United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ahmed et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Iftikar Ahmed, Iftikar Ali Ahmed Sole Prop and I-Cubed Domains, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00675
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2347 ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting in part Murtha Cullina's fee request 1991 following in camera review of billing records 2286 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/22/22. (Burman, A.)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2338 ORDER vacating 2308 Order granting Motion to Withdraw; granting in part and denying in part 2274 Motion to Withdraw; granting 2180 Motion for Electronic Filing Access; granting in part and denying in part 2313 Motion for Electronic Filing Access; striking in part 2312 Notice of Appearance; denying 2336 Motion to File Relief Defendants' Response to Receiver's Motion to Approve the Phase 1 Report by email. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/16/2022. (Anderson, Colleen)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2314 ORDER denying [Doc. # 1786] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/22/2022. (Burman, A.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2288 ORDER denying Relief Defendants' Emergency Motion for Reconsideration 2275 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/29/2022. (Canevari, Dorothy)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2268 ORDER denying 1783 Motion to Compel, denying 2262 Motion to Compel, and granting with modification 2262 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/19/2022. (Canevari, D.)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2251 ORDER denying Motion to Keep Accounts Open 2183 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/27/2022. (Canevari, Dorothy)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2245 ORDER granting Receiver's Eleventh 2106 and Twelfth 2186 Motions for Fees. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/11/2022. (Walker, M.)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2197 ORDER granting with modification Defendant's and Ms. Ahmed's Motions for a Protective Order 2158 and 2159 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/2/2022. (Walker, M.)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2131 ORDER granting in part Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler's Motion for Alternative Relief 1925 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/17/2021. (Canevari, D.)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2123 ORDER granting with modification Receiver's Ninth Motion for Fees 1970 and granting the Receiver's Tenth Motion for Fees 2039 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/8/21. (Walker, M.)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2116 ORDER denying Relief Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Sur-Reply 2078 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/7/2021. (Canevari, D.)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2111 ORDER denying 2105 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/2/2021. (Canevari, D.)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2092 Order GRANTING Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion to Seal Exhibit E of Its Notice of Additional Evidence of Defendant's False Statements 1880 and DENYING Defendant's Motion to Strike 1883 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/15/2021. (Canevari, D.)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2069 Order DENYING Motion to Reduce Disgorgement in this Case by the Amount of Judgment in the New York State Proceeding 2033 for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/26/2021. (Canevari, D.)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2047 ORDER denying 1537 1679 1710 1910 Motions for Release of Funds. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/4/21. (McHugh, C.)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2041 Order denying Defendant's Rule 60(B) Motion for Relief from Amended Final Judgment 1567 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/2/2021. (McHugh, C.)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2031 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Doc. # 1825-1 1834 , and denying Defendant's Motion to Seal 1837 and Relief Defendants' Motion to Strike 1849 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/23/21. (McHugh, C.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1997 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling and in accordance with the Second Circuit's limited remand 1801 ,Defendant's disgorgement obligation is increased to $64,171,646.14 with a prejudgment interest award of $9,755,798.34. The Clerk shall amend the judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/16/21. (McHugh, C.)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1982 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the Receiver's Seventh Motion for Attorney Fees 1686 is GRANTED, and his Eighth Motion for Attorney Fees 1764 is GRANTED with modification. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/21/21. (Brinn, Hope)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1964 ORDER denying 1845 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 05/12/21. (McHugh, C.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1929 Defendant's 1793 Motion to Seal and 1838 1798 Motion to Strike are DENIED. Plaintiff's 1803 1804 Motion to Unseal Document is granted. The Clerk is directed to unseal the SECs Motion to Preclude Further Affidavits from Defendant [Doc. # 1795] in its entirety. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 04/30/21. (McHugh, C.)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1875 Endorsement Order denying 1546 Relief Defendants' Motion to Strike Harris St. Laurent's Response. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 04/07/21. (McHugh, C.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1824 ORDER denying 1452 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/23/21. (McHugh, C.)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1790 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Relief Defendants' Motion to Strike or Otherwise Disregard Oak Management's Notice 1451 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/9/21. (McHugh, C.)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1780 ORDER denying Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply 1209 and Relief Defendants' Motion to Join Sur-Reply of Defendant 1212 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 03/03/21. (McHugh, C.)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1771 ORDER denying 1139 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/24/21.(McHugh, C.)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1740 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1484 Motion for Release of Funds; granting in part and denying in part 1536 Motion for Release of Funds; granting in part and denying in part 1592 Motion for Release of Funds; granting 1607 Motion for Release of Funds; denying 1619 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; and granting 1669 Motion for Release of Funds. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/22/21. (Brinn, H)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1714 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the Receiver's Fourth Motion 1474 , Fifth Motion 1555 , and Sixth Motion 1629 for Attorney Fees are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/14/20. (Brinn, H)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 ORDER denying 1314 Motion for Sanctions and 1348 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/11/2020. (McHugh, C.)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1680 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's 1325 Motion to Alter Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/5/20. (Brinn, Hope)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1675 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion 1324 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/30/20. (Brinn, Hope)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1661 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 1421 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/8/20. (Brinn, Hope)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1611 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Oak's Motion to Seal 1242 is DENIED; Defendant's Motion for Leave to Arbitrate 1225 is MOOT to the extent that he seeks leave to pursue arbitration which is not prohibited by the Litigation Stay and is DENIED to the extent that he seeks leave to pursue arbitration against Oak which is prohibited by the Litigation Stay; Defendant's Motion to Stay Arbitration 1323 is DENIED; and Defendant's Motion for Fees for Arbitration Counsel 1371 is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/28/2020. (Davis, Caroline)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Relief Defendants' Motion for Temporary Injunction 1446 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/30/20. (Davis, Caroline)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion for Access to All Information Acquired by the Receiver 1129 is DENIED without prejudice to renew. No renewed motion for access will be considered absent a showing of Defendant's good faith efforts to obtain the desired information through the procedures outlined in the Appointment Order. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/31/20. (Davis, Caroline)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion for Fees to Retain Counsel 1332 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/29/20. (Davis, Caroline)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 ORDER on ex parte communications and sealed documents. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1/27/20 Email) (Davis, Caroline)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the Receiver's Motions for Fees 1160 1249 1330 are GRANTED as modified with regard to the appropriate billing for travel time. Within seven days of the date of this ruling, the Recei ver shall submit a proposed order which reflects the final amounts to be distributed to the Receiver and his counsel and identifies the assets of the Receivership Estate from which those amounts will be paid. Any party who wishes to address the Court on the question of whether fees paid to the Receiver should be credited toward the judgment amount may file an indication of its position and supporting memorandum of law within twenty-one days of the date of this ruling. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/22/20. (Davis, Caroline)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motions for Appellate Attorneys' Fees 1061 1288 are GRANTED with modification. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/9/20. (Davis, Caroline)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Relief Defendants' motions for appellate attorneys' fees 1080 1273 are GRANTED with modification. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/16/19. (Davis, Caroline)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Emergency Motion to Remove Jed Horwitt as Receiver and Terminate the Receivership 1244 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/11/19. (Davis, Caroline)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion for Declaration of Mistrial 1135 is DENIED. The SEC's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply 1172 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/9/19. (Davis, Caroline)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment 1086 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/4/19. (Davis, Caroline)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached order, Jed Horwitt of Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. is hereby appointed to serve as receiver for the assets subject to the Court's asset freeze order. Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. is also appointed as counsel for the Receiver. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/20/18. (Davis, Caroline)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Relief Defendants' Motion to Amend the Judgment 1013 is GRANTED as modified in open court on November 28, and Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify the Judgment 1034 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/14/18. (Davis, Caroline)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 986 Ruling on Defendant's and Relief Defendants' Objections 962 963 to Plaintiff's Proposed Final Judgment 960 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/27/18. (Davis, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 955 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached order, Defendant's Motion 884 for Summary Judgment with regard to Damages is DENIED, and Plaintiff's Motion 886 for Judgment and Remedies is GRANTED, with modification. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/6/18. (Davis, Caroline)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached order, Defendant's Motion 894 to Preclude Papers Submitted Beyond Submission Deadline is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/22/18. (Davis, Caroline)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, Defendant's Motion 616 for Summary Judgment and Relief Defendants' Motion 618 for Summary Judgment, both on liability only, are DENIED. The SEC's Motion 622 for Summary Judgment on liability is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/29/18. (Denker, J.)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 678 RULING Following In Camera Review of Transcripts of Deposition By Oak Witness, Grace A. Ames, Held on July 15, 2015 and May 4, 2017. (See Dkt. #656; see also Dkts. ##649, 657). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/26/2017.(Watson, M.)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Relief Defendants' Motion 442 to Modify the Asset Freeze is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/18/17. (Denker, J.)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER Regarding Defendant Ahmed's Motion Seeking Judicial Review By This Esteemed Court of the Transcript of Deposition By Oak Witness Ms. Grace A. Ames on July 15, 2015 and on Defendant Ahmed's Motion for Judicial Review of and Access to Deposition Transcripts of Oak Representative Ms. Grace Ames From Deposition Conducted on 4th May 2017 in New York (Dkts. ##539-40). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/14/2017.(Watson, M.)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Defendant's Motion 434 for Release of Funds for Legal Representation in India is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/13/17. (Denker, J.)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Defendant's Motions for Sanctions 522 524 532 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/10/17. (Denker, J.)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Defendant's Motion 438 to Depose Certain Oak and Related Parties Specific to Each Alleged Transaction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/23/17. (Denker, J.)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Relief Defendants' Motion 519 to Delay Filing of Summary Judgment Motions is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/22/17. (Denker, J.)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Defendant's Motion 534 Seeking Permission to be Allowed to Participate in the Oak Deposition is GRANTED subject to the limitations in that Order. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/3/17. (Denker, J.)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, non-party Oak Management's Motion 453 to Quash Rule 30(b)(6) Subpoena is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/7/17. (Denker, J.)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, Relief Defendants' Motion 224 to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/8/16. (Denker, J.)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record of the telephonic conference held February 18, 2016, Relief Defendants' Motion 148 for a Limited Modification of the Asset Freeze Order is GRANTED with modification; the Commission's Motion [ 174] for Clarification of the Court's Endorsement Order 171 is DENIED as moot; the Commission's Motion 175 to Seal its post-deposition submission is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and Relief Defendants' Motion 181 to Seal its post-deposition submission is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Poueymirou, M) (Poueymirou, M)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER: Relief Defendants' Motion 167 is GRANTED.(Poueymirou, M)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record of the telephonic conference held December 29, 2015, Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel Discovery 169 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.(Poueymirou, M)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: SEC'S Amended Motion 29 for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED; The original Motion 2 for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/12/2015. (Morril, Gregory)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ahmed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Heinke
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: Mark Lander Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iftikar Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iftikar Ali Ahmed Sole Prop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Cubed Domains, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?