In Re: Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, Cesar Castillo, Humana, Inc, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, American Sales Company, LLC, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co, Safeway Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Albertson's LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Sergeant's Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Barr Lab Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG
In Re: Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation
Consolidated Plaintiff: Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company
Claimant: Lonny DiTella
Interested Party: Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Aetna Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. and Bi-Lo Holding LLC
Amicus Curiae: Generic Pharmaceutical Association
Case Number: 3:2014md02516
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: MDL 2516 In Re: Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER denying #881 Motion for Order; denying #883 Motion for Order; and denying #885 Motion; substantially for the reasons set forth in the memorandum in opposition #882 . Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/2/22. (Caldero, M.)
May 2, 2022 Filing 885 AMENDED MOTION to Reissue Settlement Check by Lonny DiTella. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Oliver, T.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 884 Additional Evidence in Support by Lonny DiTella re #883 Revised MOTION for Order to Reissue the Settlement Check. (Oliver, T.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 883 Revised MOTION for Order to Reissue the Settlement Check by Lonny DiTella. (Freberg, B)
August 24, 2021 Filing 882 Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion of Lonny DiTella to Order Co-Lead Counsel and A.B. Data to Reissue a Settlement Check re #881 MOTION for filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(Buchman, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 881 MOTION for Order to Reissue the Settlement Check by Lonny DiTella. (Freberg, B)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER Approving Distribution of Settlement Fund, Approving Payment of Claims Administrator, Approving Late-Filed Claims, and Award of Attorneys' Fees from Set Aside Fund. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/06/2020.(Powell, G.)
December 6, 2020 Filing 879 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion to Approve Distribution of Settlement Fund to Class Claimants, Reimbursement of Class Claims Administrator and for An Award of Attorneys Fees From Set Aside Fund by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Buchman Declaration, #3 Exhibit A: Miller Declaration, #4 Exhibit B: Proposed Order)(Buchman, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 878 Order on Bill of Costs re #877 USCA Mandate Signed by Clerk on 7/7/2020. (Oliver, T.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 877 MANDATE of USCA dated 5/26/2020 AFFIRMING the Judgment #826 Notice of Appeal, filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Aetna Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., #828 Notice of Appeal, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc. (Oliver, T.)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER of USCA as to #826 Notice of Appeal, filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Aetna Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., #829 Notice of Appeal, filed by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas, #828 Notice of Appeal, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc. USCA Case Number 18-2474(L), 18-2487(CON), 18-2578(CON), 19-754(CON) (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 875 MANDATE of USCA dated 1/10/2020 DISMISSING #869 Notice of Appeal, filed by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas (Oliver, T.)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER granting #872 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lucas Townsend terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/25/2019. (Smith, E)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 873 ORDER granting #871 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Miguel A. Estrada terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/25/2019. (Smith, E)
April 22, 2019 Filing 872 MOTION for Lucas Townsend to Withdraw as Attorney by Aetna Inc.. (Townsend, Lucas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 871 MOTION for Miguel A. Estrada to Withdraw as Attorney by Aetna Inc.. (Estrada, Miguel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 870 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #869 Notice of Appeal,. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Oliver, T.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 869 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #868 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACTDC-5209174. (Meade, John)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER denying #854 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #857 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/25/2019. (Smith, E)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER granting #834 SEALED MOTION Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/22/2019. (Smith, E)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER denying as moot #832 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #832 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/22/2019. (Smith, E)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER denying without prejudice #824 MOTION to Enforce Judgment /Defendants' Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Order and for a Permanent Injunction Against the Orange County District Attorney's Restitution Claims Pending in California State Court. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/22/2019. (Smith, E)
February 12, 2019 Filing 863 NOTICE by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund End Payor Notice of Second Circuit Action Relating to Motion to Dismiss Appeal of Orange County District Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Marvin)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ORDER of USCA as to #826 Notice of Appeal, filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Aetna Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., #829 Notice of Appeal, filed by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas, #828 Notice of Appeal, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc. USCA Case Number 18-2474 (L), 18-2487 (Con) & 18-2578 (Con) (Oliver, T.)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER denying as moot #769 Motion to Compel /Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Their Contracts with ASO Customers. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 1/18/2019. (Smith, E)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER denying as moot #760 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions Against Plaintiff BCBSLA. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 1/18/2019. (Smith, E)
January 11, 2019 Filing 860 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R Underhill is cancelled. (Smith, E)
January 9, 2019 Filing 859 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R Underhill (Smith, E)
November 28, 2018 Filing 858 RESPONSE re #857 MOTION to Alter Judgment or Vacate Judgment End Payor Plaintiffs' Response Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Orange County District Attorney's Rule 59 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and/or Rule 60 Motion for Relief from Judgment filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Miller, Marvin)
November 7, 2018 Filing 857 MOTION to Alter Judgment or Vacate Judgment by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas.Responses due by 11/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meade, John)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #837 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 10/30/2018. (Smith, E)
October 5, 2018 Filing 855 REPLY to Response to #837 MOTION for Bond - Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of End Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Bond Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7 filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Steiner, Renae)
September 21, 2018 Filing 854 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, Alternatively, Opposition to EPP Motion for Appeal Bond by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas.Responses due by 10/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meade, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 853 Joint Memorandum in Opposition re #837 MOTION for Bond filed by Aetna Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (Estrada, Miguel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 852 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. 835 MOTION Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund. (Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2018 11:00 AM before District Judge Stefan R. Underhill.) (Smith, E)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER granting #835 Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/21/2018. (Smith, E)
September 20, 2018 Filing 849 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Ahern on behalf of Bi-Lo Holding LLC, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. (Oliver, T.)
September 19, 2018 Filing 850 RESPONSE re #835 MOTION Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund filed by Bi-Lo Holding LLC, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Oliver, T.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER granting #847 Motion to Amend/Correct a Party Designation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/18/2018. (Smith, E)
September 13, 2018 Filing 847 MOTION to Amend/Correct a Party Designation by Aetna Inc..Responses due by 10/4/2018 (St. Phillip, Peter)
September 12, 2018 Filing 846 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc /Letter to Judge Underhill from Ross E. Elfand pursuant to the Courts conference memorandum (ECF No. 841) (Attachments: #1 Stipulation filed in The Superior Court of California, Orange County)(Elfand, Ross)
September 11, 2018 Filing 845 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Townsend on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Townsend, Lucas)
September 11, 2018 Filing 844 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel A. Estrada on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Estrada, Miguel)
September 9, 2018 Filing 843 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. Held on 8-31-2018 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2018. (Masse, S.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 842 ORDER granting #833 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/5/2018 (Pincus, A).
September 5, 2018 Filing 841 Docket Entry Correction...Modified to upload the correct PDF document which list the correct case caption re #840 Memorandum of Conference, (Jaiman, R.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 840 MEMORANDUM of Conference re #824 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Order and for a Permanent Injunction Against the Orange County District Attorney's Restitution Claims Pending in California State Court. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/5/2018 (Pincus, A). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Conference Memorandum) (Jaiman, R.).
September 4, 2018 Filing 839 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. #835 MOTION Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund. (Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2018 11:00 AM before District Judge Stefan R. Underhill.) The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650 8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.)(Caldero, M.)
September 4, 2018 Docket Entry Correction re #837 MOTION Security for Costs MODIFIED TO CORRECT THE EVENT TYPE AND CHANGE IT TO MOTION FOR BOND (Oliver, T.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 838 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Status Conference held on 8/31/2018. Total Time: 0 hours and 40 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Pincus, A)
August 31, 2018 Filing 837 MOTION for Bond - End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Bond Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7 by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Eric J. Miller, #3 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae) Modified on 9/4/2018 TO CORRECT THE EVENT TYPE (Oliver, T.).
August 30, 2018 Filing 836 REPLY to Response to #824 MOTION to Enforce Judgment /Defendants' Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Order and for a Permanent Injunction Against the Orange County District Attorney's Restitution Claims Pending in California State Court, #832 MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively MOTION to Stay re #824 MOTION to Enforce Judgment /Defendants' Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Order and for a Permanent Injunction Against the Orange County District Attorney's Restitution Claims Pending in California State Cou /Defendants' Opposition to the OCDA's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and in the alternative, Motion to Stay; and Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Enforce Final Judgment filed by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Elfand, Ross)
August 27, 2018 Filing 835 MOTION Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund by American Sales Company, LLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..Responses due by 9/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Affidavit of Vlady Gleizer (Redacted), #3 Affidavit -- Declaration of Daniel C. Simons (Redacted), #4 Text of Proposed Order (Redacted))(Simons, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 834 SEALED MOTION Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund by American Sales Company, LLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Vlady Gleizer, #3 Affidavit - Declaration of Daniel C. Simons, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 833 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund, Affidavit of Vlady Gleizer, and Declaration of Daniel C. Simons by American Sales Company, LLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Simons, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 832 MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay re #824 MOTION to Enforce Judgment /Defendants' Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Order and for a Permanent Injunction Against the Orange County District Attorney's Restitution Claims Pending in California State Court and in the final alternative, opposition to #824 Motion to Enforce Judgment by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas.Responses due by 9/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Meade, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 830 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. #824 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Order and for a Permanent Injunction Against the Orange County District Attorney's Restitution Claims Pending in California State Court. Telephone Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 03:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650 8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.)(Caldero, M.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 831 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #829 Notice of Appeal, #828 Notice of Appeal,. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 829 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #822 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Settlement, Motion Hearing, #821 Order by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACTDC-4941121. (Meade, John) Modified on 8/20/2018 (Oliver, T.).
August 20, 2018 Filing 828 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #822 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion to Expedite,, Order on Motion for Settlement,, Motion Hearing, #821 Order by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACTDC-4941092. (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
August 20, 2018 Docket Entry Correction re #829 Notice of Appeal MODIFIED TO LINK ENTRY TO DOC #821 AND #822 (Oliver, T.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 827 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #826 Notice of Appeal,. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Oliver, T.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 826 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #822 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion to Expedite,, Order on Motion for Settlement,, Motion Hearing, #821 Order by Aetna Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACTDC-4939927. (St. Phillip, Peter)
August 10, 2018 MDL NOTICE to MDL Panel of Dismissal of Member Case 3:13cv1716, 3:14cv336, 3:14cv478, 3:14cv481, 3:14cv484, 3:14cv486, 3:14cv487, 3:14cv517, 3:14cv520, 3:14cv514, 3:14cv525, 3:14cv522, 3:14cv529, 3:14cv519, 3:14cv539, 3:14cv540, 3:14cv541, 3:14cv857 Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/10/2018. (Oliver, T.)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ENTERED IN ERROR - ORDER GRANTING FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL APPROVING INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS CLAIMS AGAINST BOEHRINGER AND TEVA. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/10/2018 (Pincus, A). Modified on 8/10/2018 (Oliver, T.).
August 10, 2018 Docket Entry Correction re #825 Order MODIFIED TO NOTE ENTRY HAS BEEN ENTERED IN ERROR IN THE INCORRECT CASE (Oliver, T.)
August 6, 2018 Filing 824 MOTION to Enforce Judgment /Defendants' Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Order and for a Permanent Injunction Against the Orange County District Attorney's Restitution Claims Pending in California State Court by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #3 Exhibit 1 to Elfand Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Elfand Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Elfand, Ross)
July 27, 2018 Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. Held on 7/19/2018 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2018. (Masse, S.)
July 19, 2018 Filing 822 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held, granting #786 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #804 Motion for Order regarding certain Opt Out Request; finding as moot #804 Motion to Expedite; granting #812 Motion for Settlement Total Time: 1 hours and 06 minutes(Court Reporter Masse, S. ) (Jaiman, R.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER GRANTING FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL APPROVING INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS CLAIMS AGAINST BOEHRINGER AND TEVA. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/19/2018.(Jaiman, R.)
July 19, 2018 Filing 820 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Eric J. Miller Regarding Claims Filing to Date and Report on Certain Exclusions Signed By Eric J. Miller filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Miller, Marvin)
July 17, 2018 Filing 819 NOTICE by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas re #818 Reply to Response to Motion,, #810 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite , #805 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #817 Reply to Response to Motion, #794 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John Alden Meade, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Alden Meade)(Meade, John)
July 16, 2018 Filing 818 REPLY to Response to #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite /Defendants' Reply to the OCDA's Opposition to EPPs' Motion for an Order Rejecting Insurers' Request to Opt Out ASO Customers, and in Further Support of EPPs' Motion for Final Approval filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 Exhibit A to Elfand Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Elfand Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Elfand Declaration)(Elfand, Ross)
July 12, 2018 Filing 817 REPLY to Response to #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite Supplemental Reply Addressing the Orange County District Attorney filed by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Shadowen, Steven)
July 12, 2018 Filing 816 NOTICE of Appearance by Uriel Rabinovitz on behalf of Aetna Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
July 12, 2018 Filing 815 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D St. Phillip, Jr on behalf of Aetna Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
July 6, 2018 Filing 814 NOTICE by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas regarding Firm Name Change (Meade, John)
July 5, 2018 Filing 813 REPLY to Response to #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite / Defendants' Reply in Support of EPPs' Motion for an Order Rejecting Insurers' Request to Opt Out ASO Customers filed by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Elfand Declaration)(Elfand, Ross)
July 5, 2018 Filing 812 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Settlement by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement, #2 Affidavit of Steve Shadowen in Support of Final Approval of the Settlement, #3 Text of Proposed Order granting Final Approval of the Settlement)(Shadowen, Steven)
July 5, 2018 Filing 811 REPLY to Response to #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite filed by Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund. (Shadowen, Steven)
July 5, 2018 Filing 810 Memorandum in Opposition re #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite filed by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas. (Meade, John)
July 5, 2018 Filing 809 NOTICE by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund re #786 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and for Service Award Payments to Class Representatives Joint Declaration of Marvin Miller, Renae Steiner and Steven Shadowen in Support of Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation, Notice Plan and for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Payments to Class Representatives (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Marvin)
June 29, 2018 Filing 808 Memorandum in Opposition re #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite filed by Aetna Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr.)(Rabinovitz, Uriel)
June 27, 2018 Filing 807 NOTICE by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas re #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite (Meade, John)
June 25, 2018 Filing 806 NOTICE by Aetna Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company re #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
June 15, 2018 Filing 805 Memorandum in Support re #804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests MOTION to Expedite / Defendants' Memorandum Joining EPPs' Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests ( ECF No. #804 ), and in Support of Final Approval of the EPP Settlement Over the Orange County District Attorney's Objection filed by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Elfand Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Elfand Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Elfand Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Elfand Declaration)(Elfand, Ross)
June 13, 2018 Filing 804 MOTION for -End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests, MOTION to Expedite by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests, #3 Exhibit A Aetna exclusion request, #4 Exhibit B BCBS Florida exclusion request, #5 Exhibit C BCBS Tenn. exclusion request, #6 Exhibit D BCBS VT exclusion request, #7 Exhibit E CareFirst exclusion request, #8 Exhibit F Cigna exclusion request, #9 Exhibit G Lidoderm Order, #10 Exhibit H April 26, 2018 letter, #11 Exhibit I Abbott Labs. Order, #12 Exhibit J CAFA Notice, #13 Exhibit K Solodyn Order, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER Approving re #801 Joint STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/13/2018.(Jaiman, R.)
June 13, 2018 Filing 802 NOTICE. The appeal of Winn-Dixie Stores and Bi-Lo Holding from a decision of the Claim Administrator in the Direct Purchaser Class Action Settlement has been docketed at 3:18-mc-00067 (SRU). All filings with respect to that appeal should be made in that case. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/13/2018. (Jamieson, K)
June 11, 2018 Filing 801 Joint STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Meade, John)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER approving #798 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Humana, Inc Signed by Clerk on 6/6/2018. (Oliver, T.)
