Vineyard Vines, LLC v. Macbeth Collection, LLC
Plaintiff: Vineyard Vines, LLC
Defendant: Macbeth Collection, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv01096
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Janet C. Hall
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RULING denying 136 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 1/9/2019. (Katz, S.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RULING granting, in part, and denying, in part, 113 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Seeking Additional Relief. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/5/2018. (Katz, S.)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE and ORDER. See attached Memorandum and Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/17/2017. (Kaczmarek, S.)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RULING granting 37 Motion to Compel and Scheduling Order. See ruling and order for set deadlines. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 5/8/15. (Esposito, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vineyard Vines, LLC v. Macbeth Collection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vineyard Vines, LLC
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macbeth Collection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?