FIH, LLC v. Foundation Capital Partners, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: FIH, LLC
Defendant: Foundation Capital Partners LLC, Dean Barr, Joseph Meehan, Thomas Ward and Joseph Elmlinger
Case Number: 3:2015cv00785
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER addressing Parties' memoranda of law 223 224 and adhering to prior dismissal 210 of Plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/22/19. (Gutierrez, A.)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Plaintiff's Motion 174 for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and Defendants' Motions 173 176 178 179 for Summary Judgment are GRANTED as to Plaintiff's federal claim. Plaintiff's state-law claims are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/31/2018. (Kolker, J.)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RULING denying in large part (Dkt. #118) Defendants' Motion to Continue to the extent that it seeks to cancel the August 4-5, 2016 PJR Hearing, and granting Defendants' Motion to Continue in limited part to the extent that continued hearing dates may be scheduled in late October; and denying in part (Dkt. #121) Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order to the extent that it seeks to postpone the August 1-2, 2016 depositions, but granting Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order to the extent that the subject matter of the depositions is limited to any issues that will be raised at the PJR hearing; counsel will not be hampered by any of the conditions demanded by any of the parties, and counsel may raise the requested limitations in appropriate motions to be filed with the Court during the remaining discovery period. (See Attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/28/2016. (Watson, M.)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENDORSEMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/18/16.(Harris, J)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 66 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/26/16. (Harris, J)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/30/16. (Harris, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIH, LLC v. Foundation Capital Partners, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIH, LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Capital Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Meehan
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Elmlinger
Represented By: Andrew M. Zeitlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?