Russ McCullough et al v. World Wrestling Entertainment Inc
Plaintiff: Russ McCullough, Ryan Sakoda and Matthew Robert Wiese
Defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Consol_plaintiff: Evan Singleton, Vito Lograsso and William Albert Haynes, III
Consol_defendant: Robert Windham, Thomas Billington, James Ware, Oreal Perras and John Doe's
Case Number: 3:2015cv01074
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 205 and Motions to Dismiss 266 and 269 and granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion for Sanctions 262 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/17/2018. (Lindberg, Christina)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting 330 Motion for Summary Judgment to Plaintiffs Singleton and LoGrasso. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/28/2018. (Shafer, J.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER re: 205 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, 262 Motion for Sanctions, 266 Motion to Dismiss, and 269 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying as moot 228 Motion for Sanctions and 291 Motion to Stay; and ORDER denying 326 Motion to Strike and 327 Motion to Strike for the reasons stated in the attached ruling on WWE's Motions to Dismiss, for Sanctions, and for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/29/2017. (Hoffman, S)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER denying without prejudice 188 Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached for memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/24/2017. (Hoffman, S)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER (1) denying 80 Motion for Sanctions; (2) granting 103 Motion to Dismiss; and (3) granting 104 Motion to Dismiss. The Frazier (3:15-cv-1229) and James (3:15-cv-1305) actions are hereby dismissed. See attached memorandum of opinion. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/10/2016. (Hoffman, S)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying 118 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order with respect to Singleton and LoGrasso; granting 119 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order with respect to Windham, et al. See attached Memorandum of Opinion. For the reasons stated in the attached Opinion, the Courts Order at Docket Number 117 dismissing the Windham action is VACATED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/21/16. (Shechter, N.)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 43 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint brought by Plaintiffs Singleton and LoGrasso; granting Defendant's 64 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Haynes; denying as moot Defendant's 64 Motion to Dismiss the Haynes Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting Defendant's 95 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs McCullough, Sakoda and Weise. See attached memorandum of opinion. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/21/16. (Shechter, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russ McCullough et al v. World Wrestling Entertainment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ McCullough
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Represented By: Jonas P. Mann
Represented By: Michael A. McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sakoda
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Represented By: Jonas P. Mann
Represented By: Michael A. McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Robert Wiese
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Represented By: Jonas P. Mann
Represented By: Michael A. McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Represented By: Terry Budd
Represented By: Thomas D. Goldberg
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Jonathan B. Tropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Evan Singleton
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Represented By: Konstantine Kyros
Represented By: Charles LaDuca
Represented By: Erica Mirabella
Represented By: Scott A. Moriarity
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Harris L. Pogust
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Vito Lograsso
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Represented By: Konstantine Kyros
Represented By: Charles LaDuca
Represented By: Erica Mirabella
Represented By: Scott A. Moriarity
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Harris L. Pogust
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: William Albert Haynes, III
Represented By: Taylor Asen
Represented By: Konstantine Kyros
Represented By: Charles LaDuca
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Represented By: Erica Mirabella
Represented By: Scott A. Moriarity
Represented By: Joshua L. Ross
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Brendan Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Robert Windham
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Thomas Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: James Ware
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Oreal Perras
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: John Doe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?