June 5, 2018 Filing 799 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Eric J. Miller Regarding Requests for Exclusion and Objections Received to Date Signed By Eric J. Miller filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Miller, Marvin)
June 1, 2018 Filing 798 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc. Teva Women's Health, Inc. f/b/a Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp. by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
May 18, 2018 Filing 797 NOTICE by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company re #790 Notice (Other), Withdrawal of Objection to EPP Class Settlement (Meade, John)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER cancelling #792 Telephonic Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/30/2018. (Jamieson, K)
April 26, 2018 Filing 795 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference. Held on 3/2/2018 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2018. (Masse, S.)
April 23, 2018 Filing 794 NOTICE by The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas re 767 Calendar Entry, Objection to Proposed EPP Class Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter to A.B. Data, Claims Administrator)(Meade, John)
April 23, 2018 Filing 793 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alden Meade on behalf of The People of California, acting by and through the Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas (Meade, John)
April 23, 2018 Filing 792 CORRECTED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Motion Hearing on #760 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions, #769 MOTION to Compel set for April 30, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) Only counsel for the parties involved in the discovery dispute are required to participate. (Jamieson, K)
April 23, 2018 Filing 791 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Motion Hearing on #760 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions, #769 MOTION to Compel set for April 30, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) Only counsel for the parties involved in the discovery dispute are required to participate. (Jamieson, K)
April 20, 2018 Filing 790 NOTICE by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company re 767 Calendar Entry, Objection to Proposed EPP Class Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Cover letter to Claims Administrator)(Meade, John)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER granting #779 & #783 MOTIONS to Seal, #780 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/17/2018. (Jamieson, K)
April 13, 2018 Filing 788 AFFIDAVIT re #786 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and for Service Award Payments to Class Representatives - Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and for Service Award Payments to Class Representatives Signed By Renae D. Steiner filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Sergeant's Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Hilliard & Shadowen Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 Heins Mills & Olson Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 Miller Law Decl., #4 Exhibit 4 Motley Rice Decl., #5 Exhibit 5 Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan Decl., #6 Exhibit 6 Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll Decl., #7 Exhibit 7 Cohen, Placitella & Roth Decl., #8 Exhibit 8 Girard Gibbs Decl., #9 Exhibit 9 Glancy Prongay & Murray Decl., #10 Exhibit 10 Goldman Scarlato & Penny Decl., #11 Exhibit 11 Grant & Eisenhofer Decl., #12 Exhibit 12 Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie Decl., #13 Exhibit 13 Jacobs Burns Orlove & Hernandez, #14 Exhibit 14 Labaton Sucharow Decl., #15 Exhibit 15 Law Offices of Marc S. Henzel Decl., #16 Exhibit 16 Lockridge Grindal Nauen Decl., #17 Exhibit 17 Markowitz & Richman Decl., #18 Exhibit 18 Pomerantz Decl., #19 Exhibit 19 Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Decl., #20 Exhibit 20 Safirstein Metcalf Decl., #21 Exhibit 21 Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah Decl., #22 Exhibit 22 Spector Roseman & Kodroff Decl., #23 Exhibit 23 Stoll Berne Decl., #24 Exhibit 24 Willig, Williams, & Davidson Decl., #25 Exhibit 25 Zimmerman Reed Decl.)(Steiner, Renae)
April 13, 2018 Filing 787 Joint AFFIDAVIT re #786 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and for Service Award Payments to Class Representatives - Joint Declaration of Marvin A. Miller, Renae D. Steiner and Steven D. Shadowen in Support of Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and for Service Award Payments to Class Representatives Signed By Marvin A. Miller, Renae D. Steiner and Steven D. Shadowen filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Sergeant's Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary of Time and Expenses Incurred by All Firms)(Steiner, Renae)
April 13, 2018 Filing 786 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and for Service Award Payments to Class Representatives by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, Sergeant's Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund.Responses due by 5/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Steiner, Renae)
April 11, 2018 Filing 785 Sealed Document: Unredacted Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel and Unredacted Exhibits E-G to Declaration of Ross Elfand by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #783 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel and Unredacted Exhibits E-G to the Declaration of Ross Elfand, #784 Reply to Response to Motion,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Ross Elfand, #2 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Ross Elfand, #3 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Ross Elfand)(Elfand, Ross)
April 11, 2018 Filing 784 REPLY to Response to #769 MOTION to Compel /Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Their Contracts with ASO Customers /Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel [Public Redacted Version] filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)(Elfand, Ross)
April 11, 2018 Filing 783 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel and Unredacted Exhibits E-G to the Declaration of Ross Elfand by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
April 11, 2018 Filing 782 RESPONSE re #780 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Compel and For Sanctions filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Kessler, David)
April 6, 2018 Filing 781 Amended EXHIBIT Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Compel and For Sanctions by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company re #780 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Compel and For Sanctions. (Meade, John)
April 6, 2018 Filing 780 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Compel and For Sanctions by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Sanctions, #3 Exhibit A)(Meade, John)
April 2, 2018 Filing 779 MOTION to Seal Exhibit AG to Declaration of David. J. Kessler by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AG, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kessler, David)
April 2, 2018 Filing 778 REPLY to Response to #760 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions Against Plaintiff BCBSLA filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David J. Kessler, #2 Exhibit AC in Support of Affidavit of David J. Kessler, #3 Exhibit AD in Support of Affidavit of David J. Kessler, #4 Exhibit AE in Support of Affidavit of David J. Kessler, #5 Exhibit AF in Support of Affidavit of David J. Kessler, #6 Exhibit AG in Support of Affidavit of David J. Kessler)(Kessler, David)
March 28, 2018 Filing 777 Memorandum in Opposition re #769 MOTION to Compel /Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Their Contracts with ASO Customers filed by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Meade, John)
March 19, 2018 Filing 776 Memorandum in Opposition re #760 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions Against Plaintiff BCBSLA filed by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Meade, John)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 775 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Discovery due by September 24, 2018; Dispositive Motions due by October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/15/2018. (Jamieson, K)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER granting #773 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/15/2018. (Jamieson, K)
March 14, 2018 Filing 773 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time / Letter to Judge Underhill from Ross E. Elfand requesting a sixty-day extension of the expert discovery deadlines in the Court scheduling order #756 by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order)(Elfand, Ross)
March 13, 2018 Filing 772 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc / Letter to Judge Underhill from Ross E. Elfand advising the court that Defendants and Plaintiff Humana Inc. have reached an agreement in principle to resolve all claims asserted by Humana against Defendants. (Elfand, Ross)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER granting #768 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/12/2018. (Jamieson, K)
March 7, 2018 Filing 770 Sealed Document: Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel and Unredacted Exhibits 2-7 to the Declaration of Ross Elfand by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #768 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel and Unredacted Exhibits 2-7 to the Declaration of Ross Elfand, #769 MOTION to Compel /Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Their Contracts with ASO Customers . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 Exhibit 3 2 to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #3 Exhibit 4 2 to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #4 Exhibit 5 2 to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #5 Exhibit 6 2 to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #6 Exhibit 7 2 to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand)(Carney, Peter)
March 7, 2018 Filing 769 MOTION to Compel /Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Their Contracts with ASO Customers by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 3/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support [Redaced Version], #2 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, Peter)
March 7, 2018 Filing 768 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel and Unredacted Exhibits 2-7 to the Declaration of Ross Elfand by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Carney, Peter)
March 7, 2018 Filing 767 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Fairness Hearing on Indirect Purchaser Class Settlement set for July 19, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Jamieson, K)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER granting #748 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; denying #755 MOTION to Strike; granting #762 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/06/2018. (Jamieson, K)
March 2, 2018 Filing 765 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on March 2, 2018. Total Time: 0 hours and 20 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
March 1, 2018 Filing 764 Sealed Document: Exhibit B to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #763 Reply to Response to Motion,, . (Carney, Peter)
March 1, 2018 Filing 763 REPLY to Response to #755 MOTION to Strike #750 Notice (Other), / Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Humana Counsel's January 16, 2018 Letter (ECF No. #750 ) and in Support of EPPS' Motion for Preliminary Approval ( /Defendants' Reply in Support filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand)(Carney, Peter)
March 1, 2018 Filing 762 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit B to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
March 1, 2018 Filing 761 REVISED 758 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference re #748 MOTION for Settlement reset for March 2, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. from 4:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Jamieson, K)
February 26, 2018 Filing 760 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions Against Plaintiff BCBSLA by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 3/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David J. Kessler in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Kessler Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Kessler Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Kessler Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Kessler Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Kessler Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Kessler Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Kessler Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Kessler Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Kessler Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Kessler Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Kessler Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Kessler Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Kessler Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Kessler Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Kessler Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Kessler Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Kessler Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Kessler Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Kessler Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Kessler Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Kessler Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Kessler Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Kessler Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Kessler Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Kessler Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Kessler Declaration, #29 Exhibit AB to Kessler Declaration, #30 Text of Proposed Order)(Kessler, David)
February 26, 2018 Filing 759 Memorandum in Opposition re #755 MOTION to Strike #750 Notice (Other), / Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Humana Counsel's January 16, 2018 Letter (ECF No. #750 ) and in Support of EPPS' Motion for Preliminary Approval ( filed by Humana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(St. Phillip, Peter)
February 26, 2018 Filing 758 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference re #748 MOTION for Settlement set for March 2, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Jamieson, K)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER denying #744 MOTION to Certify #735 ORDER on Motion to Compel for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 02/12/2018. (Jamieson, K)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 756 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Discovery due by February 23, 2018; Dispositive Motions due by August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 02/09/2018. (Jamieson, K)
February 5, 2018 Filing 755 MOTION to Strike #750 Notice (Other), / Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Humana Counsel's January 16, 2018 Letter (ECF No. #750 ) and in Support of EPPS' Motion for Preliminary Approval (ECF No. #748 ) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..Responses due by 2/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Humana Counsel's January 16, 2018 Letter (ECF No. 750) and in Support of EPPS' Motion for Preliminary Approval (ECF No. 748), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Elfand, Ross)
January 30, 2018 Filing 754 REPLY to Response to #744 MOTION to Certify the November 29, 2017 Order for Interlocutory Appeal re #735 Order on Motion to Compel /Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Certify The November 29, 2017 Order filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Pace, Jack)
January 22, 2018 Filing 753 Memorandum in Support re #748 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Certification of Settlement Class, Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of Form and Manner of Notice to Class, and Proposed Schedule End-Payor Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Certificate of Service)(Shadowen, Steven)
January 17, 2018 Filing 752 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference. Held on 12/13/2017 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2018. (Masse, S.)
January 16, 2018 Filing 751 Memorandum in Opposition re #744 MOTION to Certify the November 29, 2017 Order for Interlocutory Appeal re #735 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Humana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (St. Phillip, Peter)
January 16, 2018 Filing 750 NOTICE by Humana, Inc re #748 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Certification of Settlement Class, Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of Form and Manner of Notice to Class, and Proposed Schedule (St. Phillip, Peter)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER granting #747 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/10/2018. Attorney Assaf Ze'ev Ben-Atar terminated. (Jamieson, K)
January 8, 2018 Filing 748 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Certification of Settlement Class, Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of Form and Manner of Notice to Class, and Proposed Schedule for Final Approval by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Certificate of Service)(Shadowen, Steven)
January 8, 2018 Filing 747 MOTION for Assaf Z. Ben-Atar to Withdraw as Attorney by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Shearin, James)
January 3, 2018 Filing 746 Joint NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #738 Memorandum of Conference, Order / Letter to Judge Underhill enclosing the parties' agreed-upon Proposed Amended Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Elfand, Ross)
January 1, 2018 Filing 745 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Fairness Hearing. Held on 12-18-2017 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2018. (Masse, S.)
December 26, 2017 Filing 744 MOTION to Certify the November 29, 2017 Order for Interlocutory Appeal re #735 Order on Motion to Compel by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 1/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Jack)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 743 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER of DISMISSAL entered in favor of American Sales Company, LLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Cesar Castillo against Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/21/2017. (Oliver, T.)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER granting #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #740 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk shall docket an Amended Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal that states the correct amount of expenses awarded, $988,678.53. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/21/2017. (Jamieson, K)
December 21, 2017 Filing 741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #740 Judgment,, by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..Responses due by 1/11/2018 (Opper, Joseph)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 740 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER of DISMISSAL entered in favor of American Sales Company, LLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Cesar Castillo against Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/19/2017. (Oliver, T.)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 739 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Fairness Hearing held held on December 18, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 40 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse).As stated on the record, ORDER granting #733 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement; granting in part and denying in part #707 & #732 MOTIONS for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Incentive Awards. The motions for attorneys' fees, costs, and incentive awards are granted in their entirety with respect to the expenses and the incentive awards, and up to the value of 20 percent of the fund with respect to the attorneys' fees. They are otherwise denied. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/18/2017. (Jamieson, K)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 738 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Status Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/14/2017. (Jamieson, K)
December 13, 2017 Filing 737 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on December 13, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 30 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
December 11, 2017 Filing 736 Joint STATUS REPORT by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
November 29, 2017 Filing 735 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #643 MOTION to Compel. (Jamieson, K)
November 28, 2017 Filing 734 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. Second Supplement to Class Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Awards to the Named Class Representatives (Opper, Joseph)
November 22, 2017 Filing 733 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Text of Proposed Order, #12 Certificate of Service)(Opper, Joseph)
November 21, 2017 Filing 732 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Supplement by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..Responses due by 12/12/2017 (Opper, Joseph)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 731 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Status Conference and ORDER re #725 Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/21/2017. (Jamieson, K)
November 20, 2017 Filing 730 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference re Discovery held on 11/20/2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 30 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
November 17, 2017 Filing 729 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference re #725 Discovery Dispute set for November 20, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Only the parties to the discovery dispute are required to participate. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Jamieson, K)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER approving #722 STIPULATION of Dismissal. The Clerk shall close Cases Nos. 3:15-cv-00559, 3:15-cv-00618, and 3:16-cv-00351. So ordered. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/16/2017. (Jamieson, K)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 727 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by July 30, 2018; Jury Trial set for March 11, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/16/2017. (Jamieson, K)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER granting #724 Joint MOTION to Adopt Amended Scheduling Order. No further extensions of time are likely to be granted. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/16/2017. (Jamieson, K)
November 14, 2017 Filing 725 Joint MOTION to Amend the Schedule by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 12/5/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
November 13, 2017 Filing 724 Joint MOTION Requesting the Court Adopt the Parties' Proposed Amended Scheduling Order by Humana, Inc.Responses due by 12/4/2017 (St. Phillip, Peter)
November 8, 2017 Filing 723 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for December 13, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Parties without matters to discuss with the court need not participate. Counsel shall circulate dial-in information prior to the conference. Joint Status Report due by December 11, 2017. (Jamieson, K)
October 31, 2017 Filing 722 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc. f/k/a Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp. by Albertson's LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER approving #715 STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/26/2017. (Jamieson, K)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 720 MEMORANDUM of Status Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/19/2017. (Jamieson, K)
October 19, 2017 Filing 719 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on October 19, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 10 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 718 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #594 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees. The motion is granted up to the amount of $20,000 (which has already been paid), and otherwise denied. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/18/2017. (Jamieson, K)
October 18, 2017 Filing 717 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference re #695 , #703 discovery dispute set for October 19, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.)Only the parties to the discovery dispute are required to participate. (Jamieson, K)
October 18, 2017 Filing 716 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Motion Hearing. Held on 10-12-2017 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (Masse, S.)
