Harkey v. General Electric Company
Plaintiff: Betty Harkey
Defendant: General Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv01799
Filed: December 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Warren W. Eginton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER. Plaintiffs' 368 and 370 motions are hereby GRANTED for the reasons set forth in the attached ruling.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/27/2020. (Super, John)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 178 Motion to Seal; denying 180 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part 181 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 183 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion to Seal; denying 186 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 208 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 211 Motion to Seal; granting 219 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/7/17. (Gould, K.)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion to Compel for the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 4/1/16. (Cates, S)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/30/15. (Gould, K.).
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Reconsideration and vacating 59 ORDER on 54 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/23/15. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harkey v. General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Harkey
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?