, LLC, Clean Air Consultants, LLC and Enviroguard, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv01620 |
Filed: |
November 5, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Connecticut |
Office: |
New Haven Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles S. Haight |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 25, 2014 |
Filing
24
ORDER (see attached) re 23 Motion For Withdrawal of Appearance. Defendants Mario Marini and Michelle Marini (the "Marini Defendants") are hereby notified that, upon a finding of good cause, pursuant to D.Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(e) and Connecticut Rule 1.16(b) of Professional Conduct, the Court will grant the 23 motion of their counsel Stephen P. Wright to withdraw his appearance on July 25, 2014. On or before the close of business on that date, each Marini Defendant mus t either: (1) secure new counsel and direct that counsel to enter an appearance on his and/or her behalf or (2) file a pro se appearance (i.e., appear himself and/or herself) in this action. Failure of either Marini Defendant to comply with this Order may result in a default being entered against him or her. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 25, 2014.(Dorais, L.)
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
6
ORDER (see attached) directing Plaintiff to file and serve an affidavit regarding the citizenship of the defendant limited liability companies -- Enviroguard, Clean Air, and Silvermine -- for federal diversity purposes on or before December 17, 2013. The affidavit shall set forth the citizenship of each member of each of the three defendant limited liability companies on November 5, 2013, the date the action commenced. The Court will review the affidavit to determine whether it has diversity subject matter jurisdiction in this action, 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). All case deadlines are stayed pending that review. If subject matter jurisdiction does not exist, the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice to Plaintiff filing in another, appropriate jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on November 12, 2013. (Dorais, L.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?