October 17, 2017 Filing 715 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
October 17, 2017 Filing 714 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Koh on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Koh, Jennifer)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER granting #690 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; #698 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/17/2017. Attorney Sarah A. Westby terminated. (Jamieson, K)
October 16, 2017 Filing 712 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #709 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer Koh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4567855) by Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Bengels, Jessica)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 711 MEMORANDUM of #705 Telephone Status Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/16/2017. (Jamieson, K)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER granting #709 Motion for Attorney Jennifer Koh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2017. (Oliver, T.)
October 13, 2017 Filing 709 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer Koh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4567855) by Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer Koh)(Bengels, Jessica)
October 13, 2017 Filing 708 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #701 MOTION for Attorney(s) B. Thomas Watson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4564610) by Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Watson, B. Thomas)
October 13, 2017 Filing 707 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Awards to the Class Representatives by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..Responses due by 11/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Certificate of Service)(Opper, Joseph)
October 13, 2017 Filing 706 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Thomas Watson on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Watson, B. Thomas)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 705 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on October 12, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 55 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse).As stated on the record, ORDER granting #678 MOTION to Compel; denying #692 MOTION to Amend Schedule. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/12/2017. (Jamieson, K)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER granting #701 Motion for Attorney B. Thomas Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/11/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2017. (Oliver, T.)
October 11, 2017 Filing 703 RESPONSE re #695 Notice (Other),, (Response to Defendants' October 6, 2017 Letter to the Court) filed by Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bengels, Jessica)
October 11, 2017 Filing 702 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Bengels on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Bengels, Jessica)
October 11, 2017 Filing 701 MOTION for Attorney(s) B. Thomas Watson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4564610) by Par Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of B. Thomas Watson)(Bengels, Jessica)
October 10, 2017 Filing 700 Memorandum in Opposition (Public Redacted Version) re #692 MOTION to Amend Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 Exhibit A to Elfand Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Elfand Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Elfand Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Elfand Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Elfand Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Elfand Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Elfand Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Elfand Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Elfand Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Elfand Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Elfand Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Elfand Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Elfand Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Elfand Declaration, #16 Declaration of Christopher T. Holding (Public Redacted Version))(Elfand, Ross)
October 10, 2017 Filing 699 Sealed Document: Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. re #692 MOTION to Amend Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Holding, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Elfand, Ross)
October 10, 2017 Filing 698 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Elfand, Ross)
October 10, 2017 Filing 697 Joint STATUS REPORT by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
October 6, 2017 Filing 696 Memorandum in Opposition re #678 MOTION to Compel Humana on Production of Network Drives (REDACTED) filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
October 6, 2017 Filing 695 Joint NOTICE by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. Notice by Defendants'/Joint Letter with Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co., KG requesting a resolution to a discovery dispute between Defendants and non-party Par Pharmaceuticals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Shearin, James)
October 5, 2017 Filing 694 Docket Entry Correction...Modified to correct the file date re 681 Status Conference (Jaiman, R.)
October 3, 2017 Filing 693 Memorandum in Support re #692 MOTION to Amend Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
October 3, 2017 Filing 692 MOTION to Amend Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery by Humana, Inc.Responses due by 10/24/2017 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(St. Phillip, Peter)
September 29, 2017 Filing 691 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #594 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Opper, Joseph)
September 28, 2017 Filing 690 MOTION for Sarah A. Westby to Withdraw as Attorney by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Kohn, Peter)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER granting #688 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/27/2017.Attorney Craig Matthew Glantz terminated. (Jamieson, K)
September 25, 2017 Filing 688 MOTION for Craig M. Glantz to Withdraw as Attorney by Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Chiorean, Dan)
September 20, 2017 Filing 687 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference and Motion Hearing on #678 MOTION to Compel set for October 12, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel will circulate a dial-in number in advance of the call. (Jamieson, K)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 686 MEMORANDUM of 681 Status Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/20/2017. (Jamieson, K)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER granting #667 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION for Certification of a Settlement Class, Appointment of Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/19/2017. (Jamieson, K)
September 19, 2017 Filing 684 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #667 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Certification of a Settlement Class, Appointment of Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class and Proposed Schedule for a Fairness H (Opper, Joseph)
September 19, 2017 Filing 683 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #667 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Certification of a Settlement Class, Appointment of Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class and Proposed Schedule for a Fairness H (Opper, Joseph)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER granting #679 MOTION to Seal; #676 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/19/2017. Attorney Meaghan McGurrin Miles terminated. (Jamieson, K)
September 19, 2017 Filing 680 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference re #667 MOTION for Settlement set for September 19, 2017 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Jamieson, K)
September 18, 2017 Filing 681 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on September 18, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 20 minutes. (Jamieson, K) Modified on 10/5/2017 (Jaiman, R.).
September 15, 2017 Filing 679 SEALED MOTION Motion to Seal by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel Humana on Production of Network Drives, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14)(Kessler, David)
September 15, 2017 Filing 678 MOTION to Compel Humana on Production of Network Drives (REDACTED) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 10/6/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Kessler, David)
September 15, 2017 Filing 677 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Nichols on behalf of Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company (Nichols, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2017 Filing 676 MOTION for Meaghan M. Miles to Withdraw as Attorney by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Belt, David)
September 14, 2017 Filing 675 Joint STATUS REPORT by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
September 13, 2017 Filing 674 NOTICE by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund Letter to the Court Regarding Agreement in Principle to Settle End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Claims (Shadowen, Steven)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ORDER approving #671 STIPULATION Extending Time for German Defendants to Respond to Louisiana Health Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/13/2017. (Jamieson, K)
September 12, 2017 Filing 672 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses / Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG & Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH to Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company d/b/a BlueCross/Blueshield of Louisiana's Amended Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG.(Elfand, Ross)
September 12, 2017 Filing 671 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Louisiana Health Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Elfand, Ross)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 670 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by October 20, 2017; Class Certification Motions due by January 17, 2018; Dispositive Motions due by June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/07/2017. (Jamieson, K)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #665 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. An Amended Scheduling Order shall issue. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/07/2017. (Jamieson, K)
September 6, 2017 Filing 668 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Partial Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Discovery re #665 MOTION for To Modify Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery Order filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Holding, Christopher)
September 6, 2017 Filing 667 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Certification of a Settlement Class, Appointment of Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class and Proposed Schedule for a Fairness Hearing by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Certificate of Service)(Opper, Joseph)
September 6, 2017 Filing 666 Memorandum in Support re #665 MOTION for To Modify Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery Order filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Albertson's LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Humana, Inc, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Kroger Co., Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Monica L. Kiley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 14)(Rebuck, Monica)
September 6, 2017 Filing 665 MOTION for To Modify Schedule to Extend Fact Discovery Order by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Albertson's LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Humana, Inc, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Kroger Co., Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Revised Schedule)(Rebuck, Monica)
September 1, 2017 Filing 664 NOTICE by Albertson's LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. re #658 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Non-Party Subpoena Served Upon McKesson Corporation -- Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel (Rebuck, Monica)
August 31, 2017 Filing 663 REPLY to Response to #643 MOTION to Compel filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Humana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co. (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
August 30, 2017 Filing 662 REVISED 629 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference reset for September 18, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. from September 5, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Jamieson, K)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER granting #660 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply in support of #643 MOTION to Compel due by August 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/25/2017. (Jamieson, K)
August 23, 2017 Filing 660 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents (Unopposed) as to #643 MOTION to Compel until August 31, 2017 by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER granting #656 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/22/2017. (Jamieson, K)
August 21, 2017 Filing 658 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Non-Party Subpoena Served Upon McKesson Corporation by Albertson's LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc..Responses due by 9/11/2017 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Monica Kiley and Supporting Exhibits, #2 Affidavit of Anna Neill and Supporting Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rebuck, Monica)
August 14, 2017 Filing 657 Sealed Document: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals,Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, Exhibits C, D & E by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #656 MOTION to Seal Memorandum In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, Exhibits C, D & E to Declaration of Leddicotte . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew S. Leddicotte, #2 Exhibit A - FTC v. Boehringer Order filed 10/20/16, #3 Exhibit B - REDACTED Supplemental Declaration of Persky, #4 Exhibit C - Sealed Persky Transcript Excerpt, #5 Exhibit D - Sealed Cochrane Transcript Excerpt, #6 Exhibit E - Sealed Fonteyne Transcript Excerpt, #7 Memorandum in Support Sealed - Boehringer Ingelheim Phramaceuticals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
August 14, 2017 Filing 656 MOTION to Seal Memorandum In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, Exhibits C, D & E to Declaration of Leddicotte by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew S. Leddicotte, #2 Exhibit A - FTC v. Boehringer Order filed 10/20/16, #3 Exhibit B - (REDACTED) Supplemental Declaration of Persky, #4 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, #7 Memorandum in Support (REDACTED) Boehringer Ingelheim Phramaceuticals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER approving #654 AMENDED STIPULATION, denying as moot #638 MOTION to Compel. So ordered. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/11/2017. (Jamieson, K)
August 10, 2017 Filing 654 Amended STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order in re: #648 by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Elfand, Ross)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER granting #642 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/10/2017. (Jamieson, K)
August 10, 2017 Filing 652 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on August 10, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 5 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER granting #647 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/09/2017. (Jamieson, K)
August 9, 2017 Filing 650 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference. Held on 7-11-2017 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2017. (Masse, S.)
August 7, 2017 Filing 649 Joint STATUS REPORT by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
August 7, 2017 Filing 648 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Elfand, Ross)
August 4, 2017 Filing 647 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Meade, John)
July 27, 2017 Filing 646 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin A. van der Meulen on behalf of Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund (van der Meulen, Robin)
July 26, 2017 Filing 645 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Levy on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Levy, Scott)
July 24, 2017 Filing 644 Sealed Document: Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Peter D. St. Phillip in Support of Motion to Compel by Humana, Inc re #643 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
July 24, 2017 Filing 643 MOTION to Compel by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Humana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.Responses due by 8/14/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7 [REDACTED], #10 Exhibit 8)(Rabinovitz, Uriel)
July 24, 2017 Filing 642 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Peter D. St. Phillip in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Humana, Inc. (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 641 MEMORANDUM of Status Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/12/2017. Additional Status Conference set for August 10, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The parties shall circulate dial-in information prior to the conference. (Jamieson, K)
July 11, 2017 Filing 640 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on July 11, 2017. Total Time: 1 hours and 0 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse).As set forth on the record, ORDER denying #625 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Timely Serve. Louisiana Health shall promptly decide whether to amend its complaint as against the German Defendants. (Jamieson, K)
July 11, 2017 Filing 639 Joint STATUS REPORT by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
July 10, 2017 Filing 638 MOTION to Compel /Letter Brief to Compel by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 7/31/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Text of Proposed Order, #18 Appendix A)(Elfand, Ross)
July 6, 2017 Filing 637 REPLY to Response to #625 MOTION to Dismiss /German Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaints filed by BCBSLA and Humana for Failure to Timely Serve filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Elfand, Ross)
June 23, 2017 Filing 636 NOTICE by Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund Notice of Change of Firm Name, Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C. (Kodroff, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2017 Docket Entry Correction re 635 Order MODIFIED TO NOTE THAT THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN ENTERED IN ERROR (Oliver, T.)
June 19, 2017 Filing 635 ENTERED IN ERROR - ORDER re #634 Stipulation of Dismissal of Parties Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH & Co, KGfiled by Humana, Inc Signed by Clerk on 6/19/2017. (Oliver, T.) Modified on 6/20/2017 (Oliver, T.).
June 16, 2017 Filing 634 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH & Co, KG by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting #630 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David R. Woodward terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/15/2017. (Jamieson, K)
June 8, 2017 Filing 632 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses / Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH.(Elfand, Ross)
June 6, 2017 Filing 631 Memorandum in Opposition re #625 MOTION to Dismiss /German Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaints filed by BCBSLA and Humana for Failure to Timely Serve filed by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of service on German Defendants under The Hague Convention)(Meade, John)
June 5, 2017 Filing 630 MOTION for David Woodward to Withdraw as Attorney by AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund. (Woodward, David)
June 1, 2017 Filing 629 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conferences set forJuly 11, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.September 5, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Dial-in information will be circulated in advanced of each call. (Jamieson, K)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER approving #627 STIPULATION. So ordered. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/31/2017. (Jamieson, K)
May 31, 2017 Answer deadline updated for Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH to June 8, 2017. (Jamieson, K)
May 24, 2017 Filing 627 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH to Respond to the CVS Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. (Elfand, Ross)
May 16, 2017 Filing 626 Memorandum in Support re #625 MOTION to Dismiss /German Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaints filed by BCBSLA and Humana for Failure to Timely Serve filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Elfand, Ross)
May 16, 2017 Filing 625 MOTION to Dismiss /German Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaints filed by BCBSLA and Humana for Failure to Timely Serve by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG.Responses due by 6/6/2017 (Elfand, Ross)
May 3, 2017 Filing 624 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: telephonic status conference. Held on 4-27-2017 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2017. (Masse, S.)
May 2, 2017 Filing 623 CANCELLED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for May 2, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Jamieson, K)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER. The telephone status conference scheduled for today at 3:00 p.m. is cancelled. If discovery issues ripen into disputes that require court involvement, any party may request a phone conference to address those issues. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/02/2017. (Jamieson, K)
May 1, 2017 Filing 621 Joint STATUS REPORT by American Sales Company, LLC. (Sobol, Thomas)
April 28, 2017 Filing 620 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. Notice of Change of Address (Rebuck, Monica)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER. As stated on the record, construed as a motion to compel customer-identifying information, #613 JOINT LETTER is denied. In the sales data to be produced by the National Wholesalers, each customer shall be identified with a unique numeric identifier that can be sorted based on whether the customer is a party or non-party to the litigation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/27/2017. (Jamieson, K)
April 27, 2017 Filing 618 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference re #613 JOINT LETTER held on April 27, 2017. Total Time: 1 hours and 5 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
April 27, 2017 Filing 617 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #599 MOTION for Attorney(s) Holly Letourneau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4310110) by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Orticelli, Bryan)
April 26, 2017 Filing 616 NOTICE by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund re #613 Notice (Other),, End-Payor Plaintiffs' Letter Regarding Defendants' Discovery Dispute with the National Wholesalers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A October 21, 2016 Transcript of Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B Memorandum and Order)(Shadowen, Steven)
April 24, 2017 Filing 615 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference re #613 JOINT LETTER set for April 27, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Jamieson, K)
April 21, 2017 Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan McGurrin Miles on behalf of Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company (Miles, Meaghan)
April 21, 2017 Filing 613 NOTICE by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. / Joint Letter to Judge Underhill from Defendants and National Wholesalers requesting a resolution to a discovery dispute regarding the National Wholesalers' sales data for Aggrenox and its AB-rated bioequivalents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Elfand, Ross)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER approving #610 STIPULATION Extending Time for German Defendants to Respond to Louisiana Health's Complaint until May 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/13/2017. (Jamieson, K)
April 13, 2017 Answer deadline updated for Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. Response to AMENDED COMPLAINT, Doc. No. 6, No. 3:15-cv-00964 (WWE), due May 16, 2017. (Jamieson, K)
April 10, 2017 Filing 611 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Oral Argument on Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Held on 4-3-2017 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2017. (Masse, S.)
