Young v. Leon et al
Plaintiff: |
Cedric Young |
Defendant: |
Victor Leon, Touponse, Benoit and Fortini |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01337 |
Filed: |
September 15, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Connecticut |
Office: |
New Haven Office |
County: |
Hartford |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles S. Haight |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 6, 2015 |
Filing
33
RULING (see attached) GRANTING Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Withdraw; WITHDRAWING Plaintiff's 19 First Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; GRANTING Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery; and GRANT ING Plaintiff's 20 Second Motion to Amend the Complaint. The Clerk is directed to docket the proposed second amended complaint (see doc. [20-1]) and to mail waiver of service of process request packets in accordance with the instructions set f orth in the attached RULING. In light of the foregoing, the SCHEDULING ORDER is reset as follows. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint by October 1, 2015. All discovery shall be completed by November 2, 2015. Motions for summary judgment may be filed on or before December 2, 2015. Separate trial memoranda shall be filed by January 4, 2016, or within thirty days after the Court rules on any motion for summary judgment, whichever is later. The case will be trial ready by February 3, 2016, or thirty days after the filing of the trial memoranda, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on August 6, 2015. (Pylman, J.)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
21
RULING (see attached) DENYING, without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to re-file at a later stage of litigation, Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 2, 2015. (Pylman, J.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?