Navigators Insurance Company et al v. Justice
Plaintiff: Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD and Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Defendant: Dept of Justice
Case Number: 3:2015cv00329
Filed: March 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Because Defendant has demonstrated that the searches it conducted were adequate, summary judgment is granted in Defendant's favor on Count Two. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/29/16. (Harris, J)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: In light of Defendant's filing of its supplemental declaration, the Court directs Plaintiffs to show cause in written briefing filed by February 18, 2016 why the Court should not grant Defendant summary judgment sua sponte on Count Two, w hich would conclude this case. If no briefing is filed, the Court will consider only Defendant's supplemental declaration and its sufficiency to entitle Defendant to summary judgment on Count Two. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/28/16. (Harris, J)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion 22 for Summary Judgment is DENIED, their Motion 28 to Strike is denied as MOOT as to Defendant's Local 56(a)2 Statement, paragraphs 25-30, 34, the first sentence of paragraph 31, and the first sentence of parag raph 35 of Ms. Francis's declaration, and DENIED as to the second sentence of paragraphs 31 and 35, as well as paragraphs 32 and 33 of Ms. Francis's declaration. The Court grants, sua sponte, summary judgment in Defendant's favor on Co unt One. As to Count Two, Defendant is directed to either conduct a new search or to submit a supplemental declaration demonstrating that its original searches were reasonably calculated to uncover all relevant documents. The supplemental declaration shall be filed within thirty days of this Ruling. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/5/16. (Harris, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navigators Insurance Company et al v. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Ins. Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Gostyla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Management (UK) LTD
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Gostyla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Gostyla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Justice
Represented By: Vanessa Roberts Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?