April 7, 2017 Filing 610 STIPULATION /Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for German Defendants to Respond to Louisiana Health's Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
April 3, 2017 Filing 609 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on April 3, 2017, taking under advisement #594 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Total Time: 1 hours and 10 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
March 29, 2017 Filing 608 NOTICE re #606 MOTION HEARING on #594 MOTION for Attorney Fees set for April 3, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel other than those arguing the motion who wish to attend telephonically may do so by dialing into the court's conference line. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/29/2017. (Jamieson, K)
March 16, 2017 Filing 607 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. Notice of Name Change (Rebuck, Monica)
March 8, 2017 Filing 606 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing on #594 MOTION for Attorney Fees set for April 3, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Jamieson, K)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Status Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/08/2017. (Jamieson, K)
March 8, 2017 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by September 28, 2017; Dispositive Motions due by June 29, 2018. (Jamieson, K)
March 7, 2017 Filing 604 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on March 7, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 30 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
March 7, 2017 Filing 603 Joint STATUS REPORT by American Sales Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
March 6, 2017 Filing 602 REPLY to Response to #594 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Sarah K. Frederick)(Frederick, Sarah)
March 2, 2017 Filing 601 Memorandum in Opposition BY DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS re #594 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF EPHRAIM R. GERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC.S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 to the GERSTEIN DECLARATION, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 to the GERSTEIN DECLARATION)(Opper, Joseph)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER granting #599 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Clerk on 2/27/17. (Gould, K.)
February 24, 2017 Filing 599 MOTION for Attorney(s) Holly Letourneau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4310110) by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colbert, Richard)
February 24, 2017 Filing 598 CANCELLED 595 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference re #591 & #592 Discovery Dispute set for February 28, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Jamieson, K)
February 14, 2017 Filing 597 Memorandum in Support re #594 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected Memorandum) filed by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Kenney in Support of Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees)(Kenney, Robert)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 596 SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER for Confidential Discovery Material Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/10/2017. (Oliver, T.)
February 10, 2017 Filing 595 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference re #591 & #592 Discovery Dispute set for February 28, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Jamieson, K)
February 9, 2017 Filing 594 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc..Responses due by 3/2/2017 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Kenney in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Kenney Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Kenney Declaration, #4 Declaration of Anna K. Svensson in Support, #5 Affidavit of Angela M. Minoggio in Support, #6 Declaration of Richard Wolf in Support, #7 Affidavit of Gabrielle Yen in Support, #8 Affidavit of Harold Lipton in Support, #9 Memorandum in Support, #10 Certificate of Service)(Kenney, Robert)
February 6, 2017 Filing 593 PROPOSED ORDER re #234 Protective Order /Supplemental [Proposed] Protective Order for Materials Produced by the Three National Wholesalers by all Plaintiffs and Defendants by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
February 3, 2017 Filing 592 RESPONSE re #591 Letter from Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Dated 1/26/2017 Re: Discovery Dispute Regarding Metadata filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Kessler, David)
January 27, 2017 Filing 591 Letter from Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Dated 1/26/2017 Re: Discovery dispute re Metadata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Oliver, T.)
January 24, 2017 Filing 590 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. Held on 1-12-2017 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2017. (Masse, S.)
January 17, 2017 Filing 589 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Alden Meade* *Young Cotter & Meade LLC* *909 Poydrass St., Suite 1600* *New Orleans, LA 70112*. (Oliver, T.)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER granting #584 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J. Douglas Richards terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/17/2017. (Jamieson, K)
January 16, 2017 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Meade, John)
January 13, 2017 Filing 587 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Enger, Eric)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MEMORANDUM of Conference, ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/13/2017. (Landman, M)
January 12, 2017 Filing 585 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference re Third Party Subpoena to GYMA Labs held on January 12, 2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 10 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
January 12, 2017 Filing 584 MOTION for J. Douglas Richards to Withdraw as Attorney by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Richards, J.)
January 11, 2017 Filing 583 NOTICE by Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address (Goldstein, Jayne)
January 11, 2017 Filing 581 RESPONSE re #579 Letter by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc. (Letter addressed to Judge Underhill dated 1/10/17 in Response to Plaintiff's Letter dated 1/4/17). (Kenney, Robert)
January 9, 2017 Filing 582 MANDATE - Petitioners move, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 1292(b), for leave to appeal an interlocutory order of the district court. The nonparty movants move to file amicus curiae briefs. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED the motions to file amicus briefs are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the petition is DENIED. Signed by Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk on 1/9/2017. (Oliver, T.)
January 6, 2017 Filing 580 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference re Third Party Subpoena to GYMA Labs set for January 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is (888) 636-3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650-8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Jamieson, K)
January 5, 2017 Filing 579 Letter from Dan Chiorean Dated 1/4/2017 Re: their non-party subpoena on GYMA Laboratories (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2017 Filing 578 CANCELLED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone status conference scheduled for January 3, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. (Jamieson, K)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER. The telephone status conference scheduled for today at 3:00 p.m. is cancelled. If discovery issues ripen into disputes that require court involvement, any party may request a phone conference to address those issues. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/03/2017. (Jamieson, K)
January 3, 2017 Filing 576 Joint STATUS REPORT for January 3, 2017 by American Sales Company, LLC. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 11, 2016 Filing 575 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference. Held on 11/1/2016 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2017. (Masse, S.)
November 11, 2016 Filing 574 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc of Filing the Stipulated Agreement and Protocol as to Quick Peek Review of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical, Inc. Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kessler, David)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 For the reasons stated on the #568 record, ORDER granting in part and denying in part #525 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Use of Search Terms; granting in part and denying in part #528 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information; denying as moot #499 & #501 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' MOTIONS to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Non-Party Subpoena; and denying as moot #537 MOTION for Costs and Fees. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/04/2016. (Jamieson, K)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE and ORDER re 571 Telephone Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/03/2016. (Jamieson, K)
November 1, 2016 Filing 571 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on November 1, 2016. Total Time: 0 hours and 25 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
November 1, 2016 Filing 570 Joint STATUS REPORT by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
October 21, 2016 Filing 568 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on 10-14-2016 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Masse, S.)
October 19, 2016 Filing 567 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. of Filing Proofs of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (15-cv-00663) Proof of Service on Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma, #2 Exhibit (15-cv-00663) Proof of Service on Boehringer Ingelheim International, #3 Exhibit (16-cv-00159) Proof of Service on Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma, #4 Exhibit (16-cv-00159) Proof of Service on Boehringer Ingelheim International)(Rebuck, Monica)
October 14, 2016 Filing 569 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on October 14, 2016 re #537 Non-Party's MOTION for Cost and Fees, #528 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information, #525 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct a Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents, #501 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Redacted MOTION to Compel MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Non-Party Subpoena, and #499 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sealed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Non-Party Subpoena. Total Time: 3 hours and 0 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Masse). (Jamieson, K)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER granting #561 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/14/2016. (Jamieson, K)
October 11, 2016 Filing 565 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Answer to Amended Complaint of Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company d/b/a Blucross/Blueshield of Louisiana) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Holding, Christopher)
October 11, 2016 Filing 564 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses / Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company d/b/a Bluecross/Blueshield of Louisiana's Amended Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Carney, Peter)
October 11, 2016 Filing 563 REPLY to Response to #537 MOTION for Cost and Fees , #501 MOTION to Compel DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS REDACTED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. REDACTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC., AND IN OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY GYMAS CROSS-MOTION FOR COSTS filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
October 11, 2016 Filing 562 Sealed Document: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC., AND IN OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY GYMAS CROSS-MOTION FOR COSTS by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #537 MOTION for Cost and Fees , #535 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,, . (Opper, Joseph)
October 11, 2016 Filing 561 MOTION to Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC., AND IN OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY GYMAS CROSS-MOTION FOR COSTS by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
October 11, 2016 Filing 560 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy G. Ronan on behalf of Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. (Ronan, Timothy)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER granting #550 & #556 MOTIONS to Seal; granting #555 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/11/2016. (Jamieson, K)
October 7, 2016 Filing 558 Sealed Document: Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information, Declaration of Ross E. Elfand in Support of Defendants' Reply and Exhibit 9, Exhibit 10, Exhibit 11, Exhibit 12 and Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand in Support of Defendants' Reply, #2 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #3 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #4 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #5 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #6 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand)(Elfand, Ross)
October 7, 2016 Filing 557 REPLY to Response to #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information [Redacted] filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand in Support of Defendants' Reply [Redacted], #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted], #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted], #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted], #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted])(Elfand, Ross)
October 7, 2016 Filing 556 MOTION to Seal / Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Elfand, Ross)
October 7, 2016 Filing 555 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elfand, Ross)
October 7, 2016 Filing 554 Sealed Document: Reply Declaration of David J. Kessler by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #553 Sealed Document, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kessler, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 553 Sealed Document: Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Further Support Defendants' Motion to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct a Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents . (Kessler, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 552 AFFIDAVIT re #551 Reply to Response to Motion REDACTED Reply Declaration of David J. Kessler Signed By David J. Kessler filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kessler, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 551 REPLY to Response to #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Kessler, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 550 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct a Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents and Reply Declaration of David J. Kessler by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kessler, David)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER granting #540 & #543 MOTIONS to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/05/2016. (Jamieson, K)
September 30, 2016 Filing 548 Joint RESPONSE re #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by End Payor Plaintiffs and Humana filed by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Meredith Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit B Order on Premium Documents in In Re Solodyn Antitrust Litigation, #3 Exhibit C Order on Premium Documents in In Re Lidoderm Antitrust Litigation, #4 Exhibit D Order on Premium Documents in In Re Suboxone Antitrust Litigation, #5 Exhibit E Transcript and Oral Order on Premium Documents in In Re Cardizem Antitrust Litigation)(Shadowen, Steven)
September 30, 2016 Filing 547 AFFIDAVIT re #542 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #545 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Signed By ADAM STEINFELD (REDACTED) filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 546 Sealed Document: DECLARATION OF ADAM STEINFELD - UNDER SEAL by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #541 Sealed Document, #544 Sealed Document, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 6 UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 8 UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 9 UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 12 UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 13 UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 14 UNDER SEAL)(Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 545 Memorandum in Opposition DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO CONDUCT A REASONABLE SEARCH FOR RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS re #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - REDACTED)(Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 544 Sealed Document: DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO CONDUCT A REASONABLE SEARCH FOR RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 543 MOTION to Seal DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO CONDUCT A REASONABLE SEARCH FOR RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 542 Memorandum in Opposition DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF PLAINTIFFS SALES, PRICING, AND PREMIUM INFORMATION re #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 541 Sealed Document: DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF PLAINTIFFS SALES, PRICING, AND PREMIUM INFORMATION by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information . (Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 540 MOTION to Seal DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF PLAINTIFFS SALES, PRICING, AND PREMIUM INFORMATION by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
September 30, 2016 Filing 539 Memorandum in Opposition re #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information filed by Albertson's LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration)(Perwin, Scott)
September 27, 2016 Filing 538 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc. re #537 MOTION for Cost and Fees (Kenney, Robert)
September 27, 2016 Filing 537 MOTION for Cost and Fees by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc..Responses due by 10/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #4 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #5 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #6 Exhibit D to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #7 Exhibit E to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #8 Exhibit F to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #9 Exhibit G to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #10 Exhibit H to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney)(Kenney, Robert)
September 27, 2016 Filing 536 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc. re #535 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,, (Kenney, Robert)
September 27, 2016 Filing 535 Memorandum in Opposition re #501 MOTION to Compel DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS REDACTED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. filed by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #5 Exhibit D to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #6 Exhibit E to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #7 Exhibit F to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #8 Exhibit G to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney, #9 Exhibit H to Affidavit of Robert J. Kenney)(Kenney, Robert)
September 15, 2016 Filing 534 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM September 22, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Motion Hearing on #525 & #528 MOTIONS to Compel set for October 14, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Jamieson, K)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting #532 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2016 for Plaintiffs to File Response/Reply to #525 & #528 MOTIONS to Compel. Any reply by Defendants shall be filed by October 7, 2016. Oral argument is rescheduled for October 14, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/15/2016. (Jamieson, K)
September 14, 2016 Filing 532 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information, #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents until September 27, 2016 by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER granting #524 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/14/2016. (Jamieson, K)
September 13, 2016 Filing 530 Sealed Document: Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information and Exhibit 43 and Exhibit 44 to the Declaration of Ross E. Elfand by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 43 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #2 44 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand)(Elfand, Ross)
September 13, 2016 Filing 529 PROPOSED ORDER re #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Kessler, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 528 MOTION to Compel / Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 10/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information [Redacted], #2 Revised Appendix A, #3 Revised Appendix B, #4 Revised Appendix C, #5 Revised Appendix D, #6 Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted], #7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #8 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #9 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #10 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #11 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #12 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #13 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #14 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #15 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #16 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #17 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #18 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #19 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #20 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #21 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #22 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #23 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #24 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #25 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #26 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #27 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #28 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #29 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #30 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #31 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #32 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #33 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #34 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #35 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #36 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #37 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #38 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #39 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #40 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #41 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #42 Exhibit 36 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #43 Exhibit 37 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #44 Exhibit 38 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #45 Exhibit 39 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #46 Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #47 Exhibit 41 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #48 Exhibit 42 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #49 Exhibit 43 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted], #50 Exhibit 44 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand [Redacted], #51 Exhibit 45 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #52 Exhibit 46 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #53 Exhibit 47 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #54 Exhibit 48 to Declaration of Ross E. Elfand, #55 Text of Proposed Order)(Elfand, Ross)
September 13, 2016 Filing 527 AFFIDAVIT re #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents Signed By David J. Kessler. Esq filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 31`, #26 Exhibit 32, #27 Exhibit 35)(Kessler, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 526 Memorandum in Support re #525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)(Kessler, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 525 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Conduct A Reasonable Search for Responsive Documents by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 10/4/2016 (Kessler, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 524 MOTION to Seal / Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Elfand, Ross)
September 13, 2016 Filing 523 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference. Held on 9/6/2016 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2016. (Masse, S.)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting #521 Motion for Attorney Ross Elfand to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/11/2016. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2016. (Oliver, T.)
September 9, 2016 Filing 521 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ross Elfand to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4128723) by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ross Elfand)(Colbert, Richard)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MEMORANDUM of Phone Conference, ORDER re 518 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/09/2016. (Jamieson, K)
September 8, 2016 Filing 519 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing re forthcoming Motion to Compel set for 9/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Jamieson, K)
September 7, 2016 Filing 517 ANSWER to #263 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Holding, Christopher)
September 7, 2016 Filing 516 ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses. by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Holding, Christopher)
September 7, 2016 Filing 515 ANSWER to #263 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. / Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Boehringer Defendants to First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Carney, Peter)
September 7, 2016 Filing 514 ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses. / Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial of Humana by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Carney, Peter)
September 6, 2016 Filing 518 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Phone Conference held on 9/6/2016. Total Time: 0 hours and 17 minutes. (Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Jamieson, K)
September 6, 2016 Filing 513 Joint STATUS REPORT for 9/6/2016 Status Conference by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
August 31, 2016 Filing 512 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kenney, Jr on behalf of Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc. (Kenney, Robert)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #510 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #501 MOTION to Compel DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS REDACTED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. Responses due by 9/27/2016. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/30/2016. (Landman, M)
August 26, 2016 Filing 510 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply On Consent as to #501 MOTION to Compel DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS REDACTED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. until September 27,2016 by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc.. (Beard, Walter)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting #506 Motion for Attorney Robert J. Kenney Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2016. (Oliver, T.)
