Pitterman et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Bernard Pitterman, Rose O'Connor and James O'Connor
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00967
Filed: July 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Janet C. Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 RULING granting 348 Motion. For the foregoing reasons, the parties Joint Motion for an Indicative Ruling (Mot.) (Doc. No. 348 ) is GRANTED. The court indicates that it would grant a motion to vacate if the Second Circuit remanded for that purpose. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/7/2018. (Lewis, D)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 AMENDED RULING denying 313 Motion to Certify Questions to the Connecticut Supreme Court Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/30/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 RULING denying 313 Motion to Certify Questions to the Connecticut Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/25/2018. (Anastasio, F.)
July 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION RULING RE: Deposition of Kyle Klawiter. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/8/2017. (Bernstein, A.)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATION RULING RE: Deposition of Debra Grant. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/6/2017. (Bernstein, A.)
July 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATION RULING RE: Deposition of William F. Sultze. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/4/2017. (Bernstein, A.)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SUPPLEMENTAL RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT # 59 REGARDING DUTY TO WARN CAUSE OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/29/2016.(Lewis, D)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RULING: The Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony from Dr. Gary Crakes (Doc. No. 67 ) is DENIED. The Motion to Strike / Limit Plaintiffs Expert Testimony (Doc. No. 70 ) is GRANTED IN PART, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND TERMINATED AS MOOT IN PART. The first portion of the Motion is TERMINATED AS MOOT. The second and third portions of the Motion are GRANTED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. In accordancewith this Ruling, the plaintiffs will have 14 days until May 31, 2016 to serve upon GM new Rule 26(a)(2)(C) disclosures for every expert that they intend to call who has not filed an expert report.. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/16/2016. (Lewis, D)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RULING granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses. See Ruling for details. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/11/2016. (Anastasio, F.)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RULING denying 59 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Sgt. Michael R. O'Brien; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Preclude Primary Expert Testimony of L. Wayne McCracken, Jr.; terminating as moot 103 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs; Exhibit O (ECF 95-15) on Summary Judgment Motion. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/29/2016. (Anastasio, F.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitterman et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Pitterman
Represented By: Robert B. Adelman
Represented By: Etan Hirsch
Represented By: Joram Hirsch
Represented By: Robert B. Adelman
Represented By: Etan Hirsch
Represented By: Joram Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose O'Connor
Represented By: Robert B. Adelman
Represented By: Etan Hirsch
Represented By: Joram Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Connor
Represented By: Robert B. Adelman
Represented By: Etan Hirsch
Represented By: Joram Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Emily E Cosentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?