August 22, 2016 Filing 508 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Cameron Beard, III on behalf of Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc. (Beard, Walter)
August 19, 2016 Filing 507 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #506 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert J. Kenney Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4108482) by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc.. (Beard, Walter)
August 19, 2016 Filing 506 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert J. Kenney Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4108482) by Gyma Laboratories of America, Inc.. (Beard, Walter)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER approving #503 Stipulation. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/18/2016. (Landman, M)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER granting #498 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/18/2016. (Landman, M)
August 17, 2016 Filing 503 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the EPP, Humana, and Louisiana Health Plaintiffs' Complaints. by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Milne, Robert)
August 17, 2016 Filing 502 Sealed Document: Sealed Exhibits to the Gerstein Declaration by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #501 MOTION to Compel DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS REDACTED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. . (Opper, Joseph)
August 17, 2016 Filing 501 MOTION to Compel DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS REDACTED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..Responses due by 9/7/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support REDACTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC., #3 Affidavit DECLARATION OF EPHRAIM R. GERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC., #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12)(Opper, Joseph)
August 17, 2016 Filing 500 Sealed Document: MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #499 SEALED MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. . (Opper, Joseph)
August 17, 2016 Filing 499 SEALED MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. by Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. American Sales Company, LLC. (Opper, Joseph) Modified on 8/18/2016 to correct filers (Gould, K.).
August 17, 2016 Filing 498 MOTION to Seal DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENA SERVED UPON GYMA LABORATORIES OF AMERICA, INC. AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS by Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC. (Opper, Joseph) Modified on 8/18/2016 (Gould, K.)to correct filers.
August 16, 2016 Filing 497 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference. Held on 8/9/2016 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. (Masse, S.)
August 16, 2016 Filing 496 Docket Entry Correction... Modifed to correct the dates re #494 SCHEDULING ORDER No. 4(Fact Discovery due by 4/28/2017; Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/19/2018) (Jaiman, R.)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting #493 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/15/2016. (Buttrick, A.)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 SCHEDULING ORDER No. 4 (Fact Discovery due by 4/28/2017; Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/19/2018) Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/15/2016. (Buttrick, A.) Modified on 8/16/2016 (Jaiman, R.).
August 12, 2016 Filing 493 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order No. 4 Order by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schaefer, David)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/10/2016.(Pollack, R.)
August 9, 2016 Filing 491 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Conference held on 8/9/2016. Total Time: 0 hours and 18 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Pollack, R.)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER, granting in part and denying in part #290 , #291 , #374 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/9/2016. (Pollack, R.)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER on Relevant Market Definition:holding that the relevant market in this case is determined by the nature of the challenged agreement, that the only relevant market in this litigation is therefore the market of Aggrenox and its generic equivalents, and that no discovery or evidence relating to other drugs as potential substitutes is relevant;certifying for discretionary appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b); denying #348 , #354 , #363 , #411 discovery motions. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/8/2016. (Pollack, R.)
August 8, 2016 Filing 488 Joint STATUS REPORT for 8/9/2016 Status Conference on Behalf of All Plaintiffs by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Sobol, Thomas)
July 7, 2016 Filing 487 NOTICE by Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund Notice of Withdrawal of Christian M. Sande (Kodroff, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2016 Filing 486 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 7/5/2016.The telephone status conference previously scheduled for 7/5/2016 is rescheduled for 8/9/2016, 03:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Pollack, R.)
June 7, 2016 Filing 485 RESPONSE re #483 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response to Louisiana Health Service and Indemnity Co.'s Amended Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Milne, Robert)
June 7, 2016 Filing 484 RESPONSE re #483 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response to Louisiana Health Service and Indemnity Co.'s Amended Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Milne, Robert)
June 1, 2016 Filing 483 Amended NOTICE by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company re #481 Notice (Other), #374 MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Co.'s Amended Complaint Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Meade, John)
May 20, 2016 Filing 482 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Re: CVS Action 3:16-cv-00351-SRU by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG.(Carney, Peter)
May 16, 2016 Filing 481 NOTICE by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company re #374 MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Co.'s Amended Complaint Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Meade, John)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER approving #477 Stipulation extending time filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/12/2016.(Pollack, R.)
May 11, 2016 Filing 479 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Cowdery on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (Cowdery, James)
May 11, 2016 Filing 478 NOTICE of Appearance by John P D'Ambrosio on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (D'Ambrosio, John)
May 11, 2016 Filing 477 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma Gmbh & Co. KG to Respond to the CVS Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Milne, Robert)
April 27, 2016 Filing 476 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.Telephone conference currently scheduled for 5/3/2016 03:00 PM is CANCELED.Telephone status conference set for: 7/5/2016 03:00 PM,9/6/2016 03:00 PM,11/1/2016 03:00 PM,1/3/2017 03:00 PM,3/7/2017 03:00 PM, and5/2/2017 03:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Dial-in information will be circulated in advanced of each call. (Pollack, R.)
April 22, 2016 Filing 475 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Edward Des Roches on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Des Roches, Stuart)
April 13, 2016 Filing 474 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Re: CVS Action 3:16-cv-00351-SRU by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Carney, Peter)
April 13, 2016 Filing 473 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Re: CVS Action 3:16-cv-00351-SRU by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Holding, Christopher)
April 7, 2016 Filing 472 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Matthew Glantz on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Glantz, Craig)
April 5, 2016 Filing 471 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Chiorean on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Chiorean, Dan)
April 5, 2016 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Mathilde Schmidt on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Schmidt, Anne)
April 1, 2016 Filing 469 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Oral Argument on the Order to Show Cause. Held on 3/31/2016 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2016. (Masse, S.)
March 31, 2016 Filing 468 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Oral arguments on #432 Order to Show Cause held on 3/31/2016. Total Time: 2 hours and 25 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Pollack, R.)
March 30, 2016 Filing 467 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Parties by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Carney, Peter)
March 24, 2016 Answer deadline updated for Barr Lab Inc to 4/13/2016; Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc to 4/13/2016; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc to 4/13/2016; Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc to 4/13/2016; Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp. to 4/13/2016; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to 4/13/2016; Teva Women's Health, Inc. to 4/13/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER approving and adopting #465 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for U.S. Defendants to Respond to the CVS Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/24/2016.(Pollack, R.)
March 23, 2016 Filing 465 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for U.S. Defendants to Respond to the CVS Complaint [Corrected] by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Milne, Robert)
March 23, 2016 Filing 464 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Cowdery on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Cowdery, James)
March 23, 2016 Filing 463 NOTICE of Appearance by John P D'Ambrosio on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (D'Ambrosio, John)
March 22, 2016 Filing 462 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for U.S. Defendants to Respond to the CVS Complaint by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Milne, Robert)
March 15, 2016 Filing 461 RESPONSE re #432 Order to Show Cause DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Holding, Christopher)
March 15, 2016 Filing 460 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED RESPONSE by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund re #439 Response to Order to Show Cause,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9) (Oliver, T.)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting #447 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Attorney Brent W. Landau terminated); granting #450 Motion to Seal; granting #453 Motion to Seal; granting #458 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/14/2016. (Pollack, R.)
March 11, 2016 Filing 458 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply In Further Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holding, Christopher)
March 1, 2016 Filing 457 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN - Case received from Middle District of Pennsylvania case number 1:16-cv-00159-CCC has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:16-cv-00351-SRU as part of MDL #3:14-md-02516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2016. (Oliver, T.)
March 1, 2016 Filing 456 MDL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring cases to the District of Connecticut re: MDL #3:14-md-02516 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2016. (Oliver, T.)
February 26, 2016 Filing 455 RESPONSE re #439 Response to Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,, filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
February 26, 2016 Filing 454 RESPONSE TO #439 Response to Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,, by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund filed by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Sean Nation, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nation Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Nation Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Nation Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Nation Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Nation Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Nation Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Nation Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Nation Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Nation Declaration)(Nation, Donald)
February 26, 2016 Filing 453 MOTION to Seal Portions of End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause; Declaration of D. Sean Nation and Exhibits by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Nation, Donald)
February 26, 2016 Filing 452 RESPONSE TO #439 Response to Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,, by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel C. Simons, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger)(Simons, Daniel)
February 26, 2016 Filing 451 Sealed Document: Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause; Declaration of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #439 Response to Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel C. Simons, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger)(Simons, Daniel)
February 26, 2016 Filing 450 MOTION to Seal Portions of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause; Declaration of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Simons, Daniel)
February 26, 2016 Filing 449 AFFIDAVIT re #448 Response to Order to Show Cause, #432 Order to Show Cause Declaration of Keith Leffler filed by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
February 26, 2016 Filing 448 RESPONSE TO #432 Order to Show Cause by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co filed by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
February 24, 2016 Filing 447 MOTION for Brent W. Landau to Withdraw as Attorney by Cesar Castillo. (Landau, Brent)
February 17, 2016 Filing 446 NOTICE: The telephone conference currently scheduled for 3/1/2016 at 3:00 PM is canceled. The next call after the 3/31/2016 hearing (see doc # 444) will proceed as scheduled on 5/3/2016 at 3:00 PM. (Pollack, R.)
February 8, 2016 Filing 445 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED Memorandum in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #432 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jack E. Pace III, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 1 to Holding Declaration) (Oliver, T.)
February 8, 2016 Filing 444 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral argument on #432 Order to Show Cause set for 3/31/2016, 12:30 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Pollack, R.)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #441 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/8/2016. (Pollack, R.)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #438 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/8/2016. (Pollack, R.)
February 5, 2016 Filing 441 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by Generic Pharmaceutical Association. (Oliver, T.)
February 5, 2016 Filing 440 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Todd Miller on behalf of Generic Pharmaceutical Association (Oliver, T.)
February 5, 2016 Filing 439 RESPONSE TO #432 Order to Show Cause by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jack E. Pace III [Redacted], #2 Exhibit 1 to Pace Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Pace Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Pace Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Pace Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Pace Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Pace Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Pace Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Pace Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Pace Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Pace Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Pace Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Pace Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Pace Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Pace Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Pace Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Pace Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Pace Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Pace Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Pace Declaration, #21 Exhibit 20 to Pace Declaration, #22 Exhibit 21 to Pace Declaration, #23 Exhibit 22 to Pace Declaration, #24 Exhibit 23 to Pace Declaration, #25 Exhibit 24 to Pace Declaration, #26 Exhibit 25 to Pace Declaration, #27 Exhibit 26 to Pace Declaration, #28 Exhibit 27 to Pace Declaration, #29 Exhibit 28 to Pace Declaration, #30 Exhibit 29 to Pace Declaration, #31 Exhibit 30 to Pace Declaration, #32 Exhibit 31 to Pace Declaration, #33 Exhibit 32 to Pace Declaration, #34 Exhibit 33 to Pace Declaration, #35 Exhibit 34 to Pace Declaration, #36 Exhibit 35 to Pace Declaration, #37 Exhibit 36 to Pace Declaration, #38 Declaration of Sumanth Addanki, Ph.D., #39 Declaration of Robert P. Navarro, #40 Exhibit A to Navarro Declaration, #41 Declaration of Christopher T. Holding, #42 Exhibit 1 to Holding Declaration)(Milne, Robert)
February 5, 2016 Filing 438 MOTION to Seal / Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Milne, Robert)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #436 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Court's January 8, 2016 Order to Show Cause #432 on or before February 5, 2016. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition on or before February 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/28/2016. (Pollack, R.)
January 28, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2016. (Pollack, R.)
January 27, 2016 Filing 436 MOTION for Extension of Time Until February 5, 2016 to Respond to the Court's January 8, 2016 Order to Show Cause (UNOPPOSED) #432 Order to Show Cause by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holding, Christopher)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #434 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John E. Iole terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/26/2016. (Pollack, R.)
January 21, 2016 Filing 434 MOTION for John E. Iole to Withdraw as Attorney by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Iole, John)
January 14, 2016 Filing 433 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference. Held on 1-5-2016 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2016. (Masse, S.)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Defendants' Memorandum due by 1/29/2016; any responses due 14 days after that filing. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/8/2016.(Pollack, R.)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 SCHEDULING ORDER No. 3(Fact Discovery due by 10/28/2016; Summary Judgment Motions due by 6/30/2017) Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/8/2016.(Pollack, R.)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #412 Motion to revise scheduling order; denying #413 Motion to revise scheduling order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/8/2016. (Pollack, R.)
January 5, 2016 Filing 429 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Conference held on 1/5/2016. Total Time: 0 hours and 5 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Pollack, R.)
January 5, 2016 Filing 428 Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED AGENDA on behalf of all parties by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER: construing #424 Notice of Withdrawal as a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, the motion is granted. Attorney Karen Leser Grenon terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/10/2015. (Pollack, R.)
December 8, 2015 Filing 426 STATUS REPORT (Statement of Defendants' Position on Market Definition) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Holding, Christopher)
December 8, 2015 Filing 425 STATUS REPORT -- Plaintiffs' Submission Concerning Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Market Power Allegations (on behalf of all plaintiffs) by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Nalven, David)
December 8, 2015 Filing 424 NOTICE MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund of Withdrawal of Karen Leser-Grenon as Counsel of Record (Bennett, Natalie) Modified on 12/10/2015 TO CHANGE THE EVENT TYPE (Oliver, T.).
December 1, 2015 Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on 11-30-2015 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/29/2016. (Masse, S.)
November 30, 2015 Filing 423 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: taking under advisement #374 Motion to Dismiss; as discussed on the record, consideration of the other motions is deferred until the parties propose how to proceed (or otherwise report status) on the question of market definition by Tuesday, December 8. Total Time: 1 hours and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Pollack, R.) Modified on 12/9/2015 (Jaiman, R.).
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting #416 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/30/2015. (Pollack, R.)
November 24, 2015 Filing 420 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. re #411 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Use of Additional Search Terms and Reasonable Search Tools. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 3, #2 Appendix 4, #3 Appendix 5, #4 Affidavit of David J. Kessler, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14) (Oliver, T.)
November 23, 2015 Filing 419 Joint NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #418 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #417 Sealed Document,,, (Gerstein, Ephraim)
November 23, 2015 Filing 418 Memorandum in Opposition REDACTED re #411 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Use of Additional Search Terms and Reasonable Search Tools filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Steinfeld, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Gerstein, Ephraim)
November 23, 2015 Filing 417 Sealed Document: DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS USE OF ADDITIONAL SEARCH TERMS AND REASONABLE SEARCH TOOLS by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #416 MOTION to Seal DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS USE OF ADDITIONAL SEARCH TERMS AND REASONABLE SEARCH TOOLS . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Steinfeld, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Gerstein, Ephraim)
November 23, 2015 Filing 416 MOTION to Seal DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS USE OF ADDITIONAL SEARCH TERMS AND REASONABLE SEARCH TOOLS by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Gerstein, Ephraim)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #410 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/23/2015. (Pollack, R.)
November 20, 2015 Filing 414 REPLY to Response to #374 MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Co.'s Amended Complaint filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
November 17, 2015 Filing 413 MOTION for Entry of a Revised Scheduling Order by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order No. 3)(Carney, Peter)
November 17, 2015 Filing 412 MOTION for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 3 Order by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Albertson's LLC, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Kroger Co., Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order No. 3)(Opper, Joseph)
November 13, 2015 Filing 411 MOTION to Compel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Use of Additional Search Terms and Reasonable Search Tools by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..Responses due by 12/4/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix 1 to Memorandum in Support, #3 Appendix 2 to Memorandum in Support, #4 Appendix 3 to Memorandum in Support, #5 Appendix 4 to Memorandum in Support, #6 Appendix 5 to Memorandum in Support, #7 Affidavit Declaration of David J. Kessler, #8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #12 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #13 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #14 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #15 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #16 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #17 Exhibit 10 to Declaration, #18 Exhibit 11 to Declaration, #19 Exhibit 12 to Declaration, #20 Exhibit 13 to Declaration, #21 Exhibit 14 to Declaration, #22 Text of Proposed Order)(Kessler, David)
November 13, 2015 Filing 410 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel DPPs' Use of Additional Search Terms and Reasonable Search Tools by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Kessler, David)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 CORRECTED CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM and ORDER (correcting date in #404 MEMORANDUM). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/4/2015.(Pollack, R.)
November 6, 2015 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. Held on 11-03-2015 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2016. (Masse, S.)
November 5, 2015 Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Simons on behalf of Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. (Simons, Daniel)
November 4, 2015 Filing 405 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral argument on #348 , #354 , #363 MOTIONS to Compel Discovery; #374 MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Co.'s Amended Complaint, set for 11/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Pollack, R.)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/4/2015.(Pollack, R.)
November 3, 2015 Filing 406 Sealed Document: by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #363 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Oliver, T.)
November 3, 2015 Filing 403 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Status Conference held on 11/3/2015. Total Time: 0 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Pollack, R.)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #399 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/3/2015. (Pollack, R.)
November 3, 2015 Filing 401 Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED AGENDA by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Pia, Gerald)
November 2, 2015 Filing 400 REPLY to Response to #363 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Gallagher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Carney, Peter)
November 2, 2015 Filing 399 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Reply Memorandum In Further Support Of Motion To Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Carney, Peter)
October 30, 2015 Filing 398 Memorandum in Opposition re #374 MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Co.'s Amended Complaint filed by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Meade, John)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting #395 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/26/2015. (Pollack, R.)
October 23, 2015 Filing 396 REPLY to Response to #348 MOTION to Compel DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCT MARKET DISCOVERY filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Sorensen, David)
October 21, 2015 Filing 395 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, Peter)
October 16, 2015 Filing 394 Joint Memorandum in Opposition re #363 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information filed by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Shadowen, Steven)
October 16, 2015 Filing 393 Memorandum in Opposition re #363 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Nalven, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8 to Declaration of David Nalven)(Nalven, David)
October 16, 2015 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Shadowen on behalf of United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund (Shadowen, Steven)
October 16, 2015 Filing 391 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #370 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steve D. Shadowen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3740649) by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Shadowen, Steven)
October 16, 2015 Filing 390 Memorandum in Opposition re #363 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information filed by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
October 14, 2015 Filing 389 Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sumanth Addanki, Ph.D., #2 Affidavit of Jack E. Pace III, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 3)(Oliver, T.)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting #385 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/14/2015. (Pollack, R.)
October 13, 2015 Filing 387 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on 9-24-2015 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Sharon Masse. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2016. (Masse, S.)
October 9, 2015 Filing 386 REPLY to Response to #348 MOTION to Compel Product Market Discovery filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sumanth Addanki, Ph.D., #2 Affidavit of Jack E. Pace III, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Carney, Peter)
October 9, 2015 Filing 385 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Carney, Peter)
October 5, 2015 Filing 384 REPLY to Response to #290 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint End-Payor's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition filed by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Nation, Donald)
October 5, 2015 Filing 383 Supplemental Memorandum in Support re #290 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #291 MOTION to Dismiss Humana, Inc's Second Amended Complaint / Supplemental Memorandum of Law Regarding Illinois Consumer Fraud & Deceptive Business Practices Act Requested at September 24, 2015 Oral Argument re #373 Minute Entry filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
October 2, 2015 Filing 382 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial of Retailer Plaintiffs by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Carney, Peter)
October 2, 2015 Filing 381 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial of Rite Aid by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Carney, Peter)
October 2, 2015 Filing 380 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Re: Rite Aid Action 15-cv-000618 by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Holding, Christopher)
October 2, 2015 Filing 379 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Re: Walgreen Action 15-cv-000559 by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Holding, Christopher)
October 2, 2015 Filing 378 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #363 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information. Responses due by 10/16/2015. (Pollack, R.)
October 2, 2015 Filing 377 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #348 MOTION to Compel . Responses due by 10/9/2015. (Pollack, R.)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER approving #375 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/2/2015.(Pollack, R.)
October 1, 2015 Filing 375 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to File Responses to Defendants' Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery and Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery of Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Carney, Peter)
September 30, 2015 Filing 374 MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Co.'s Amended Complaint by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 10/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gidley, J.)
September 24, 2015 Filing 373 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: taking under advisement #290 Motion to Dismiss; taking under advisement #291 Motion to Dismiss; Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2015. Total Time: 2 hours and 10 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Masse.) (Pollack, R.)
September 23, 2015 Filing 372 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Product Market Documents by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund re #354 SEALED MOTION, #348 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Noelle-Kristen F. Ruggiero, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Oliver, T.)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER granting #370 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven D. Shadowen for United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/22/2015. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/15. (Gould, K.)
September 22, 2015 Filing 370 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steve D. Shadowen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3740649) by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Grenon, Karen)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting #364 and #366 motions to seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/22/2015. (Pollack, R.)
September 21, 2015 Filing 368 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery re #354 SEALED MOTION filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Sorensen, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 367 Sealed Document: Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #354 SEALED MOTION . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Sorensen, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 366 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Sorensen, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 365 Joint RESPONSE re #348 MOTION to Compel Product Market Discovery (End-Payor Plaintiffs' and Humana's Joint Response) filed by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Noelle-Kristen Ruggiero with Exhibits)(Nation, Donald)
September 21, 2015 Filing 364 Joint MOTION to Seal End Payor Plaintiffs' and Humana's Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Nation, Donald)
September 19, 2015 Filing 363 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 10/10/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery of Plaintiffs' Sales, Pricing, and Premium Information, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Appendix D, #6 Affidavit of Michael J. Gallagher, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, Peter)
September 17, 2015 Filing 361 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Sean Nation on behalf of United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund (Nation, Donald)
September 17, 2015 Filing 360 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #357 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald Sean Nation to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3727471) by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Nation, Donald)
September 16, 2015 Filing 362 Mandate : Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 1292(b), petitioners move for leave to appeal an interlocutory order of the district court and for permission to file a reply brief. Respondents move to file a sur-reply brief. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petition is DENIED because animmediate appeal is unwarranted. Signed by Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk, Court of Appeals, Second Circuit on 9/16/2015.(Falcone, K.)
September 14, 2015 Filing 359 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/14/2015.(Pollack, R.)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting #357 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/9/2015. Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2015. (Gould, K.)
September 9, 2015 Filing 357 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald Sean Nation to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3727471) by United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grenon, Karen)
September 9, 2015 Filing 356 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alden Meade on behalf of Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company (Meade, John)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER approving #353 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/8/2015.(Pollack, R.)
September 4, 2015 Filing 353 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for US Defendants to Respond to the Louisiana Health Complaint by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Carney, Peter)
September 1, 2015 Filing 354 SEALED UNREDACTED MOTION RE: #348 REDACTED MOTION by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix A, #3 Affidavit of Peter J. Carney, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliver, T.) Modified on 9/10/2015 (Oliver, T.).
September 1, 2015 Filing 351 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2015. Total Time: 0 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
August 31, 2015 Filing 352 NOTICE of Consolidation Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2015.(Jaiman, R.)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER: #347 Motion to Seal is granted. #343 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time is approved. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/31/2015. (Pollack, R.)
August 31, 2015 Filing 349 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Agenda by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Pia, Gerald)
August 29, 2015 Filing 348 REDACTED MOTION to Compel RE: #354 SEALED UNREDACTED MOTION by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 9/19/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery, #2 Appendix A, #3 Affidavit of Peter J. Carney, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, Peter) Modified on 9/10/2015 (Oliver, T.).
August 29, 2015 Filing 347 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Product Market Discovery by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Carney, Peter)
August 28, 2015 Filing 346 REPLY to Response to #291 MOTION to Dismiss Humana, Inc's Second Amended Complaint / Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
August 28, 2015 Filing 345 REPLY to Response to #290 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint / Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
August 28, 2015 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan James Orticelli on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Orticelli, Bryan)
August 27, 2015 Filing 343 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Retailer Plaintiffs' Complaints by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Carney, Peter)
August 25, 2015 Filing 342 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to #290 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Gould, K.).
August 19, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE OF FILING pursuant to #338 Minutes, by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Refsin, Bary) Modified on 8/20/2015 (Blough, B.).
August 19, 2015 Filing 340 AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING pursuant to #338 Minutes, by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co Corrected #339 Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Perwin, Scott) Modified on 8/20/2015 (Blough, B.).
August 19, 2015 Filing 339 NOTICE by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Perwin, Scott)
August 19, 2015 Filing 338 Minute Entry and ORDER. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: German defendants' #313 / #326 Motion for Joinder is granted in that their joining #269 / #273 Motion to Dismiss is recognized; in any other respect it is denied. For reasons discussed more fully on the record, #269 / #273 Motion to Dismiss is denied. As discussed more fully on the record, #286 Motion for Protective Order is denied as moot based upon agreement made on the record about how to proceed.Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2015 re #286 MOTION for Protective Order, #269 / #273 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailers. Total Time: 2 hours and 0 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
August 17, 2015 Filing 337 RESPONSE re #328 Response,, filed by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Perwin, Scott)
August 17, 2015 Filing 336 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED REPLY TO RESPONSE by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG re #313 MOTION for Joinder re #297 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Barr Lab Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmac. (Oliver, T.)
August 17, 2015 Filing 335 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED RESPONSE by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #310 Notice (Other),. (Oliver, T.)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting #327 Motion to Seal; granting #329 Motion to Seal; granting #331 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/17/2015. (Pollack, R.)
August 17, 2015 Filing 333 RESPONSE re #332 Notice of Additional Authority, Concerning Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 332 Notice of Additional Authority /Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority Concerning Direct Purchaser Plantiffs' Motion For A Protective Order re #286 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pace, Jack)
August 13, 2015 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Response to Retailer Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Response, #2 Exhibit Declaration of SEP)(Perwin, Scott)
August 13, 2015 Filing 330 REPLY to Response to #313 MOTION for Joinder re #297 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Barr Lab Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmac Reply filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jaime M. Crowe, #2 Exhibit #1, #3 Exhibit #2, #4 Exhibit #3, #5 Exhibit #4)(Gidley, J.)
August 13, 2015 Filing 329 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss the Rite Aid Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Gidley, J.)
August 12, 2015 Filing 328 RESPONSE re #310 Notice (Other), filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jaime M. Crowe, #2 Exhibit #1, #3 Exhibit #2, #4 Exhibit #3)(Gidley, J.)
August 12, 2015 Filing 327 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to the Retailer Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
August 11, 2015 Filing 326 SEALED MOTION - UNREDACTED Joinder in Motion to Dismiss the Rite Aid Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Oliver, T.)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #317 , #322 Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/11/2015. (Pollack, R.)
August 10, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Allen Chorush on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chorush, Russell)
August 7, 2015 Filing 323 Memorandum in Opposition re #290 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Fanning, Lori)
August 7, 2015 Filing 322 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted End Payor Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Fanning, Lori)
August 7, 2015 Filing 321 Memorandum in Opposition re #291 MOTION to Dismiss Humana, Inc's Second Amended Complaint filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
August 7, 2015 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Miranda Yan Jones on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Miranda)
August 6, 2015 Filing 319 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED Opposition by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. re #313 MOTION for Joinder re #297 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Barr Lab Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmac. (Oliver, T.)
August 5, 2015 Filing 318 Memorandum in Opposition Rite Aid Plaintiffs' Opposition to Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG's Joinder in Motion to Dismiss the Rite Aid Complaint re #313 MOTION for Joinder re #297 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Barr Lab Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmac filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Refsin, Bary)
August 5, 2015 Filing 317 MOTION to Seal Rite Aid Plaintiffs' Opposition to Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG's Joinder in Motion to Dismiss the Rite Aid Complaint by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Refsin, Bary)
August 4, 2015 Filing 316 REPLY to Response to #286 MOTION for Protective Order Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For A Protective Order Quashing Subpoenas Served On Absent Class Members Or Directing Defendants To Withdraw The Subpoenas They Served On Absent Class Members filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sorensen, David)
August 4, 2015 Filing 315 Supplemental Memorandum in Support re #286 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #312 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/4/2015. (Freuden, S.)
July 31, 2015 Filing 313 MOTION for Joinder re #297 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Barr Lab Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Women's Health, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, #269 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailers filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Barr Lab Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Women's Health, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Gidley, J.)
July 31, 2015 Filing 312 MOTION to Seal Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG's Joinder in Motion to Dismiss the Rite Aid Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG. (Gidley, J.)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER:The defendants' motion (doc. #236 ) to certify the March 23, 2015 Order (doc. #229 ) for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is granted. The March 23 order, as expanded and clarified by this order, is certified for interlocutory review. If a party wishes to pursue that appeal, that party has ten days from the date of this order to apply for review to the Second Circuit, which may, in its discretion, grant review on any portion of the order or none at all.The defendants do not seek a stay of the district court proceedings, and I do not grant one. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/21/2015. (Pollack, R.)
July 20, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint)(Perwin, Scott)
July 16, 2015 Filing 309 Sealed Document: UNREDACTED OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. re #286 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jaime. M. Crowe, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44) (Oliver, T.)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #306 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/15/2015. (Pollack, R.)
July 14, 2015 Filing 307 Memorandum in Opposition re #286 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jaime M. Crowe, #2 Exhibit 1-44)(Carney, Peter)
July 14, 2015 Filing 306 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Carney, Peter)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting #304 Motion for Extension of Time until July 14 to File an Opposition to #286 MOTION for Protective Order, and until August 4 to file a subsequent Reply. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/9/2015. (Pollack, R.)
July 9, 2015 Filing 304 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #286 MOTION for Protective Order until July 14 and August 4, 2015 by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Gidley, J.)
July 7, 2015 Filing 303 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/7/2015. Total Time: 0 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
July 7, 2015 Filing 302 Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Oliver, T.)
July 7, 2015 Filing 301 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION.Oral argument on #291 MOTION to Dismiss Humana, Inc's Second Amended Complaint and #290 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint set for 9/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Pollack, R.)
July 7, 2015 Filing 300 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral argument on #286 MOTION for Protective Order, #269 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailers, #273 SEALED MOTION set for 8/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Pollack, R.)
July 7, 2015 Filing 299 MEMORANDUM of Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/7/2015.(Pollack, R.)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #296 Motion to File Reply Memorandum Under Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/7/2015. (Pollack, R.)
July 6, 2015 Filing 297 REPLY to Response to #269 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailers filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
July 6, 2015 Filing 296 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailer Plaintiffs by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
July 2, 2015 Filing 295 Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of all parties by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #293 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Derek Y. Brandt terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/1/2015. (Pollack, R.)
June 29, 2015 Filing 293 MOTION for Derek Y. Brandt to Withdraw as Attorney by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Brandt, Derek)
June 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #284 Motion to Seal; granting #288 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Memorandum Under Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/26/2015. (Pollack, R.)
June 26, 2015 Filing 291 MOTION to Dismiss Humana, Inc's Second Amended Complaint by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..Responses due by 7/17/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gidley, J.)
June 26, 2015 Filing 290 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..Responses due by 7/17/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gidley, J.)
June 23, 2015 Filing 289 Sealed Document by Rite Aid Corporation, Walgreen Co re #288 MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Seal. (Oliver, T.)
June 22, 2015 Filing 288 MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Seal by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Filing 287 Memorandum in Opposition (Public Version) re #269 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailers filed by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
June 19, 2015 Filing 286 MOTION for Protective Order by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..Responses due by 7/10/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit DECLARATION OF EPHRAIM R. GERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENAS SERVED ON ABSENT CLASS MEMBERS OR DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW THE SUBPOENAS THEY SERVED ON ABSENT CLASS MEMBERS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T)(Opper, Joseph)
June 19, 2015 Filing 285 Sealed Document: DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENAS SERVED ON ABSENT CLASS MEMBERS OR DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW THE SUBPOENAS AND DECLARATION by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #284 MOTION to Seal Documents . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Opper, Joseph)
June 19, 2015 Filing 284 MOTION to Seal Documents by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
June 18, 2015 Filing 283 NOTICE by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co of Filing Proofs of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proofs of Service)(Perwin, Scott)
June 12, 2015 Filing 282 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re 281 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Colbert, Richard)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #279 Motion for Attorney Michael J. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/10/2015. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2015. (Oliver, T.)
June 10, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re 278 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, (Colbert, Richard)
June 10, 2015 Filing 279 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3631149) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colbert, Richard)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #277 Motion for Jaime M. Crowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jaime M. Crowe for Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/9/2015. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2015. (Oliver, T.)
June 9, 2015 Filing 277 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3630021) by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colbert, Richard)
June 8, 2015 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Eisler on behalf of Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund (Eisler, Robert)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting #271 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/5/2015. (Pollack, R.)
June 2, 2015 Filing 274 UNREDACTED Sealed Document: by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Oliver, T.)
June 2, 2015 Filing 273 UNREDACTED SEALED MOTION by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Oliver, T.)
June 2, 2015 Filing 272 UNREDACTED Sealed Document: by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Oliver, T.)
June 2, 2015 Filing 271 UNREDACTED UNOPPOSED SEALED MOTION by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Oliver, T.)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting #268 Motion to file unredacted copy under seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/2/2015. (Pollack, R.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 269 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailers by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Defs' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jack E. Pace III)(Gidley, J.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 268 MOTION to Seal Motion to Dismiss the Complaints filed by Six Retailers by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #266 Motion to Withdraw #260 Motion; denying #260 as moot. ORDER granting #261 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter Anthony Barile, III terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/18/2015. (Pollack, R.)
May 17, 2015 Filing 266 MOTION to Withdraw #260 MOTION for Bradley J. Demuth to Withdraw as Attorney of Grant & Eisenhofer by Cesar Castillo. (Barile, Peter)
May 15, 2015 Filing 265 ANSWER to #105 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Carney, Peter)
May 15, 2015 Filing 264 ANSWER to #105 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. (Answer to Direct-Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Holding, Christopher)
May 15, 2015 Filing 263 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan.(Buchman, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Filing 262 Memorandum in Opposition re #260 MOTION for Bradley J. Demuth to Withdraw as Attorney of Grant & Eisenhofer filed by Cesar Castillo. (Demuth, Bradley)
May 15, 2015 Filing 261 MOTION for Peter A. Barile III to Withdraw as Attorney by Cesar Castillo. (Barile, Peter)
May 15, 2015 Filing 260 MOTION for Bradley J. Demuth to Withdraw as Attorney of Grant & Eisenhofer by Cesar Castillo. (Barile, Peter)
May 8, 2015 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Brooks on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Brooks, Brian)
May 7, 2015 Filing 258 REPLY to Response to #236 MOTION to Certify the March 23, 2015 Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #229 filed by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
May 7, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L. Bloom on behalf of Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. (Bloom, Eric)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER approving #253 Stipulation and Consent Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/6/2015.(Pollack, R.)
May 6, 2015 Filing 255 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/6/2015.(Pollack, R.)
May 5, 2015 Filing 254 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2015. Total Time: 0 hours and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
May 5, 2015 Filing 253 Joint STIPULATION and Consent Order Regarding Scheduling of Retailer Plaintiffs' Actions by Albertson's LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Kroger Co., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Refsin, Bary)
May 1, 2015 Filing 252 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Agenda, on behalf of all parties, by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
April 29, 2015 Filing 251 NOTICE by Cesar Castillo of Change of Firm Affiliation (Nussbaum, Linda)
April 27, 2015 Filing 250 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN - Case received from Pennsylvania Middle case number 1:15-cv-00663 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:15-cv-00618-SRU as part of MDL #3:14-md-02516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2015. (Oliver, T.)
April 27, 2015 Filing 249 MDL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring cases to the District of Connecticut re: MDL #3:14-md-02516-SRU for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2015. (Oliver, T.)
April 27, 2015 Filing 248 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition re #236 MOTION to Certify the March 23, 2015 Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #229 filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
April 23, 2015 Filing 247 Memorandum in Opposition re #236 MOTION to Certify the March 23, 2015 Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #229 filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Fanning, Lori)
April 23, 2015 Filing 246 Memorandum in Opposition re #236 MOTION to Certify the March 23, 2015 Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #229 filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Opper, Joseph)
April 16, 2015 Filing 245 MDL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring cases to the District of Connecticut re: MDL #3:14-md-2516 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhil Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2015. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2015 Filing 244 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN - Case received from Middle District of Pennsylvania case number 1:15-cv-00604 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:15-cv-559 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2015. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/16/2015.(Pollack, R.)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #240 motion for entry of plaintiffs' proposed scheduling order, except with trial date of June 12, 2017; denying as moot #241 motion for entry of revised scheduling order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/16/2015. (Pollack, R.)
April 14, 2015 Filing 241 MOTION for Entry of a Revised Scheduling Order by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, J.)
April 14, 2015 Filing 240 MOTION for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 2 by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order)(Opper, Joseph)
April 13, 2015 Filing 239 AMENDED COMPLAINT Humana Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint against Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed by Humana, Inc.(St. Phillip, Peter)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #237 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam Steinfeld terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/8/2015. (Pollack, R.)
April 6, 2015 Filing 237 MOTION for Adam Steinfeld to Withdraw as Attorney by Cesar Castillo. (Nussbaum, Linda)
April 2, 2015 Filing 236 MOTION to Certify the March 23, 2015 Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #229 by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 4/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Certify the March 23, 2015 Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b))(Gidley, J.)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Governing Protocol for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Hard Copy Documents Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/24/2015. (Oliver, T.)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 PROTECTIVE ORDER for CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY MATERIAL Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/24/2015. (Oliver, T.)
March 25, 2015 Filing 233 NOTICE by Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund (Withdrawal of Appearance of Jacob A. Goldberg) (Coren, Michael)
March 24, 2015 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/24/2015.(Pollack, R.)
March 24, 2015 Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Status Conference held on 3/24/2015. Total Time: 0 hours and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
March 24, 2015 Filing 230 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Agenda by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Pia, Gerald)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER: For reasons discussed herein,(1) Teva Israel's motion to dismiss all complaints against it under Rule 12(b)(2) #150 is granted without prejudice; (2) the defendants' motion to dismiss the direct-purchaser complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) #149 is denied in substantial part; (3) the defendants' motion to dismiss the indirect-purchaser complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) #151 is granted in part and denied in part; and (4) the defendants' motion to dismiss the Humana complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) #152 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/23/2015. (Pollack, R.)
February 27, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.RESET FROM 3/3/2015. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/24/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (conference previously set for 3/3/2015 is postponed). Counsel for parties participating in the telephone status conference shall circulate a call-in number or call chambers at 203-579-5506 with all participating counsel on the line. (Pollack, R.)
February 6, 2015 Filing 227 RESPONSE re #226 Notice of Additional Authority,,,,,,,, filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gidley, J.)
February 4, 2015 Filing 226 Notice of Additional Authority re #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Pia, Gerald)
January 5, 2015 Filing 225 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Agenda by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
November 21, 2014 Filing 224 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY RELEVANT TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
November 19, 2014 Filing 223 Notice of Additional Authority re #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pia, Gerald)
November 5, 2014 Filing 222 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/4/2014. Total Time: 0 hours and 30 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Conference, ORDER: Proposed Orders #208 and #209 are entered as orders of the court, and the present stay of discovery will be maintained, but the parties should begin the meet and confer process with respect to discovery requests previously served. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/4/2014.(Pollack, R.)
November 3, 2014 Filing 220 Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of all parties by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
October 27, 2014 Filing 219 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2014 re: #149 MOTION to Dismiss, #150 MOTION to Dismiss, #151 MOTION to Dismiss, and #152 MOTION to Dismiss. All motions taken under advisement. Total Time: 3 hours and 45 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.) Modified on 11/6/2014 (Jaiman, R.).
October 8, 2014 Filing 218 Notice of Additional Authority re #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gidley, J.)
September 30, 2014 Filing 217 Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc re #213 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Walker, A)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #212 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/29/2014. (Pollack, R.)
September 26, 2014 Filing 215 REPLY to Response to #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Gidley, J.)
September 26, 2014 Filing 214 REPLY to Response to #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Gidley, J.)
September 26, 2014 Filing 213 REPLY to Response to #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Redacted) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Gidley, J.)
September 26, 2014 Filing 212 MOTION to Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Gidley, J.)
September 26, 2014 Filing 211 REPLY to Response to #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Holding in Support of Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.'s Reply In Support of It's Motion Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit)(Holding, Christopher)
September 26, 2014 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #206 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert D. Carroll to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3367040) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Carroll, Robert)
September 24, 2014 Filing 209 PROPOSED ORDER re 201 Order on Motion for Order, #204 Memorandum of Conference, 200 Order on Motion for Order by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Carney, Peter)
September 24, 2014 Filing 208 PROPOSED ORDER re 198 Order on Motion for Protective Order, #204 Memorandum of Conference, 199 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Carney, Peter)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Motion for Attorney Robert D. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/23/2014. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2014. (Oliver, T.)
September 23, 2014 Filing 206 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert D. Carroll to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3367040) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert D. Carroll, Esq.)(Holding, Christopher)
September 19, 2014 Filing 205 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition re #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Lipitor Opinion, #2 Nexium Opinion)(Opper, Joseph)
September 17, 2014 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Status Conference held on 9/10/2014. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/17/2014.(Pollack, R.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting in substantial part and denying in part, as stated on the record, #195 Motion to Stay. Defendant shall provide transcripts and exhibits from FTC proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/11/2014. (Pollack, R.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as stated on the record, #166 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/11/2014. (Pollack, R.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as stated on the record, #165 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/11/2014. (Pollack, R.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as stated on the record, #161 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/11/2014. (Pollack, R.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as stated on the record, #160 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/11/2014. (Pollack, R.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill, regarding #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/11/2014.(Pollack, R.)
September 10, 2014 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2014. Total Time: 1 hours and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Pollack, R.)
September 9, 2014 Filing 196 Joint STATUS REPORT of ALL PARTIES by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Milne, Robert)
August 29, 2014 Filing 195 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 9/19/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Milne, Robert)
August 28, 2014 Filing 194 Memorandum in Opposition REDACTED VERSION re #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Gerstein, Ephraim)
August 27, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Uriel Rabinovitz on behalf of Humana, Inc (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
August 27, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Daniels on behalf of Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs (Daniels, Brian)
August 26, 2014 Filing 192 Sealed Document: Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Corrected Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Oliver, T.)
August 26, 2014 Filing 190 Memorandum in Opposition re #166 MOTION for Entry of a Proposed ESI Protocol Order filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Silverman, Noah)
August 26, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 9/2/2014 Status Conference set for 9/10/2014 02:00 PM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel for parties participating in the telephone status conference shall call chambers at 203-579-5714 with all participating counsel on the line (Martin, M.)
August 26, 2014 Filing 188 Sealed Document: Plaintiff's Humana Inc,'s Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Humana, Inc re #181 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED HUMANA INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULES 12(B)(2) AND 12(B)(6). (Basha, D.)
August 26, 2014 Filing 187 Sealed Document: Plaintiff's Humana Inc,'s Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Humana, Inc re #179 MOTION to Seal HUMANA INC.'S UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT. (Basha, D.) Modified on 8/26/2014 (Basha, D.).
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Seal; granting #179 Motion to Seal; granting #181 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/26/2014. (Oliver, T.)
August 26, 2014 MDL NOTICE to MDL Panel of Dismissal of Member Case 3:14-cv-467-SRU Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2014. (Oliver, T.)
August 25, 2014 Filing 185 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Humana, Inc Certificate of Service of Humana Inc.'s [Redacted] Memoranda of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
August 25, 2014 Filing 184 Memorandum in Opposition , CORRECTED, re #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
August 25, 2014 Filing 183 REPLY to Response to #165 MOTION for Order Governing Protocol For Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information And Hard Copy Documents Order filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Silverman, Noah)
August 22, 2014 Filing 182 Memorandum in Opposition End Payor Class Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (w/ Certificate of Service) re #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix A)(Buchman, Michael)
August 22, 2014 Filing 181 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED HUMANA INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULES 12(B)(2) AND 12(B)(6) by Humana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(St. Phillip, Peter)
August 22, 2014 Filing 180 Memorandum in Opposition REDACTED HUMANA INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMCEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULES 12(B)(2) AND 12(B)(6) re #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
August 22, 2014 Filing 179 MOTION to Seal HUMANA INC.'S UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT by Humana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(St. Phillip, Peter)
August 22, 2014 Filing 178 Memorandum in Opposition REDACTED HUMANA INC'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT re #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
August 22, 2014 Filing 177 Memorandum in Opposition End-Payor Class Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) re #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits #s 1-11, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Buchman, Michael)
August 22, 2014 Filing 176 Memorandum in Opposition re #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Sorensen, David)
August 22, 2014 Filing 175 Memorandum in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Roche, Brian)
August 22, 2014 Filing 174 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Roche, Brian)
August 22, 2014 Filing 173 Set/Reset Deadlines for #149 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 8/29/2014. (Pannu, C.)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #149 MOTION to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by 8/29/2014. Responses due 8/29/2014. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/22/2014. (Pannu, C.)
August 21, 2014 Filing 171 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint until August 29, 2014 by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Roche, Brian)
August 20, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A. Westby on behalf of Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. and Certificate of Service (Westby, Sarah)
August 15, 2014 Filing 169 Memorandum in Opposition re #165 MOTION for Order Governing Protocol For Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information And Hard Copy Documents Order filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kessler, David)
August 12, 2014 Filing 168 Sealed Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Sealed Unredacted Affidavit of Alison Hanstead, #2 Sealed Unredacted Exhibit B, #3 Sealed Unredacted Exhibit C, #4 Sealed Unredacted Exhibit D)(Blough, B.)
August 11, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to #151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), #149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Responses due by 8/22/2014 (Oliver, T.)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motions to dismiss on or before August 22, 2014. Defendants shall file any replies in further support of the motions to dismiss on or before September 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/11/2014. (Martin, M.)
August 8, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION for Entry of a Proposed ESI Protocol Order by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in support of motion, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Proposed ESI Protocol, #3 Exhibit Comparison with Plaintiffs' ESI Protocol, #4 Exhibit Article: Grammel - Protecting Search Terms As Opinion Work Product, #5 Exhibit Article: Boehning - No Disclosure: Why Search Terms Are Worthy of Courts Protection, #6 Exhibit Article: Kessler - Article: Search Terms Are More Than Mere Words, #7 Exhibit Article: Judge Francis - Judicial Modesty)(Kessler, David)
August 8, 2014 Filing 165 MOTION for Order Governing Protocol For Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information And Hard Copy Documents Order by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Professional Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Of Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Governing Protocol For Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information And Hard Copy Documents, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1 - Order Governing Protocol For Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information And Hard Copy Documents, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - FTC Brief IN SUPPORT OF PETITION OF THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING A SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Exhibit 3 - MDL No. 2385 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 50, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 09-MC-00564 Status Hearing, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 09-MC-00564 FTC RESPONSE TO ORDER AND)(Opper, Joseph)
August 8, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 22, 2014; September 19, 2014 #149 Motion to Dismiss Opposition and Reply briefs, #150 Motion to Dismiss, #151 Motion to Dismiss, #152 Motion to Dismiss by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Carney, Peter) Modified on 8/11/2014 TO LINK TO DOC #149 - #152 (Oliver, T.).
July 30, 2014 Filing 162 RESPONSE re #160 MOTION for Protective Order By All Plaintiffs / Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gidley, J.)
July 25, 2014 Filing 161 MOTION for Protective Order by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.Responses due by 8/15/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Carney, Peter)
July 25, 2014 Filing 160 MOTION for Protective Order By All Plaintiffs by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..Responses due by 8/15/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A-C)(Curley, Andrew)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/25/2014. (Martin, M.)
July 24, 2014 Filing 158 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 8, 2014 to file Proposed ESI Order by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
July 21, 2014 Filing 157 Sealed Document: by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Payton, R.)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #148 Motion to Seal/ Unopposed Motion to File Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and Certain Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/21/2014. (Jaiman, R.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 8/5/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s Amended Complaint)(Gidley, J.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 151 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 8/5/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Gidley, J.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd..Responses due by 8/5/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), #2 Affidavit of Dov Primovich, #3 Affidavit of Christopher Holding in Support of Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Holding, Christopher)
July 15, 2014 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 8/5/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint [Redacted Public Copy], #2 Affidavit of Alison Hanstead [Redacted Public Copy], #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B [Filed Under Seal], #5 Exhibit C [Filed Under Seal], #6 Exhibit D [Filed Under Seal], #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V)(Gidley, J.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION to Seal / Unopposed Motion to File Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and Certain Exhibits Under Seal by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gidley, J.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T Holding on behalf of Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Holding, Christopher)
July 15, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Leddicotte on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (Leddicotte, Matthew)
July 15, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Hanstead on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (Hanstead, Alison)
July 15, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Pace, III on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (Pace, Jack)
July 15, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Milne on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (Milne, Robert)
July 15, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Carney on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (Carney, Peter)
July 15, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Mark Gidley on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG (Gidley, J.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Leddicotte on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Leddicotte, Matthew)
July 15, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Pace, III on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Pace, Jack)
July 15, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Carney on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Carney, Peter)
July 15, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Mark Gidley on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Gidley, J.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah K. Frederick on behalf of Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Frederick, Sarah)
July 15, 2014 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #129 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah K. Fredrick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3301015) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Frederick, Sarah)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Attorney Sarah K. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/9/2014. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/11/2014. (Freuden, S.)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James T. Cowdery and John P D'Ambrosio terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/11/2014. (Freuden, S.)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/11/2014. (Freuden, S.)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/11/2014. (Freuden, S.)
July 11, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay L. Himes on behalf of Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund (Blough, B.)
July 11, 2014 Filing 129 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah K. Frederick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3301015) by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Holding, Christopher) Modified on 7/11/2014 to correct spelling of attorney's name (Grady, B.).
July 2, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by David Kessler on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Kessler, David)
July 2, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust (Miles, Timothy)
July 1, 2014 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: TelephoneStatus Conference held on 7/1/2014. 15 minutes (Jaiman, R.)
July 1, 2014 Filing 126 Joint STATUS REPORT OF ALL PARTIES, filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
June 30, 2014 Filing 125 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc waiver sent on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/15/2014 filed by Humana, Inc. (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
June 30, 2014 Filing 124 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Barr Lab Inc waiver sent on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/15/2014 filed by Humana, Inc. (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
June 30, 2014 Filing 123 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc waiver sent on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/15/2014 filed by Humana, Inc. (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
June 30, 2014 Filing 122 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/15/2014 filed by Humana, Inc. (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
June 30, 2014 Filing 121 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp. waiver sent on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/15/2014 filed by Humana, Inc. (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
June 27, 2014 Filing 120 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected End-Payor Consolidated Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Buchman, Michael)
June 25, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Perez on behalf of Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund (Corriette, M.)
June 25, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Asciolla on behalf of Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund (Corriette, M.)
June 25, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Belfi on behalf of Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund (Corriette, M.)
June 25, 2014 Filing 119 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc waiver sent on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/15/2014 filed by Humana, Inc. (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ingrid L. Moll terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/23/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
June 20, 2014 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Humana, Inc re #99 Amended Complaint, for Service on Attorneys General for Oregon, Arizona and Rhode Island (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
June 20, 2014 Filing 115 MOTION for Ingrid L. Moll to Withdraw as Attorney by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund. (Jasinski, Mathew)
June 18, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. of Filing of Summons Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sorensen, David)
June 18, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE by Miami-Luken, Inc. of Filing of Affidavit of Service / Summons Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2))(Verrier, Keith)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin M. Schmidt; Paul J. Koob and Edward D. Rogers terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/18/2014. (Jaiman, R.)
June 18, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Verrier on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Verrier, Keith)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph E. Wolfson terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/18/2014. (Jaiman, R.)
June 18, 2014 Filing 109 Sealed Document: Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Payton, R.)
June 18, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi M. Drewes-Silton on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund (Drewes-Silton, Heidi)
June 18, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Hanson Riebel on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund (Riebel, Karen)
June 17, 2014 Filing 106 MOTION for James T. Cowdery and John P. D'Ambrosio to Withdraw as Attorney by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Cowdery, James)
June 17, 2014 Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT , UNREDACTED and CORRECTED, against All Defendants, filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc..(Pia, Gerald)
June 17, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Ann Fanning on behalf of Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund (Fanning, Lori)
June 17, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Colbert on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Colbert, Richard)
June 17, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Marvin A. Miller on behalf of Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund (Miller, Marvin)
June 17, 2014 Filing 101 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Buchman, Michael)
June 16, 2014 Filing 99 AMENDED COMPLAINT REDACTED against Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed by Humana, Inc.(St. Phillip, Peter)
June 16, 2014 Filing 98 AMENDED COMPLAINT , UNREDACTED, against All Defendants, filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc..(Pia, Gerald)
June 16, 2014 Filing 97 AMENDED COMPLAINT , REDACTED, against All Defendants, filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc..(Pia, Gerald)
June 16, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Consolidated Amended Complaint by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pia, Gerald)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER finding as moot #46 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #60 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/16/2014. (Martin, M.)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Order; finding as moot #32 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #85 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/16/2014. (Martin, M.)
June 16, 2014 Filing 93 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed by Humana, Inc.(St. Phillip, Peter)
June 16, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Leser Grenon on behalf of United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund (Grenon, Karen)
June 12, 2014 Filing 88 MOTION for Edward D. Rogers, Benjamin M. Schmidt, and Paul J. Koob to Withdraw as Attorney by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Schmidt, Benjamin)
June 11, 2014 Filing 117 MDL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring cases to the District of Connecticut re: MDL #3:14-md-2516 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2014. (Corriette, M.)
June 4, 2014 Filing 87 MOTION for Joseph Wolfson to Withdraw as Attorney by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Villano, P.)
June 4, 2014 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Pretrial Hearing. Held on 4/22/14 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014. (Catucci, S.)
June 2, 2014 Filing 85 MOTION for Appointment of Interim Direct Purchaser Class Counsel Order by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Pia, Gerald)
May 30, 2014 Filing 84 PROPOSED ORDER re #83 Scheduling Order to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Interim Liaison Counsel for the End-Payor Class by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Buchman, Michael)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/30/2014. (Martin, M.)
May 29, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Assaf Ze'ev Ben-Atar on behalf of Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Ben-Atar, Assaf)
May 29, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E Gerstein on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. and Certificate of Service (Gerstein, Bruce)
May 28, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Status Conference set for: 7/1/2014 03:00 PM, 9/2/2014 03:00 PM, 11/4/2014 03:00 PM, 1/6/2015 03:00 PM, 3/3/2015 03:00 PM, 5/5/2015 03:00 PM, 7/7/2015 03:00 PM, 9/1/2015 03:00 PM, 11/3/2015 03:00 PM, 1/5/2016 03:00 PM, 3/1/2016 03:00 PM, 5/3/2016 03:00 PM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel for parties participating in the telephone status conference shall call chambers at 203-579-5714 with all participating counsel on the line. (Martin, M.)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erick Ignacio Diaz-Vazquez and Richard Eugene Hayber terminated; granting #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erick Ignacio Diaz-Vazquez and Richard Eugene Hayber terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/22/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 22, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lawrence on behalf of Humana, Inc (Lawrence, Gerald)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney A. Luke Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/22/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 22, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon K. Robertson on behalf of Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R (Robertson, Sharon)
May 22, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Sobol on behalf of American Sales Company, LLC (Sobol, Thomas)
May 21, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #37 Order, #66 Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Milne, Robert)
May 21, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Milne on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Milne, Robert)
May 21, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Giffords Kurtz on behalf of Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund (Kurtz, Adam)
May 21, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE by Humana, Inc OF INTENTION TO DISCUSS PRETRIAL COORDINATION UNDER 28 USC 1407(A) AT MAY 22, 2014 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Ruggiero, Noelle-Kristen)
May 21, 2014 Filing 70 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re #32 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, Signed By Joseph Opper filed by Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Opper, Joseph)
May 21, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Hanstead on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc (Hanstead, Alison)
May 21, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Douglas Richards on behalf of Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R (Richards, J.)
May 21, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Cohen on behalf of Humana, Inc (Cohen, Richard)
May 21, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation, American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Humana, Inc, IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Miami-Luken, Inc., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, Neca-Ibew Welfare Trust Fund, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R re Plaintiffs' Initial Pretrial Conference Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Pia, Gerald)
May 21, 2014 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to #32 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Cesar Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - H)(Schaefer, David)
May 21, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Nalven on behalf of American Sales Company, LLC (Nalven, David)
May 20, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION for Erick I. Diaz Vasquez to Withdraw as Attorney by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Diaz-Vazquez, Erick)
May 20, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION for Richard E. Hayber to Withdraw as Attorney by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Hayber, Richard)
May 19, 2014 Filing 61 Memorandum in Support re #60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Narwold, William)
May 19, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Narwold, William)
May 19, 2014 Filing 59 Supplemental Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order filed by American Sales Company, LLC. (Pia, Gerald)
May 16, 2014 Filing 58 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Sorensen, David)
May 16, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin R. Leger on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Leger, Erin)
May 16, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Raphael, Jr on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Raphael, David)
May 15, 2014 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition re #32 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOSEPH OPPER IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION OF MIAMI-LUKEN, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., AND AMERICAN SALES COMPANY, LLC FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 AND IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION OF CESAR CASTILLO, INC. FOR APPOINTMENT OF GRANT & EISENHOFER P.A. AS INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND BRENNER, SALTZMAN & WALLMAN LLP AS LIAISON COUNSEL, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28)(Opper, Joseph)
May 15, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith S. Dubanevich on behalf of AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund (Dubanevich, Keith)
May 14, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION for Alfred Luke Smith to Withdraw as Attorney by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Kohn, Peter)
May 14, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Gerstein on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. and Certificate of Service (Gerstein, Jonathan)
May 14, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Ephraim R. Gerstein on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. and Certificate of Service (Gerstein, Ephraim)
May 14, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Opper on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. and Certificate of Service (Opper, Joseph)
May 13, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Narwold on behalf of A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund (Narwold, William)
May 12, 2014 Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER re #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
May 12, 2014 Filing 47 Memorandum in Support re #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
May 12, 2014 Filing 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Humana, Inc. (St. Phillip, Peter)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/7/2014. (Pannu, C.)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael K. Murray terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/7/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 2, 2014 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brent W. Landau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3228557) by Cesar Castillo. (Landau, Brent)
May 2, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent W. Landau on behalf of Cesar Castillo (Landau, Brent)
May 1, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Shearin on behalf of Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Shearin, James)
May 1, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION for Michael K. Murray to Withdraw as Attorney by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Murray, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T Holding on behalf of Barr Lab Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Holding, Christopher)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Attorney Brent W. Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/29/2014. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER. Consolidated Amended Complaints due within 60 days, Answers to Consolidated Amended Complaints due within 45 days after filing of amended complaints. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom One - Bridgeport before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/29/2014. (Martin, M.)
April 29, 2014 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order, #32 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel Signed By Linda P. Nussbaum filed by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Schaefer, David)
April 29, 2014 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #32 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Schaefer, David)
April 29, 2014 Filing 34 Memorandum in Support re #32 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Schaefer, David)
April 29, 2014 Filing 33 Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order filed by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Schaefer, David)
April 29, 2014 Filing 32 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Schaefer, David)
April 29, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brent W. Landau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3228557) by Cesar Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schaefer, David)
April 28, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Anthony Barile, III on behalf of Cesar Castillo (Barile, Peter)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/24/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 23, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayne A. Goldstein on behalf of Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund (Goldstein, Jayne)
April 22, 2014 Filing 29 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:14-cv-00329 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-541-SRU as part of MDL # 3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 22, 2014 Filing 28 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:14-cv-00151 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-540-SRU as part of MDL # 3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 22, 2014 Filing 27 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:14-cv-01921 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-539-SRU as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 17, 2014 Filing 17 MDL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring cases to the District of Connecticut re: MDL #3:14-md-2516 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 24 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from New Jersey case number 2:13-cv-07806 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-519-SRU as part of MDL # 3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 23 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Minnesota case number 0:13-cv-03650 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-529-SRU as part of MDL # 3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 22 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Minnesota case number 0:14-cv-00130 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-522-SRU as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 21 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Minnesota case number 0:14-cv-00748 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-525-SRU as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 20 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Minnesota case number 0:13-cv-03588 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-514-SRU as part of MDL # 3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 19 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Minnesota case number 0:14-cv-00050 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-520-SRU as part of MDL # 3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 18 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Minnesota case number 0:13-cv-03648 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-517-SRU as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516-SRU. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 16 MDL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring cases to the District of Connecticut re: MDL #3:14-md-2516 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 14, 2014 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Roche, Brian)
April 14, 2014 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order Signed By Thomas M. Sobol filed by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Roche, Brian)
April 14, 2014 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order Signed By David F. Sorensen filed by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Roche, Brian)
April 14, 2014 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order Signed By Bruce E. Gerstein filed by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Roche, Brian)
April 14, 2014 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order filed by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Roche, Brian)
April 14, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION for Case Management Order No. 1 Order by Aggrenox Antitrust Litigation. (Roche, Brian)
April 9, 2014 Filing 15 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:13-cv-07068 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-487 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 9, 2014 Filing 14 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:13-cv-06999 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-486 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 9, 2014 Filing 13 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:13-cv-06992 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-485 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 9, 2014 Filing 12 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:13-cv-06734 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-484 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 9, 2014 Filing 11 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:13-cv-06692 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-481 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 9, 2014 Filing 10 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:13-cv-06579 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-478 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 9, 2014 Filing 9 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Pennsylvania Eastern case number 2:13-cv-06543 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14-cv-477 as part of MDL #3:14-md-2516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 8, 2014 Filing 2 MDL CASE TRANSFER IN Case received from Middle District of Tennessee case number 3:13-cv-01382 has been assigned Connecticut case number 3:14 cv 467 as part of MDL #3:14-md-02516. This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Stefan R. Underhill. To assist you in litigating this case in our district, refer to information available on our MDL website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2014. (Oliver, T.)
April 3, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2014.(Fazekas, J.)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/3/2014.(Fazekas, J.)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/3/2014.(Fazekas, J.)
April 3, 2014 Filing 1 MDL INITIAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation establishing MDL #3:14 md 2516 (SRU) for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and transfering cases to the District of Connecticut to be assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman,