Halloran et al v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Halloran, Paula LaValley, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Jacqueline Gribbon, Colleen Swart, Robert Mansfield, Michael Dyer, David Kandrysawtz, Donald Poulin, Phil Basquiat, Joyce Halloran, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Steven Swart, Stanley Zaremba, Carolyn McKinney, Donna Frankenberg, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark McKinney, Kelly Luxenberg, Steven Brozek, Mary Lou Thieling, Nancy Poulin, Sue Ann Furlong, Patricia Brozek, Jeannette Lesperance, Kathy Noblet, Michael Halloran, Michael Furlong, Deborah MacGlafin, Victoria Masciovecchio, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Peter LaValley, Dawn L. Norris, Mark Pawelcyzk, Scott MacGlafin, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Jodi Mansfield, Alfred Lesperance and Amy Somerville
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co, Continental Casualty Company, AllState Insurance Co of America, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Government Employees Insurance Co., First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Teachers Insurance Co, National Surety Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Encompass Indemnity Company, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Service Automobile Association, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, AIU Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Bedivere Insurance Co, Universal North America Insurance Company, American Commerce Insurance Co, Aegis Security Insurance Co, Vigilant Ins Co, American Automobile Association, Electric Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Ins Co, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Great Northern Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Economy Premier Assurance Company, NGM Ins Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Co, LM Insurance Corp, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Nationwide General Ins Co, Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch., Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Specialty Insurance Company, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Vermont Mutual Insurance Co., Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Co, Twin City Fire Ins Co, Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Integon National Insurance Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Valley Forge Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, American Insurance Company, Middlesex Insurance Company, Meritplan Insurance Co, Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Countryway Insurance Co, Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, USAA General Indemnity Company, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, American States Insurance Company, Merastar Ins Co, Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, USAA Casualty Ins Co, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Pacific Indemnity Co, Bunker Hill Ins Co, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., General Insurance Company Of Amercia, Horace Mann Ins Co, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Aspen American Insurance Co, Affiliated Fm Ins Co, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co., Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co, Republic Franklin Ins Co, General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, Armed Forces Insurance Exch., California Casualty Indemnity Exch., CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., Covenant Ins Co, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Homesite Ins. Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York, 21st Century Premier Insurance Co., Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Casco Indemnity Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Insurance Co of North America, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Allstate Indemnity Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, Stonington Insurance Company, Danbury Ins Co, Balboa Ins Co, Utica First Ins Co, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Trumbull Ins Co, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, Truck Insurance Exchange, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00133
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Tolland
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.)
February 6, 2020 Filing 720 JUDGMENT.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2020.(Perez, J.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER granting #718 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/4/2019. (Leon, Noel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 718 Joint MOTION to Dismiss all Remaining Plaintiffs' Claims by Mary Lou Thieling, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney.Responses due by 12/24/2019 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 717 Joint STATUS REPORT by Mary Lou Thieling, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 716 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kontyko on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 715 Joint STATUS REPORT by Mary Lou Thieling, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER granting #713 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Choity Khan terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/3/2019. (Leon, Noel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 713 MOTION for Choity R. Khan to Withdraw as Attorney by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Khan, Choity)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 712 SCHEDULING ORDER: Filing of Joint Status Report by 9/20/2019Deposition of Plaintiffs experts by 9/20/2019Defendants Disclosure of Experts due on 10/18/2019Filing of Joint Status Report by 10/18/2019Deposition of Defendants Experts by 11/22/2019Filing of Joint Status Report by 11/26/2019Motion for Class Certification filed by 12/18/2019Filing of Joint Status Report by 1/4/2020Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by 1/29/2020Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by 2/19/2020Hearing on Class Certification on 2/25/2020 at 10:00 a.m.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/2/2019. (Leon, Noel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 711 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Discovery Status Conference held on 9/23/2019. Total Time: 40 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) Consistent with this Court's inherent authority to manage its docket with a view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases, see Deitz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1892 (2016), the Court held a telephonic conference regarding the #695 Joint Motion for Discovery Conference. After hearing from the parties, and based on the parties' submissions and the applicable law, the Court informed the parties that the two matters currently in dispute are not likely to be considered discoverable. While the Court did not limit the ability of either party to file anything further with respect to this discovery, the Court reiterated that its view on this discovery was not likely to change. (Leon, Noel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 710 Joint STATUS REPORT by Mary Lou Thieling, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Kindseth, Rachel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 709 NOTICE by Mary Lou Thieling, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney re #703 Notice (Other),, of Filing Substituted Exhibit B to ECF No. 703-02 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER granting #706 Joint Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs Michael and Joyce Halloran and Michael Dyer Against Harleysville. Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 are dismissed, with prejudice and without costs, attorneys fees, or expenses to any party, and with all parties waiving any and all rights of appeal. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/17/2019. (Leon, Noel)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER granting #705 Joint Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs Michael and Joyce Halloran Against Kemper. Counts 2, 3, 48, 73, 94, 119, 140, and 165 are dismissed with prejudice and without costs, attorneys' fees or expenses to any party, and with all parties waiving any and all rights of appeal. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/17/2019. (Leon, Noel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 706 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Michael and Joyce Halloran and Michael Dyer Against Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company by Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran.Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 705 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Michael and Joyce Halloran Against Kemper Independence Insurance Company by Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran.Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 704 OBJECTION re Joint Motion for Discovery Conference filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Petter, Kelly)
September 16, 2019 Filing 703 NOTICE by Mary Lou Thieling, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney re 696 Order on Motion for Conference Plaintiffs' Submission for Discovery Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 702 OBJECTION re #695 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference ; Submission of Bunker Hill Insurance Co. and New London County Mutual Insurance Co. Regarding Discovery Dispute; filed by Bunker Hill Ins Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farrish, Thomas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 701 OBJECTION re #695 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference filed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 3)(Labbe, Brendan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 700 OBJECTION re #695 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF SETTLEMENT TERMS filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rivet, Kathryn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 699 OBJECTION Memorandum of the Travelers Defendants and Citizens Insurance Company of America Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America. (Ackerman, Wystan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 698 OBJECTION re #695 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference filed by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Kelly, William)
September 8, 2019 Filing 697 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Leon, Noel)
September 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER granting #695 Motion for Discovery Conference. Telephonic Discovery Conference to be held 9/23/2019 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/8/2019. (Leon, Noel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 695 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference by Mary Lou Thieling, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Souza, Emily)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER granting #689 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Margaret J. Burnside by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/3/2019. (Conde, Djenab)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER granting #688 Joint Motion to Dismiss claims of Plaintiffs Amy Somerville and Phil Basquiat against The Standard Fire Ins. Co. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/3/2019. (Conde, Djenab)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER granting #687 Joint Motion to Dismiss claims of Plaintiff Kelly Luxenberg against Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company with prejudice. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/3/2019. (Conde, Djenab)
August 30, 2019 Filing 691 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time by LM Insurance Corp. (Kole, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 690 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Souza, Emily)
August 21, 2019 Filing 689 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Margaret J Burnside by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Burnside, Margaret)
August 15, 2019 Filing 688 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs Amy Somerville and Phil Basquiat Against The Standard Fire Ins. Co. by Amy Somerville, Phil Basquiat.Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 687 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Kelly Luxenberg Against Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company by Kelly Luxenberg.Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 686 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Rivet on behalf of Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co (Rivet, Kathryn)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER granting #680 Joint Motion to Dismiss claims by Scott and Deborah MacGlaflin (Counts 30, 31, 66, 78, 112, 124, 158, and 170) against Travelers Indemnity Company of America with prejudice. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/12/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER granting #652 Motion to Dismiss Stanley Zaremba's claims (Counts 45, 46, 72, 81, 118, 127, 164, and 173) against Kemper Independent Insurance Company with prejudice. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/12/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Filing 683 Based on the Courts ruling on the motions to dismiss to allow parties to renew their motions "following resolution by the Connecticut Supreme Court pending certified questions," see Ruling on Pending Motions to Dismiss and Strike, ECF No. 585, at 41, the Court will DENY the pending motions for entry of final judgment (ECF Nos. #605 , #648 ) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL following the resolution of Jemiola v. Hartford Casualty Ins. Co., S.C. 19978, by the Connecticut Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/30/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER granting #681 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew B. Arnould is terminated from this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/11/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
July 10, 2019 Filing 681 MOTION for Matthew Arnould to Withdraw as Attorney by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Arnould, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 680 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs Scott and Deborah MacGlaflin Against Travelers Indemnity Company by Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin.Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Kindseth, Rachel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 679 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER granting #671 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #677 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court extends the fact discovery deadline to August 7, 2019, and Plaintiffs' expert disclosure deadline to August 14, 2019. The Court sua sponte extends the August joint status report deadline to August 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/01/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 677 MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/14/2019 to complete discovery #602 Order by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER granting #674 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Judy Y. Barrasso and Stephen R. Klaffky terminated; granting #675 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Judy Y. Barrasso and Stephen R. Klaffky terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/28/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Filing 675 MOTION for Judy Barrasso to Withdraw as Attorney by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Barrasso, Judy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 674 MOTION for Stephen Klaffky to Withdraw as Attorney by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Klaffky, Stephen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 673 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Petter on behalf of Homesite Ins. Co. (Petter, Kelly)
June 26, 2019 Filing 672 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Ober on behalf of Homesite Ins. Co. (Ober, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Filing 671 MOTION for Extension of Time on Schedule for Discovery by NGM Ins Co. (Petter, Kelly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 670 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 669 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #662 MOTION for Attorney(s) Allison S. Ercolano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5284519) by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Ercolano, Allison)
June 6, 2019 Filing 668 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #661 MOTION for Attorney(s) Margaret J. Burnside to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5284445) by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Burnside, Margaret)
June 4, 2019 Filing 667 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Sue Ercolano on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. (Ercolano, Allison)
June 3, 2019 Filing 666 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret J. Burnside on behalf of LM Insurance Corp (Burnside, Margaret)
May 30, 2019 Filing 665 NOTICE of Appearance by Anja Rusi on behalf of Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co (Rusi, Anja)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER granting #662 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Allison S. Ercolano. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER granting #661 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret J. Burnside. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 662 MOTION for Attorney(s) Allison S. Ercolano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5284519) by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newbury, Philip)
May 17, 2019 Filing 661 MOTION for Attorney(s) Margaret J. Burnside to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5284445) by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newbury, Philip)
May 9, 2019 Filing 660 Notice of Additional Authority Supplemental Authority in Support of Dismissed Defendants' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) re #648 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) CORRECTED, #605 MOTION for Judgment Certain Dismissed Defendants' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by American Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Trumbull Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rodriguez, Kristen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 659 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 5/6/2019 in the matter of Mark and Felice Pawelcyzk v Bunker Hill Insurance. Case not settled. Follow-up if counsels request it. Total Time: 3 hours and 30 minutes (Sanders, C.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 658 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney. (Kindseth, Rachel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 657 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Small on behalf of Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America (Small, Jonathan)
April 25, 2019 Filing 656 NOTICE of Appearance by Taruna Garg on behalf of Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Nancy Poulin, Stanley Zaremba (Garg, Taruna)
April 23, 2019 Filing 655 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Modzelewski on behalf of Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America (Modzelewski, Charles)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER granting #637 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer L. Shukla terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/15/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
April 5, 2019 Filing 653 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba. (Kindseth, Rachel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 652 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Kemper Insurance Company by Stanley Zaremba.Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 651 Memorandum in Support re #648 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) CORRECTED CERTAIN DISMISSED DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b) filed by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, AllState Insurance Co of America. (Rodriguez, Kristen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 650 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba. (Souza, Emily)
February 26, 2019 Filing 649 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 2/26/2019, ( Settlement Conference in the matter of Mark and Felice Pawelcyzk v Bunker Hill Insurance is set for 5/6/2019 from 10:30 AM until 1:30pm in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsels shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IS ATTACHED FOR REVIEW). and 20 minutes (Sanders, C.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 648 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) CORRECTED by American Commerce Insurance Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Trumbull Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America. (Rodriguez, Kristen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 647 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set in the matter of Mark and Felice Pawelcyzk v Bunker Hill Insurance for 2/26/2019 @2:00 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, contact Chambers at 203-579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 190 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 646 OBJECTION re #605 MOTION for Judgment Certain Dismissed Defendants' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER granting #644 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/15/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
February 14, 2019 Filing 644 MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) by AllState Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rodriguez, Kristen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER granting #640 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Plaintiff Donna Frankenberg's claims against Defendants Peerless Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/13/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER REFERRING the case of Plaintiffs Mark and Felice Pawelcyzk and Defendant Bunker Hill Insurance to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/13/2019.(Washington, Gregory)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER granting #639 Motion Referral to a Magistrate for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/13/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
February 12, 2019 Filing 640 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Donna Frankenberg against Peerless and Safeco by Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America.Responses due by 3/5/2019 (Newbury, Philip)
February 12, 2019 Filing 639 Joint MOTION Referral to Hon. William I. Garfinkel, USMJ, for Settlement Conference by Plaintiffs, Mark and Felice Pawelcyzk, and by Bunker Hill Ins Co.Responses due by 3/5/2019 (Farrish, Thomas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 638 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Kemper Independence Insurance Company.(Rodriguez, Kristen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 637 MOTION for Jennifer L. Shukla to Withdraw as Attorney by Bunker Hill Ins Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Trumbull Ins Co. (Shukla, Jennifer)
February 1, 2019 Filing 636 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Nancy Poulin, Stanley Zaremba. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER granting #634 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J. D'Aloia is terminated from the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/01/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 31, 2019 Filing 634 MOTION for David J. D'Aloia to Withdraw as Attorney by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (D'Aloia, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 633 MOTION for Disclosure RULE 26(a)(1) as to MARK MCKINNEY and CAROLYN MCKINNEY by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 632 MOTION for Disclosure RULE 26(a)(1) as to GEOFF LUXENBERG by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 631 MOTION for Disclosure RULE 26(a)(1) as to JEANETTE LESPERANCE and ALFRED LESPERANCE by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 630 MOTION for Disclosure RULE 26(a)(1) as to KELLY LUXENBERG by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER directing that any party that objects to the Court granting #605 Certain Dismissed Defendants' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) should file a reasoned objection on the docket by 2/15/19. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/28/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 25, 2019 Filing 628 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co.(Miller, Susan)
January 24, 2019 Filing 627 AMENDED ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses by Bunker Hill Ins Co. (Farrish, Thomas)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER granting #625 Motion to Amend/Correct. Bunker Hill shall have until 2/1/19 to file the amended pleading on the docket. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/24/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 23, 2019 Filing 625 MOTION to Amend/Correct #616 Answer to Amended Complaint by Bunker Hill Ins Co.Responses due by 2/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Raccuia, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER granting extension of time until 2/11/19 to Defendant Kemper Independence Insurance Company to answer the Fourth Amended Complaint as stipulated by Defendant and Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/22/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 623 STIPULATION re #488 Amended Complaint,,, Extending Time to Answer to February 11, 2019 by Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (Rodriguez, Kristen)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER granting #613 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah Michelle Gruber terminated from the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/14/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 621 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by NGM Ins Co.(Petter, Kelly)
January 11, 2019 Filing 620 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Homesite Ins. Co..(Klaffky, Stephen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 619 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co..(Kelly, William)
January 11, 2019 Filing 618 DEFENDANT AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Amica Mutual Ins. Co.(Antonellis, Anthony)
January 11, 2019 Filing 617 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by New London County Mutual Insurance Company.(Farrish, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 616 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Bunker Hill Ins Co.(Farrish, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 615 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Peerless Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Newbury, Philip)
January 11, 2019 Filing 614 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Blouin, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 613 MOTION for Sarah Gruber to Withdraw as Attorney by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba. (Gruber, Sarah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 612 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Citizens Insurance Company of America.(Ackerman, Wystan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 611 ANSWER to #488 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses. by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America.(Ackerman, Wystan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 610 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Snow Kindseth on behalf of Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba (Kindseth, Rachel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 609 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily McDonough Souza on behalf of Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba (Souza, Emily)
January 7, 2019 Filing 608 NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul Friedman on behalf of Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba (Friedman, David)
December 28, 2018 Filing 607 NOTICE of Appearance by Madiha M. Malik on behalf of Amy Somerville,Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba (Malik, Madiha)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting #604 Motion for Correction. The Court corrects its Amended Ruling on Pending Motions to Dismiss and Strike, ECF No. 596, to reflect that Metropolitan Group Property Casualty Insurance has been dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/11/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
December 10, 2018 Filing 605 MOTION for Judgment Certain Dismissed Defendants' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) by American Commerce Insurance Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Trumbull Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America.Responses due by 12/31/2018 (Rodriguez, Kristen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 604 MOTION For Correction by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co.Responses due by 12/27/2018 (Rodriguez, Kristen)
November 30, 2018 Filing 603 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Class Certification Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Ryan, Sarah)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER on Scope of and Schedule for Discovery. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/30/18.(Ryan, Sarah)
November 29, 2018 Filing 601 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Hearing held on 11/29/2018. (23 minutes. Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Ryan, Sarah)
November 20, 2018 Filing 600 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc T Miller on behalf of Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co (Miller, Marc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 599 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc T Miller on behalf of Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Miller, Marc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 598 PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Scheduling Order) by Bunker Hill Ins Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Farrish, Thomas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 597 NOTICE by Amy Somerville, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Mark McKinney, Stanley Zaremba of Plaintiffs' Proposed Revised Scheduling Order (Fagelson, Marilyn)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 596 Consistent with the Court's order granting Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company's motion to correct, ECF No. 587, and the Court's order granting Certain Defendants' motion for order, ECF No. 588, the Court issues an amended ruling and order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/08/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 595 The Court grants Certain Defendants' motion for order #588 regarding the Court's Order of October 19, 2018 #585 , and Defendants Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, and Trumbull Insurance Company will be dismissed from this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/08/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 594 The Court grants Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company's motion to correct #587 the Court's Order of October 19, 2018 #585 to reflect that Counts 181 and 184 are dismissed. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/08/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Order DENYING #576 . Under Connecticut law, "[t]he Supreme Court may answer a question of law certified to it by a court of the United States... if there is no controlling appellate decision, constitutional provision or statute of this state." Conn. Gen. Stat. 51-199b(d). Because, however, as the Defendants note, "[t]he questions presented should be such as will be determinative of the case...." Conn. Practice Book 82-3; see also Pitterman v. GM LLC, 3:14-cv-967 (JCH), 2018 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 12607, at *17 (D. Conn. Jan. 25, 2018)(certification of the question is not appropriate in this case because it would not be determinative); Wachovia Bank, N.A. v. Cummings, 3:09-cv-957 (SRU), 2010 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 10455, at *8 (D. Conn. Fe. 8, 2010)(declining certification where it would not resolve the litigation between the parties), and given the nature of this proposed class action, certification here would not be "determinative of the case;" the Court therefore declines to certify Plaintiffs' proposed questions to the Connecticut Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/07/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER granting #591 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to answer the Fourth Amended Complaint. Parties may propose a new answer deadline at the in-person hearing on 11/29/18. Only if necessary, parties may submit briefs of no more than five pages regarding the proposed answer deadline; those briefs are due by 11/23/18. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/31/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 30, 2018 Filing 591 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Certain Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answers to the Fourth Amended Complaint by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ackerman, Wystan)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER granting #589 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lawrence S. Grossman terminated from case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/29/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 26, 2018 Filing 589 MOTION for LAWRENCE S GROSSMAN to Withdraw as Attorney by Insurance Services Office, Inc.. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2018 Filing 588 MOTION for Clarification #585 Order on Motion to Strike,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,, by Trumbull Ins Co. (Farrish, Thomas)
October 26, 2018 Filing 587 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Amend or Clarify Ruling on its Motion to Dismiss by Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co.Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Ackerman, Wystan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 586 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Set Deadlines: Motion for Class Certification due by 11/16/2018. In-person Status Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/19/2018. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER denying #498 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part #499 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #502 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #505 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #508 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #509 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #510 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #512 Motion to Dismiss; granting #514 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #516 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #518 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #520 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #522 Motion to Dismiss; granting #524 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #526 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #528 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #530 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #533 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/19/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #497 Motion to Dismiss. The Court's written Order as to all Motions to Dismiss to follow. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/19/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting #582 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan McAndrew Suerth terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/11/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 10, 2018 Filing 582 MOTION for Ryan M. Suerth to Withdraw as Attorney by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba. (Suerth, Ryan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 581 REPLY to Response to #576 MOTION for Certification of Questions to the Connecticut Supreme Court filed by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting #579 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allison A Russo terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2018. (Giammatteo, John)
August 10, 2018 Filing 579 MOTION for Allison A. Russo to Withdraw as Attorney by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Russo, Allison)
August 1, 2018 Filing 578 Memorandum in Opposition re #576 MOTION for Certification of Questions to the Connecticut Supreme Court filed by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ackerman, Wystan)
July 15, 2018 Filing 577 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2018 re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13, 14 and 24 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America, #518 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 33 and 34 of Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Homesite Ins. Co., #510 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company, #526 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by NGM Ins Co, #514 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by AllState Insurance Co of America, #524 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Commerce Insurance Co, #505 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Bunker Hill Ins Co, #512 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, #576 MOTION for Certification of Questions to the Connecticut Supreme Court filed by Colleen Swart, Patricia Brozek, Steven Swart, Kathy Noblet, Kelly Luxenberg, Phil Basquiat, Felice Pawelcyzk, Paula LaValley, Alfred J. Lesperance, Alfred Lesperance, Joyce Halloran, Jeannette Lesperance, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba, Sue Ann Furlong, Mark McKinney, Michael Halloran, Michael Dyer, Victoria Masciovecchio, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Deborah MacGlafin, David Kandrysawtz, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Peter LaValley, Carolyn McKinney, Steven Brozek, Mark Pawelcyzk, Scott MacGlafin, Donna Frankenberg, Amy Somerville, Michael Furlong, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Jacqueline Gribbon, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Dawn L. Norris, #522 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 26, 27, 28, 29 and 35 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, #508 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, #502 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by New London County Mutual Insurance Company, #498 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations filed by Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, #520 MOTION to Dismiss Eight Counts of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co, #530 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #499 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Trumbull Ins Co, #533 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132 and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #497 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Counts 47 to 184 of the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America, Peerless Insurance Co., #509 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, #528 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. Total Time: 2 hours and 25 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Giammatteo, John) Modified on 7/16/2018 (Perez, J.).
July 11, 2018 Filing 576 MOTION for Certification of Questions to the Connecticut Supreme Court by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba.Responses due by 8/1/2018 (Gruber, Sarah)
July 6, 2018 Filing 575 NOTICE by Bunker Hill Ins Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Trumbull Ins Co of Supplemental Authority (Raccuia, Daniel)
July 6, 2018 Filing 574 NOTICE of Appearance by Choity Khan on behalf of Peerless Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America (Khan, Choity)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/6/2018.(Giammatteo, John)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/5/2018.(Giammatteo, John)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting #568 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lindsey A. Spinelli terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/2/2018. (Giammatteo, John)
June 29, 2018 Filing 570 NOTICE of Appearance by Chanda M. Feldkamp on behalf of Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co. (Feldkamp, Chanda)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER granting #565 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joel M. Cohen terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/28/2018. (Giammatteo, John)
June 28, 2018 Filing 568 MOTION for Lindsey A. Spinelli to Withdraw as Attorney by Peerless Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Spinelli, Lindsey)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER granting #566 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chanda M. Feldkamp. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
June 27, 2018 Filing 566 MOTION for Attorney(s) Chanda M. Feldkamp to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4883001) by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Chanda M. Feldkamp, #2 Exhibit B-Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Kathleen F. Adams)(Ponziani, Peter)
June 27, 2018 Filing 565 MOTION for Joel M. Cohen to Withdraw as Attorney by Insurance Services Office, Inc.. (Cohen, Joel)
June 5, 2018 Filing 564 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 6/27/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Hearing on Pending Motions to Dismiss set for 7/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden (Giammatteo, J.)
June 1, 2018 Filing 563 REPLY to Response to #512 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co. (Fenton, Richard)
June 1, 2018 Filing 562 REPLY to Response to #514 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by AllState Insurance Co of America. (Fenton, Richard)
June 1, 2018 Filing 561 REPLY to Response to #528 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Authorities)(Kelly, William)
June 1, 2018 Filing 560 REPLY to Response to #526 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by NGM Ins Co. (Petter, Kelly)
June 1, 2018 Filing 559 REPLY to Response to #522 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 26, 27, 28, 29 and 35 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
June 1, 2018 Filing 558 REPLY to Response to #520 MOTION to Dismiss Eight Counts of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Antonellis, Michael)
June 1, 2018 Filing 557 REPLY to Response to #518 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 33 and 34 of Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Klaffky, Stephen)
June 1, 2018 Filing 556 REPLY to Response to #530 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co.'s Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
June 1, 2018 Filing 555 REPLY to Response to #533 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132 and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co.'s Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132, and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
June 1, 2018 Filing 554 REPLY to Response to #516 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13, 14 and 24 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Peerless Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Leary, Kieran)
June 1, 2018 Filing 553 REPLY to Response to #510 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (Fenton, Richard)
June 1, 2018 Filing 552 RESPONSE The Travelers Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America. (Ackerman, Wystan)
June 1, 2018 Filing 551 RESPONSE Reply Memorandum in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Ackerman, Wystan)
June 1, 2018 Filing 550 REPLY to Response to #505 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Bunker Hill Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Authorities)(Raccuia, Daniel)
June 1, 2018 Filing 549 REPLY to Response to #502 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Authorities)(Raccuia, Daniel)
June 1, 2018 Filing 548 REPLY to Response to #499 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Trumbull Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Authorities)(Raccuia, Daniel)
May 31, 2018 Filing 547 REPLY to Response to #524 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Aylward, Michael)
May 31, 2018 Filing 546 RESPONSE Certain Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations filed by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ackerman, Wystan)
May 31, 2018 Filing 545 REPLY to Response to #497 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Counts 47 to 184 of the Fourth Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Leary, Kieran)
May 11, 2018 Filing 544 Memorandum in Opposition Combined re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13, 14 and 24 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, #518 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 33 and 34 of Fourth Amended Complaint, #510 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #526 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #514 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #524 MOTION to Dismiss , #505 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #512 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #522 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 26, 27, 28, 29 and 35 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, #508 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint, #502 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #520 MOTION to Dismiss Eight Counts of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint, #530 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint, #499 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #533 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132 and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint, #497 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Counts 47 to 184 of the Fourth Amended Complaint, #509 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint, #528 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
May 11, 2018 Filing 543 Memorandum in Opposition re #498 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations filed by Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba, Amy Soverville. (Fagelson, Marilyn) Modified filers on 5/11/2018 (Pesta, J.).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #538 Motion Permission to File Consolidated Brief in Opposition. Plaintiffs' motion for permission to file consolidated brief is granted. At this point, and given the unique nature and size of this case, the Court will exercise its inherent authority, see Deitz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1892 (2016) (noting Court's inherent authority to manage its docket with a view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases), and not presumptively limit the length of the filings in this case. As a result, while Plaintiffs' submission should be no more than 250 pages, the Court will not expressly require it. Likewise, while the Local Rule requires that "[a] reply memorandum may not exceed 10 pages," D. Conn. L R. 7(d), the Court will not impose that limit and prohibit any filing twice that length. That said, the Court expects the parties to use sound judgment and to remember that the quality of a filing matters significantly more than its length. For similar reasons, the Court will not address any motion not currently before it. See Ruling On Pls. Mot. for Leave to Am. at 15-16, ECF No. 487 (noting "[t]he Court will continue to carefully exercise its discretion to evaluate any future motion for leave to amend).Finally, consistent with its inherent authority, the Court reserves the right to impose strict page limitations on any future filing if any party's filing fails to reflect the use of sound judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/25/2018. (Giammatteo, J.)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER granting #539 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew C. Wagner; Jonathan P. Whitcomb; Jane Catherine Christie and Ingrid Clarice Festin terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/25/2018. (Giammatteo, J.)
April 24, 2018 Filing 540 Joint RESPONSE re #538 MOTION for Permission to File Consolidated Brief in Opposition to 18 Motions to Dismiss re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13, 14 and 24 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, #526 MOT filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, AllState Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Joining Defendants)(Fenton, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Filing 539 MOTION for Jonathan P. Whitcomb, Matthew C. Wagner, Jane C. Christie and Ingrid C. Festin to Withdraw as Attorney by Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch.. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
April 17, 2018 Filing 538 MOTION for Permission to File Consolidated Brief in Opposition to 18 Motions to Dismiss re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13, 14 and 24 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, #526 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #524 MOTION to Dismiss , #505 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #512 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #522 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 26, 27, 28, 29 and 35 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, #508 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint, #502 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #520 MOTION to Dismiss Eight Counts of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint, #533 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132 and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint, #518 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 33 and 34 of Fourth Amended Complaint, #510 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #514 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #530 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint, #499 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, #497 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Counts 47 to 184 of the Fourth Amended Complaint, #509 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint, #528 MOTION to Dismiss by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba.Responses due by 5/8/2018 (Suerth, Ryan)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting #536 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert J. Chomiak, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/10/2018. (Giammatteo, J.)
April 9, 2018 Filing 536 MOTION for Robert J. Chomiak, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Aegis Security Insurance Co. (Chomiak, Robert)
April 6, 2018 Filing 535 AFFIDAVIT re #533 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132 and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint, #534 Memorandum in Support of Motion Signed By Susan Caldwell filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Blouin, Daniel)
April 6, 2018 Filing 534 Memorandum in Support re #533 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132 and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
April 6, 2018 Filing 533 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 25, 86, 132 and 178 of the Fourth Amended Complaint by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Blouin, Daniel)
April 6, 2018 Filing 532 AFFIDAVIT re #531 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #530 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint Signed By Susan Caldwell filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Blouin, Daniel)
April 6, 2018 Filing 531 Memorandum in Support re #530 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
April 6, 2018 Filing 530 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 49, 55, 95, 101, 141, and 147 of the Fourth Amended Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Blouin, Daniel)
April 6, 2018 Filing 529 Memorandum in Support re #528 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Appendix)(Kelly, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 528 MOTION to Dismiss by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co..Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Kelly, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 527 Memorandum in Support re #526 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by NGM Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Petter, Kelly)
April 6, 2018 Filing 526 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint by NGM Ins Co.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Petter, Kelly)
April 6, 2018 Filing 525 Memorandum in Support re #524 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Aylward, Michael)
April 6, 2018 Filing 524 MOTION to Dismiss by American Commerce Insurance Co.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Aylward, Michael)
April 6, 2018 Filing 523 Memorandum in Support re #522 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 26, 27, 28, 29 and 35 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
April 6, 2018 Filing 522 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 26, 27, 28, 29 and 35 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Miller, Susan)
April 6, 2018 Filing 521 Memorandum in Support re #520 MOTION to Dismiss Eight Counts of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Antonellis, Michael)
April 6, 2018 Filing 520 MOTION to Dismiss Eight Counts of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint by Amica Mutual Ins. Co.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Antonellis, Michael)
April 6, 2018 Filing 519 Memorandum in Support re #518 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 33 and 34 of Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Klaffky, Stephen)
April 6, 2018 Filing 518 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 33 and 34 of Fourth Amended Complaint by Homesite Ins. Co..Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Klaffky, Stephen)
April 6, 2018 Filing 517 Memorandum in Support re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13, 14 and 24 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Peerless Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Leary, Kieran)
April 6, 2018 Filing 516 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13, 14 and 24 of The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Peerless Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Leary, Kieran)
April 6, 2018 Filing 515 Memorandum in Support re #514 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by AllState Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pawelcyzks Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Swart Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Lajeunesse Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 - Alexander Ruling)(Fenton, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 514 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint by AllState Insurance Co of America.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Fenton, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 513 Memorandum in Support re #512 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration Pages, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sanzo Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rogers Decision, #5 Exhibit 5 - Lajeunesse Decision, #6 Exhibit 6 - Alexandar Ruling)(Fenton, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 512 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Fenton, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 511 Memorandum in Support re #510 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Halloran Declaration Pages, #4 Exhibit 4 - Zaremba Declaration Pages, #5 Exhibit 5 - Alexander Ruling)(Fenton, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 510 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint by Kemper Independence Insurance Company.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Fenton, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 509 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint by Citizens Insurance Company of America.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Ackerman, Wystan)
April 6, 2018 Filing 508 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ackerman, Wystan)
April 6, 2018 Filing 507 AFFIDAVIT re #505 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Signed By Courtland J. Troutman filed by Bunker Hill Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 506 Memorandum in Support re #505 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Bunker Hill Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)(Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 505 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint by Bunker Hill Ins Co.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 504 AFFIDAVIT re #502 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Signed By Janice Ingarra filed by New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 503 Memorandum in Support re #502 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)(Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 502 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint by New London County Mutual Insurance Company.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 501 AFFIDAVIT re #499 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Signed By Sandra E. Belcourt filed by Trumbull Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 500 Memorandum in Support re #499 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Trumbull Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)(Farrish, Thomas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 499 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint by Trumbull Ins Co.Responses due by 4/27/2018 (Farrish, Thomas)
April 5, 2018 Filing 498 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations by Standard Fire Ins Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America.Responses due by 4/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Ackerman, Wystan)
April 5, 2018 Filing 497 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Counts 47 to 184 of the Fourth Amended Complaint by Peerless Insurance Co., Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America.Responses due by 4/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1)(Leary, Kieran)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting #494 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/4/2018. (Giammatteo, J.)
March 30, 2018 Filing 495 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs (Fagelson, Marilyn)
March 30, 2018 Filing 494 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to File Memoranda in Excess of Page Limit by Bunker Hill Ins Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Trumbull Ins Co. (Raccuia, Daniel)
March 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER granting #491 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph H. Carlisle terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/18/2018. (Giammatteo, J.)
March 16, 2018 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Petter on behalf of NGM Ins Co (Petter, Kelly)
March 16, 2018 Filing 491 MOTION for Joseph H. Carlisle to Withdraw as Attorney by NGM Ins Co. (Ober, Scott)
March 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting #489 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melissa A Federico terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/11/2018. (Giammatteo, J.)
March 9, 2018 Filing 489 MOTION for Melissa A. Federico to Withdraw as Attorney by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Nancy Poulin, Stanley Zaremba. (Federico, Melissa)
February 14, 2018 Filing 488 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth Amended Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Stanley Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend, ECF No. #462 . is GRANTED. The pending motions addressing the Substituted Third Amended Complaint are DISMISSED as moot. See Joint Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #373 ; Joint Mot. Strike, ECF No. #375 ; Travelers Defs. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #377 ; Citizens Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss., ECF No. #379 ; Bunker Hill Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #381 ; New London County Mutual Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #384 ; Trumbull Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #387 ; Allstate Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #391 ; Metropolitan Group Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #394 ; Kemper Independence Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #397 ; Liberty Entities Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #399 ; Homesite Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #401 ; Amica Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #403 ; State Farm Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #405 ; State Farm Mot. Sever, ECF No. #407 ; Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #409 ; American Commerce Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #411 ; NGM Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #413 ; CSAA Fire and Casualty Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #415 ; Nationwide Property And Casualty Ins. Co. and Harleysville Preferred Ins. Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #416 ; Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co. Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. #420 .Plaintiffs are directed to file the Fourth Amended Complaint on the docket by February 16, 2018. Defendants will have until April 6, 2018, to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Fourth Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs then will have until May 11, 2018, to respond to any motions to dismiss filed by Defendants and Defendants will have until June 1, 2018, to reply to any response filed by Plaintiffs to their motions to dismiss. Oral argument on any motions to dismiss filed will be held on Wednesday, June 27, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT.. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/8/2018. (Giammatteo, J.)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting #485 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amos Hugh Scott terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/11/2017. (Giammatteo, J.)
December 8, 2017 Filing 485 MOTION for A. Hugh Scott to Withdraw as Attorney by American States Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Scott, Amos)
November 13, 2017 Filing 484 REPLY to Response to #462 MOTION to Amend/Correct #352 Amended Complaint,, filed by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
October 19, 2017 Filing 483 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A. Spinelli on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America (Spinelli, Lindsey)
October 17, 2017 Filing 482 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #474 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lindsey A. Spinelli to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4555689) by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Newbury, Philip)
October 16, 2017 Filing 481 RESPONSE re #462 MOTION to Amend/Correct #352 Amended Complaint,, filed by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Appendix of Unreported Authorities)(Kelly, William)
October 16, 2017 Filing 480 Memorandum in Opposition Certain Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Third Amended Complaint re #462 MOTION to Amend/Correct #352 Amended Complaint,, filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Leary, Kieran)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #477 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lawrence J. Klein terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/12/2017. (Giammatteo, J.)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER granting #476 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marc E. Haas terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/12/2017. (Giammatteo, J.)
October 11, 2017 Filing 477 MOTION for Lawrence Klein to Withdraw as Attorney by AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co. (Haas, Marc)
October 11, 2017 Filing 476 MOTION for Marc Haas to Withdraw as Attorney by AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co. (Haas, Marc)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting #474 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey A. Spinelli. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/3/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2017. (Fazekas, J.)
October 3, 2017 Filing 474 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lindsey A. Spinelli to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4555689) by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lindsey A. Spinelli)(Newbury, Philip)
October 2, 2017 Filing 473 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of AIG by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba (Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER adjourning oral argument previously set for 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/29/2017. (Riegel, J.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER denying as moot #466 Motion to Stay in light of the Court's Amended Scheduling Order #470 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/29/2017. (Riegel, J.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER granting #463 Motion to Amending Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/29/2017. (Riegel, J.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER denying as moot #464 . The Court directs the Office of Finance to reimburse Attorney Richard L. Fenton the $75.00 PHV fee #464 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/29/2017. (Riegel, J.)
September 29, 2017 Filing 468 REPLY to Response to #466 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #420 filed by American Commerce Insurance Co, Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Bunker Hill Ins Co, CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Homesite Ins. Co., Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, NGM Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Trumbull Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Redline)(Fenton, Richard)
September 28, 2017 Filing 467 Memorandum in Opposition re #463 MOTION to Stay Certain Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Briefing on Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #466 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #420 filed by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba. (Gruber, Sarah)
September 28, 2017 Filing 466 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #420 MOTION to Dismiss , #377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #401 MOTION to Dismiss , #384 MOTION to Dismiss , #381 MOTION to Dismiss , #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss Counts 42-45, 54 and 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint, #409 MOTION to Dismiss , #394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #387 MOTION to Dismiss , #415 MOTION to Dismiss , #375 Joint MOTION to Strike Motion by Certain Defendants to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations Briefing by American Commerce Insurance Co, Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Bunker Hill Ins Co, CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Homesite Ins. Co., Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, NGM Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Trumbull Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America.Responses due by 10/19/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ackerman, Wystan)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER. Attorney(s) Richard L. Fenton has been reinstated as a result from complying with Local Rule 83.1(d)(4) in 3:16cv1310 (VAB). Signed by Clerk on 9/28/2017.(Perez, J.)
September 28, 2017 Filing 464 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard L. Fenton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4550207) by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Flynn, Elizabeth)
September 28, 2017 Filing 463 MOTION to Stay Certain Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Briefing on Substituted Third Amended Complaint by American Commerce Insurance Co, Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Bunker Hill Ins Co, CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Homesite Ins. Co., Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, NGM Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America, Standard Fire Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Trumbull Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America.Responses due by 10/19/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ackerman, Wystan)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER Revoking Visiting Attorney Status of Attorney Richard L. Fenton for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(4) requiring the filing of a Certificate of Good Standing in 3:16cv1310 Valls et al v. Allstate Insurance Company. The Clerk of the Court shall examine the Courts docket and revoke said attorneys visiting attorney status in all cases in which said attorney has filed an appearance. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2017.(Perez, J.)
September 25, 2017 Filing 462 MOTION to Amend/Correct #352 Amended Complaint,, by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba.Responses due by 10/16/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint (Part 1)), #2 Exhibit A (Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint (Part 2)), #3 Exhibit A (Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint (Part 3)), #4 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend the Third Amended Complaint)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 22, 2017 Filing 461 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin (Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 15, 2017 Filing 460 EXHIBIT (Law Appendix) by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba re #458 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1, #2 Exhibit Tab 2, #3 Exhibit Tab 3, #4 Exhibit Tab 4, #5 Exhibit Tab 5, #6 Exhibit Tab 6, #7 Exhibit Tab 7, #8 Exhibit Tab 8, #9 Exhibit Tab 9, #10 Exhibit Tab 10, #11 Exhibit Tab 11, #12 Exhibit Tab 12, #13 Exhibit Tab 13, #14 Exhibit Tab 14, #15 Exhibit Tab 15, #16 Exhibit Tab 16, #17 Exhibit Tab 17, #18 Exhibit Tab 18, #19 Exhibit Tab 19, #20 Exhibit Tab 20, #21 Exhibit Tab 21, #22 Exhibit Tab 22, #23 Exhibit Tab 23, #24 Exhibit Tab 24, #25 Exhibit Tab 25, #26 Exhibit Tab 26, #27 Exhibit Tab 27, #28 Exhibit Tab 28, #29 Exhibit Tab 29, #30 Exhibit Tab 30, #31 Exhibit Tab 31, #32 Exhibit Tab 32, #33 Exhibit Tab 33, #34 Exhibit Tab 34, #35 Exhibit Tab 35, #36 Exhibit Tab 36, #37 Exhibit Tab 37, #38 Exhibit Tab 38, #39 Exhibit Tab 39, #40 Exhibit Tab 40, #41 Exhibit Tab 41, #42 Exhibit Tab 42, #43 Exhibit Tab 43, #44 Exhibit Tab 44, #45 Exhibit Tab 45, #46 Exhibit Tab 46, #47 Exhibit Tab 47, #48 Exhibit Tab 48, #49 Exhibit Tab 49, #50 Exhibit Tab 50, #51 Exhibit Tab 51, #52 Exhibit Tab 52, #53 Exhibit Tab 53, #54 Exhibit Tab 54, #55 Exhibit Tab 55, #56 Exhibit Tab 56, #57 Exhibit Tab 57)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 15, 2017 Filing 459 EXHIBIT A (Affidavit of Donna Frankenberg) by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba re #458 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1, #2 Exhibit Tab 2, #3 Exhibit Tab 3, #4 Exhibit Tab 4, #5 Exhibit Tab 5, #6 Exhibit Tab 6, #7 Exhibit Tab 7, #8 Exhibit Tab 8, #9 Exhibit Tab 9, #10 Exhibit Tab 10, #11 Exhibit Tab 11, #12 Exhibit Tab 12, #13 Exhibit Tab 13, #14 Exhibit Tab 14, #15 Exhibit Tab 15)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 15, 2017 Filing 458 Memorandum in Opposition Combined re #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss Counts 42-45, 54 and 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #405 MOTION to Dismiss , #399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint, #420 MOTION to Dismiss , #409 MOTION to Dismiss , #394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #401 MOTION to Dismiss , #384 MOTION to Dismiss , #381 MOTION to Dismiss , #415 MOTION to Dismiss , #387 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Part 2 of 2))(Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 15, 2017 Filing 457 Memorandum in Opposition re #375 Joint MOTION to Strike Motion by Certain Defendants to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations filed by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 15, 2017 Filing 456 RESPONSE re #405 MOTION to Dismiss , #407 MOTION to Sever filed by Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
September 15, 2017 Filing 455 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Status Conference. Held on 6/30/17 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: S. Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017. (Montini, S.)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting #452 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aubrey E. Blatchley terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/15/2017. (Giammatteo, J.)
September 15, 2017 Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Michelle Gruber on behalf of Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba (Gruber, Sarah)
September 14, 2017 Filing 452 MOTION for Aubrey E. Blatchley to Withdraw as Attorney by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
September 13, 2017 Filing 451 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #443 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. D'Aloia to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4495669) by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Scapellati, Daniel)
September 13, 2017 Filing 450 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #442 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joan M. Schwab to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4495660) by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Scapellati, Daniel)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #448 Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss. In granting such leave, the Court expects that Plaintiffs will address specifically the concerns raised by all of the Defendants in their respective Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/24/2017. (Chen, C.)
August 23, 2017 Filing 448 MOTION for Permission to File Consolidated Brief in Opposition to 19 Motions to Dismiss re #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #405 MOTION to Dismiss , #420 MOTION to Dismiss , #377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #401 MOTION to Dismiss , #384 MOTION to Dismiss , #381 MOTION to Dismiss , #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss Counts 42-45, 54 and 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint, #409 MOTION to Dismiss , #394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #387 MOTION to Dismiss , #415 MOTION to Dismiss by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba.Responses due by 9/13/2017 (Fagelson, Marilyn)
August 23, 2017 Filing 447 NOTICE by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co re #405 MOTION to Dismiss of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sickinger, Robert)
August 16, 2017 Filing 446 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan L. Labbe on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co (Labbe, Brendan)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting #443 Motion for Attorney David J. D'Aloia to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David J. D'Aloia for CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/9/2017. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2017. (Oliver, T.)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #442 Motion for Attorney Joan M. Schwab to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joan M Schwab for CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/9/2017. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2017. (Oliver, T.)
August 9, 2017 Filing 443 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. D'Aloia to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4495669) by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit David J. D'Aloia)(Scapellati, Daniel)
August 9, 2017 Filing 442 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joan M. Schwab to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4495660) by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joan M. Schwab)(Scapellati, Daniel)
August 8, 2017 Filing 441 NOTICE by Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America Of Supplemental Authority Regarding Toomey v. Central Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Decision)(Ackerman, Wystan)
July 27, 2017 Filing 440 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting #438 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Meg R. Reid to Withdraw as Attorney by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/13/2017. (Chen, C.)
July 12, 2017 Filing 438 MOTION for Meg R. Reid to Withdraw as Attorney by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co. (Reid, Meg)
July 5, 2017 Filing 437 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden) as to: #405 MOTION to Dismiss , #409 MOTION to Dismiss , #375 Joint MOTION to Strike Motion by Certain Defendants to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations, #387 MOTION to Dismiss , #415 MOTION to Dismiss , #394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #381 MOTION to Dismiss , #407 MOTION to Sever , #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #420 MOTION to Dismiss , #391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint, #384 MOTION to Dismiss , #401 MOTION to Dismiss , #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss Counts 42-45, 54 and 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint (Chen, C.)
June 30, 2017 Filing 436 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: In-Person Rule 16 Status Conference held on 6/30/2017. 22 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Chen, C.)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #434 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Meg R. Reid terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/30/2017. (Chen, C.)
June 29, 2017 Filing 434 MOTION for Meg R. Reid to Withdraw as Attorney by Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (Reid, Meg)
June 28, 2017 Filing 433 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl R. Ficks, Jr on behalf of Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co (Ficks, Carl)
June 28, 2017 Filing 432 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl R. Ficks, Jr on behalf of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Ficks, Carl)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #429 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #405 MOTION to Dismiss , #409 MOTION to Dismiss , #387 MOTION to Dismiss , #415 MOTION to Dismiss , #394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #381 MOTION to Dismiss , #407 MOTION to Sever , #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #420 MOTION to Dismiss , #391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint, #384 MOTION to Dismiss , #401 MOTION to Dismiss , #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss Counts 42-45, 54 and 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint Responses due by 9/15/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/19/2017. (Chen, C.)
June 16, 2017 Filing 430 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fagelson, Marilyn)
June 15, 2017 Filing 429 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #413 MOTION to Dismiss , #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #411 MOTION to Dismiss , #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #405 MOTION to Dismiss , #420 MOTION to Dismiss , #407 MOTION to Sever , #377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #401 MOTION to Dismiss , #384 MOTION to Dismiss , #381 MOTION to Dismiss , #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss Counts 42-45, 54 and 57 of the Third Amended Complaint, #399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint, #409 MOTION to Dismiss , #394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, #387 MOTION to Dismiss , #415 MOTION to Dismiss , #375 Joint MOTION to Strike Motion by Certain Defendants to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations until September 15, 2017 by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba. (Fagelson, Marilyn)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting #425 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter K. O'Keefe; Joseph M. Busher, Jr and Philip R. Dunn, Jr terminated; granting #426 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter K. O'Keefe; Joseph M. Busher, Jr and Philip R. Dunn, Jr terminated; granting #427 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter K. O'Keefe; Joseph M. Busher, Jr and Philip R. Dunn, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/12/2017. (Chen, C.)
June 9, 2017 Filing 427 MOTION for Joseph M. Busher, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co. (Busher, Joseph)
June 9, 2017 Filing 426 MOTION for Philip R. Dunn, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co. (Dunn, Philip)
June 9, 2017 Filing 425 MOTION for Peter K. O'Keefe to Withdraw as Attorney by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co. (O'Keefe, Peter)
June 8, 2017 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Marilyn Beth Fagelson on behalf of Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba (Fagelson, Marilyn)
June 8, 2017 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McAndrew Suerth on behalf of Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba (Suerth, Ryan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 422 EXHIBIT 1 by Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America re #378 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29, #29 Exhibit 30, #30 Exhibit 31, #31 Exhibit 32, #32 Exhibit 33, #33 Exhibit 34, #34 Exhibit 35, #35 Exhibit 36, #36 Exhibit 37, #37 Exhibit 38, #38 Exhibit 39, #39 Exhibit 40, #40 Exhibit 41, #41 Exhibit 42, #42 Exhibit 43, #43 Exhibit 44, #44 Exhibit 45, #45 Exhibit 46, #46 Exhibit 47, #47 Exhibit 48, #48 Exhibit 49, #49 Exhibit 50, #50 Exhibit 51, #51 Exhibit 52, #52 Exhibit 53, #53 Exhibit 54, #54 Exhibit 55, #55 Exhibit 56, #56 Exhibit 57, #57 Exhibit 58, #58 Exhibit 59, #59 Exhibit 60, #60 Exhibit 61, #61 Exhibit 62, #62 Exhibit 63, #63 Exhibit 64, #64 Exhibit 65, #65 Exhibit 66)(Ackerman, Wystan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 421 Memorandum in Support re #420 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)(Kelly, William)
June 2, 2017 Filing 420 MOTION to Dismiss by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co..Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Kelly, William)
June 2, 2017 Filing 419 Memorandum in Support re #415 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Joseph Bellesheim)(Scapellati, Daniel)
June 2, 2017 Filing 418 AFFIDAVIT re #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint Declaration Signed By Charlie Mitchell filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Blouin, Daniel)
June 2, 2017 Filing 417 Memorandum in Support re #416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
June 2, 2017 Filing 416 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Counts 4, 12, 22, 23, 42-46, 54, 56, 57 of the Third Amended Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Blouin, Daniel)
June 2, 2017 Filing 415 MOTION to Dismiss by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Scapellati, Daniel)
June 2, 2017 Filing 414 Memorandum in Support re #413 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NGM Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carlisle, Joseph)
June 2, 2017 Filing 413 MOTION to Dismiss by NGM Ins Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Carlisle, Joseph)
June 2, 2017 Filing 412 Memorandum in Support re #411 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Aylward, Michael)
June 2, 2017 Filing 411 MOTION to Dismiss by American Commerce Insurance Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Aylward, Michael)
June 2, 2017 Filing 410 Memorandum in Support re #409 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 409 MOTION to Dismiss by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Miller, Susan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 408 Memorandum in Support re #407 MOTION to Sever filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Karpie, Karen)
June 2, 2017 Filing 407 MOTION to Sever by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Karpie, Karen)
June 2, 2017 Filing 406 Memorandum in Support re #405 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Karpie, Karen)
June 2, 2017 Filing 405 MOTION to Dismiss by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Pamphlet, #2 Exhibit B-Certificate, #3 Exhibit C- Letter 2 21 2014, #4 Exhibit D - Letter 3 18 2014, #5 Exhibit E - Letter 10 28 2014)(Karpie, Karen)
June 2, 2017 Filing 404 Memorandum in Support re #403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint filed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Antonellis, Anthony)
June 2, 2017 Filing 403 MOTION to Dismiss Substituted Third Amended Complaint by Amica Mutual Ins. Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Antonellis, Anthony)
June 2, 2017 Filing 402 Memorandum in Support re #401 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Klaffky, Stephen)
June 2, 2017 Filing 401 MOTION to Dismiss by Homesite Ins. Co..Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Klaffky, Stephen)
June 2, 2017 Filing 400 Memorandum in Support re #399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Leary, Kieran)
June 2, 2017 Filing 399 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Entities' Motion to Dismiss Counts 10, 13 and 21 of Substituted Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Leary, Kieran)
June 2, 2017 Filing 398 Memorandum in Support re #397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Policy, #2 Exhibit 2: Amended Policy, #3 Exhibit 3: Halloran Declaration Pages, #4 Exhibit 4: Zaremba Declaration Pages, #5 Exhibit 5: Alexander Ruling)(Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 397 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint by Kemper Independence Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 396 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kemper Independence Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trinity Universal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Kemper Corporation for Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 395 Memorandum in Support re #394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint filed by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Policy, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration Pages, #3 Exhibit 3: Alexander Ruling)(Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 394 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 393 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc., Corporate Parent Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company for Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co. (Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 392 Memorandum in Support re #391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint filed by AllState Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Pawelczyk Policy, #2 Exhibit 2: Swart Policy, #3 Exhibit 3: Alexander Ruling)(Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 391 MOTION to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint by AllState Insurance Co of America.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 390 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AllState Insurance Co of America identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for AllState Insurance Co of America. (Fenton, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 389 AFFIDAVIT re #387 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Sandra Belcourt filed by Trumbull Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 388 Memorandum in Support re #387 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Trumbull Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)(Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 387 MOTION to Dismiss by Trumbull Ins Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 386 AFFIDAVIT re #384 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Janice Ingarra filed by New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 385 Memorandum in Support re #384 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)(Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 384 MOTION to Dismiss by New London County Mutual Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 383 AFFIDAVIT re #381 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Courtland Troutman filed by Bunker Hill Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 382 Memorandum in Support re #381 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bunker Hill Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Of Authorities)(Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 381 MOTION to Dismiss by Bunker Hill Ins Co.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Farrish, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Filing 380 Memorandum in Support re #379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ackerman, Wystan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 379 MOTION to Dismiss Citizens' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint by Citizens Insurance Company of America.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Ackerman, Wystan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 378 Memorandum in Support re #377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint filed by Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America. (Ackerman, Wystan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 377 MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Substituted Third Amended Complaint by Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Ackerman, Wystan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 376 Joint Memorandum in Support re #375 Joint MOTION to Strike Motion by Certain Defendants to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations filed by Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Ackerman, Wystan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 375 Joint MOTION to Strike Motion by Certain Defendants to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations by Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ackerman, Wystan)
June 1, 2017 Filing 374 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Scapellati on behalf of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Scapellati, Daniel)
June 1, 2017 Filing 373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss Counts 42-45, 54 and 57 of the Third Amended Complaint by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America.Responses due by 6/22/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix A)(Leary, Kieran)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #371 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth J. Stewart terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/20/2016. (Chen, C.)
May 25, 2017 Filing 371 MOTION for Elizabeth J. Stewart to Withdraw as Attorney by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, David Kandrysawtz, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Geoffrey Luxenberg, Kelly Luxenberg, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Amy Somerville, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba. (Stewart, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting #369 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may jointly file a brief not exceeding forty pagesin support of motions to dismiss the Joint Counts; each Defendant may file a brief not exceeding forty pages insupport of its motion to dismiss counts other than the Joint Counts,and may incorporate the joint brief by reference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/24/2017. (Chen, C.)
May 23, 2017 Filing 369 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bunker Hill Ins Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Trumbull Ins Co. (Raccuia, Daniel)
May 17, 2017 Filing 368 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Kelly, William)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #366 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michele C. Wojcik terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/12/2017. (Chen, C.)
May 11, 2017 Filing 366 MOTION for Michele C. Wojcik to Withdraw as Attorney by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company. (Wojcik, Michele)
May 11, 2017 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc. (Ackerman, Wystan)
May 10, 2017 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. Goldman on behalf of Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co, The Travelers Companies, Inc. (Goldman, Stephen)
May 9, 2017 Answer deadline updated for American Commerce Insurance Co to 6/2/2017; Amica Mutual Ins. Co to 6/2/2017; Aspen American Insurance Co to 6/2/2017; Bunker Hill Ins Co to 6/2/2017; CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company to 6/2/2017; Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Co to 6/2/2017; Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company to 6/2/2017; Homesite Ins. Co. to 6/2/2017; Insurance Services Office, Inc. to 6/2/2017; Kemper Independence Insurance Company to 6/2/2017; Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co to 6/2/2017; Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co to 6/2/2017; Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co. to 6/2/2017; NGM Ins Co to 6/2/2017; Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company to 6/2/2017; New London County Mutual Insurance Company to 6/2/2017; Peerless Insurance Co. to 6/2/2017; Safeco Insurance Company of America to 6/2/2017; Standard Fire Ins Co to 6/2/2017; State Farm Fire & Casualty Co to 6/2/2017; Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co to 6/2/2017; Travelers Indemnity Co of America to 6/2/2017; Trumbull Ins Co to 6/2/2017; Vigilant Ins Co to 6/2/2017; AIG Property Casualty Company to 6/2/2017. (Perez, J.)
May 8, 2017 Filing 363 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/16/2017; Rule 16 Status Conference set for 6/30/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Chen, C.)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER. In light of the 351 Order Lifting Stay, Set/Clear Flags, Defendants shall file a response to the #352 Third Amended Complaint by 6/2/2017. The Parties shall confer and prepare a Local Rule 26(f) Report by 6/16/2017. A Rule 16 Conference shall be held in person on 6/30/2017 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/8/2017. (Chen, C.)
May 3, 2017 Filing 361 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #358 MOTION for Attorney(s) John McCormack to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4385386) by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (McCormack, John)
May 3, 2017 Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by John McCormack on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co (McCormack, John)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting #358 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney John McCormack for Amica Mutual Ins. Co, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2017. (Fazekas, J.)
April 28, 2017 Filing 358 MOTION for Attorney(s) John McCormack to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4385386) by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Antonellis, Anthony)
April 27, 2017 Filing 357 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant MAPFRE Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs (Spinella, Anthony)
April 21, 2017 Filing 356 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of PARTIES by All Plaintiffs (Spinella, Anthony)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #354 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brooke L. French terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/21/2017. (Chen, C.)
April 20, 2017 Filing 354 Motion by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida of Withdrawal of Counsel (French, Brooke) Modified on 4/21/2017 to correct event(Fazekas, J.).
April 7, 2017 Filing 353 EXHIBIT (1 through 5 to ECF No. 352) by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Deborah MacGlafin, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling re #352 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Stewart, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2017 Filing 352 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phil Basquiat, Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Donna Frankenberg, Michael Furlong, Sue Ann Furlong, Jacqueline Gribbon, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Patricia Kandrysawtz, Paula LaValley, Peter LaValley, Alfred Lesperance, Alfred J. Lesperance, Jeannette Lesperance, Jeannette G. Lesperance, Scott MacGlafin, Jodi Mansfield, Robert Mansfield, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio, Carolyn McKinney, Mark McKinney, Kathy Noblet, Dawn L. Norris, Felice Pawelcyzk, Mark Pawelcyzk, Donald Poulin, Nancy Poulin, Colleen Swart, Steven Swart, Mary Lou Thieling, Stanley Zaremba.(Pesta, J.)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER LIFTING STAY in light of the Court's #350 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/6/2017. (Chen, C.)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #332 Motion to Amend/Correct. See attached Order. Plaintiffs are directed to file the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, ECF No. 339-1.As Defendants request, ECF No. 340 4, Defendants shall file a responsive pleading thirty (30) days after new Defendants are served and have appeared in this matter. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/6/2017. (Chen, C.)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #339 Motion to Amend/Correct the #332 Motion To Amend/Correct the Complaint. The Proposed Third Amended Complaint is replaced with the Substituted Third Amended Complaint, ECF No. 339-1. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/6/2017. (Chen, C.)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #336 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew J. Kennedy terminated; granting #342 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/4/2017. (Chen, C.)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #346 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert D. Helfand terminated for Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/31/2017. (Chen, C.)
March 30, 2017 Filing 346 MOTION for Robert D. Helfand to Withdraw as Attorney by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Helfand, Robert)
March 10, 2017 Filing 345 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam D. Lewis on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange (Lewis, Adam)
March 6, 2017 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Shukla on behalf of Bunker Hill Ins Co, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Trumbull Ins Co (Shukla, Jennifer)
January 13, 2017 Filing 343 REPLY to Response to #339 MOTION to Amend/Correct #332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, (Replace Exhibit A), #332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, filed by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stewart, Elizabeth)
January 3, 2017 Filing 342 MOTION for Joinder DEFENDANT, AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANYS JOINDER TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REPLACE EXHIBIT A TO THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FOR PERMISSIVE JOINDER WITH A SUBSTITUTED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Antonellis, Anthony)
December 30, 2016 Filing 341 RESPONSE re #339 MOTION to Amend/Correct #332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, (Replace Exhibit A) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Substituted Third Amended Complaint filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Karpie, Karen)
December 30, 2016 Filing 340 RESPONSE re #339 MOTION to Amend/Correct #332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, (Replace Exhibit A) filed by American Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, National Surety Corp, Pacific Indemnity Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Service Automobile Association, Universal North America Insurance Company, Vigilant Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ackerman, Wystan)
December 12, 2016 Filing 339 MOTION to Amend/Correct #332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, (Replace Exhibit A) by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio.Responses due by 1/2/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Substituted Third Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Stewart, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2016 Filing 338 RESPONSE re #332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, filed by American Commerce Insurance Co, Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Economy Premier Assurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Homesite Ins. Co., Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Merastar Ins Co, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., NGM Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co., AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fenton, Richard)
November 21, 2016 Filing 337 Memorandum in Opposition re #332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Karpie, Karen)
November 10, 2016 Filing 336 MOTION for Matthew J. Kennedy to Withdraw as Attorney by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Antonellis, Anthony)
November 4, 2016 Filing 335 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #331 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael S.Antonellis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4179334) by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Antonellis, Anthony)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting #331 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael S. Antonellis for Amica Mutual Ins. Co, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/1/2017. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/16. (Gould, K.)
November 2, 2016 Filing 333 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Carlisle on behalf of NGM Ins Co (Carlisle, Joseph)
October 31, 2016 Filing 332 MOTION to Amend/Correct 326 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio.Responses due by 11/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Third Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend and for Permissive Joinder)(Stewart, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2016 Filing 331 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael S.Antonellis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4179334) by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael S. Antonellis)(Antonellis, Anthony)
October 19, 2016 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Federico on behalf of Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio (Federico, Melissa)
October 19, 2016 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Stewart on behalf of Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio (Stewart, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order In accordance with the Court's 326 Order granting the Motion to Amend/Correct the Case Schedule, all proceedings in this case are STAYED pending the Court's ruling on the Plaintiffs' forthcoming motion for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/18/2016. (Chen, C.)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #327 Motion for Joinder of Defendants Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company to the Defendants joined in the #325 Motion to Amend/Correct the Case Schedule. Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company are also subject to the Court's 326 Order granting the Motion to Amend/Correct the Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/18/2016. (Chen, C.)
October 17, 2016 Filing 327 MOTION for Joinder re:Joint Motion for Modification of Case Schedule (Document #325) by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Miller, Susan)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Motion to Amend/Correct the Case Schedule. As all parties are in agreement, Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint by 10/31/2016; Defendants will respond to that motion within the twenty-one (21) day period provided by the Local Rules. Defendants' obligations to file responsive pleadings directed to the Second Amended Complaint are STAYED pending a ruling on the forthcoming motion for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint. Upon the Court's issuance of a ruling on the forthcoming motion for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint, Defendants shall have thirty (30) days to respond to the operative Complaint. All other proceedings in this case are STAYED until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/14/2016. (Chen, C.)
October 13, 2016 Filing 325 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule by American Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Electric Insurance Company, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, National Surety Corp, Pacific Indemnity Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, Universal North America Insurance Company, Vigilant Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co.Responses due by 11/3/2016 (Ackerman, Wystan)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER LIFTING STAY. In light of the Court's 323 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint, the stay in this case is lifted. Please note that, pursuant to the Court's previous 254 Order, responses to the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint are due in thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/4/2016. (Chen, C.)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #290 Second Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Given that #309 Defendants have no objection, Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is granted. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/4/2016. (Chen, C.)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #311 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aubrey E. Blatchley terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/3/2016. (Chen, C.)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting #320 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua P Broudy terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/3/2016. (Chen, C.)
September 30, 2016 Filing 320 MOTION for Joshua P. Broudy to Withdraw as Attorney by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Broudy, Joshua)
September 30, 2016 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lynn Trifon on behalf of Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co (Trifon, Tara)
June 23, 2016 Filing 318 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #312 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian I. Hays to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4028209) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Hays, Brian)
June 14, 2016 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian I. Hays on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange (Hays, Brian)
June 14, 2016 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall A. Hack on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange (Hack, Randall)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting #313 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Randall A. Hack.. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #312 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian I. Hays for Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., and Truck Insurance Exchange, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/9/2016. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
June 9, 2016 Filing 313 MOTION for Attorney(s) Randall A. Hack to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4028233) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blatchley, Aubrey)
June 9, 2016 Filing 312 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian I. Hays to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4028209) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blatchley, Aubrey)
June 9, 2016 Filing 311 MOTION for Aubrey E. Blatchley to Withdraw as Attorney by 21st Century Premier Insurance Co.. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
June 3, 2016 Filing 310 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Covenant Ins Co identifying Other Affiliate Arbella Inc.; Other Affiliate Arbella Mutual Ins Co for Covenant Ins Co. (Noel, Ashley) Modified on 6/6/2016 to add other affiliate (Fazekas, J.).
May 26, 2016 Filing 309 RESPONSE re #290 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Commerce Insurance Co, American Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American States Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Armed Forces Insurance Exch., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Bunker Hill Ins Co, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Casco Indemnity Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Continental Casualty Company, Countryway Insurance Co, Covenant Ins Co, Danbury Ins Co, Economy Premier Assurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co, Homesite Ins. Co., Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Integon National Insurance Co, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Merastar Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Middlesex Insurance Company, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., NGM Ins Co, National Surety Corp, Nationwide General Ins Co, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, New London County Mutual Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Pacific Indemnity Co, Pacific Specialty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, Peerless Insurance Co., Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch., Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Republic Franklin Ins Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Standard Fire Ins Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, Tower Insurance Company of New York, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Truck Insurance Exchange, Trumbull Ins Co, Twin City Fire Ins Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Service Automobile Association, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co., Universal North America Insurance Company, Utica First Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co, Valley Forge Insurance Co., Vermont Mutual Insurance Co., Vigilant Ins Co, 21st Century Premier Insurance Co., AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Aegis Security Insurance Co, Affiliated Fm Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fenton, Richard)
May 26, 2016 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. D'Aloia on behalf of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (D'Aloia, David)
May 24, 2016 Filing 307 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bedivere Insurance Co. (Aylward, Michael)
May 24, 2016 Filing 306 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co.. (Aylward, Michael)
May 24, 2016 Filing 305 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Aylward, Michael)
May 20, 2016 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Y. Barrasso on behalf of Homesite Ins. Co., 21st Century Premier Insurance Co. (Barrasso, Judy)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #302 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Judy Y. Barrasso.. Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
May 19, 2016 Filing 302 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judy Y. Barrasso to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4005341) by Homesite Ins. Co., 21st Century Premier Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Klaffky, Stephen)
May 19, 2016 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Klaffky on behalf of 21st Century Premier Insurance Co. (Klaffky, Stephen)
May 17, 2016 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Scannell on behalf of Covenant Ins Co (Scannell, Timothy)
May 16, 2016 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley A. Noel on behalf of Covenant Ins Co (Noel, Ashley)
May 16, 2016 Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison A Russo on behalf of Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co (Russo, Allison)
May 16, 2016 Filing 297 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison A Russo on behalf of Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Russo, Allison)
May 12, 2016 Filing 296 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #231 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ashley A. Noel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3959939) by Armed Forces Insurance Exch.. (Noel, Ashley)
May 11, 2016 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan L. Miller on behalf of Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Miller, Susan)
May 11, 2016 Filing 294 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan L. Miller on behalf of Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co (Miller, Susan)
May 10, 2016 Filing 293 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Horace Mann Ins Co, Teachers Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Horace Mann Educators Corporation for Horace Mann Ins Co, Teachers Insurance Co. (Ackerman, Wystan)
May 9, 2016 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Ingrid Clarice Festin on behalf of Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch. (Festin, Ingrid)
May 9, 2016 Filing 291 NOTICE by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio re #290 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Declaration of Ryan P. Barry (Spinella, Anthony)
May 7, 2016 Filing 290 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio.Responses due by 5/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Ex 6, #8 Exhibit Ex 7A, #9 Exhibit Ex 7B, #10 Exhibit Ex 8, #11 Exhibit Ex 9A, #12 Exhibit Ex 9B, #13 Exhibit Ex 10, #14 Exhibit Ex 11A, #15 Exhibit Ex 11B, #16 Exhibit Ex 12, #17 Exhibit Ex 13, #18 Exhibit Ex 14, #19 Exhibit Ex 15, #20 Exhibit Ex 16, #21 Exhibit Ex 17, #22 Exhibit Ex 18, #23 Exhibit Ex 19, #24 Exhibit Ex 20)(Spinella, Anthony)
May 3, 2016 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylore E. Karpa on behalf of American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York (Karpa, Taylore)
May 2, 2016 Filing 288 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #286 MOTION for Attorney(s) Taylore E. Karpa to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3981585) by American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Karpa)(Keller, Michael)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #286 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylore E. Karpa. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/1/2016. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
April 29, 2016 Filing 286 MOTION for Attorney(s) Taylore E. Karpa to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3981585) by American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit re Pro Hac Vice - Karpa)(Keller, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 285 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co.. (Aylward, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 284 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co. (Aylward, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 283 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Middlesex Insurance Company. (Aylward, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 282 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Integon National Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent National General Holdings Corp. for Integon National Insurance Co. (Aylward, Michael) Modified on 4/29/2016 to add corporate parent (Fazekas, J.).
April 27, 2016 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Schneider on behalf of American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York (Schneider, William)
April 27, 2016 Filing 280 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Employers Mutual Casualty Co. (Aylward, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 279 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Aylward, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 278 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Aylward, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Aylward on behalf of American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York (Aylward, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 276 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #223 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael F. Aylward to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3959392) by American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Keller, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Filing 275 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #224 MOTION for Attorney(s) William A. Schneider to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3959436) by American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Keller, Michael)
April 20, 2016 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Scapellati on behalf of Merastar Ins Co (Scapellati, Daniel)
April 20, 2016 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by Meg R. Reid on behalf of Merastar Ins Co (Reid, Meg)
April 19, 2016 Filing 272 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Status Conference. Held on 4/12/16 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016. (Montini, S.)
April 15, 2016 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Meg R. Reid on behalf of Economy Premier Assurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co. (Reid, Meg)
April 15, 2016 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Scapellati on behalf of Economy Premier Assurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co. (Scapellati, Daniel)
April 15, 2016 Filing 269 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New London County Mutual Insurance Company. (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 15, 2016 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Mullins on behalf of New London County Mutual Insurance Company (Mullins, Michael)
April 15, 2016 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of New London County Mutual Insurance Company (Cerreta, John)
April 15, 2016 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Raccuia on behalf of New London County Mutual Insurance Company (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 15, 2016 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas O. Farrish on behalf of New London County Mutual Insurance Company (Farrish, Thomas)
April 15, 2016 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Meg R. Reid on behalf of Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Reid, Meg)
April 15, 2016 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Meg R. Reid on behalf of Countryway Insurance Co (Reid, Meg)
April 14, 2016 Filing 261 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Donnelly, Derek)
April 14, 2016 Filing 260 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. (Donnelly, Derek)
April 14, 2016 Filing 259 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Donnelly, Derek)
April 14, 2016 Filing 258 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Donnelly, Derek)
April 13, 2016 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen C. Rodriguez on behalf of Economy Premier Assurance Company, Merastar Ins Co, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co. (Rodriguez, Kristen)
April 13, 2016 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L Hanover on behalf of Economy Premier Assurance Company, Merastar Ins Co, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co. (Hanover, Mark)
April 13, 2016 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Fenton on behalf of Economy Premier Assurance Company, Merastar Ins Co, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co. (Fenton, Richard)
April 12, 2016 Filing 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2016 re #239 First MOTION for Proposed Case Management Order Order filed by Joyce Halloran, Patricia Brozek, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Michael Halloran, Michael Dyer, Steven Brozek, Victoria Masciovecchio, #158 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Joyce Halloran, Patricia Brozek, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Michael Halloran, Michael Dyer, Steven Brozek, Victoria Masciovecchio, #240 MOTION for entry of proposed case management plan Order filed by 21st Century Premier Insurance Co., National Surety Corp, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Insurance Co of North America, Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Armed Forces Insurance Exch., Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Ace American Insurance Company, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Amica Mutual Ins. Co, NGM Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, USAA Casualty Ins Co, Countryway Insurance Co, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Pacific Specialty Insurance Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, Pacific Indemnity Co, Continental Casualty Company, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Stonington Insurance Company, Homesite Ins. Co., Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America, United Service Automobile Association, Utica Mutual Ins Co, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, American Insurance Company, Utica First Ins Co, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch., Vigilant Ins Co, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Great Northern Ins Co, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Valley Forge Insurance Co., Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Nationwide General Ins Co, Balboa Ins Co, AIG Property Casualty Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Chubb National Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, Liberty Insurance Corp, Encompass Indemnity Company, Federal Insurance Co, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Affiliated Fm Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Tower Insurance Company of New York, Standard Fire Ins Co, Casco Indemnity Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Aegis Security Insurance Co, Electric Insurance Company, Danbury Ins Co, Twin City Fire Ins Co, Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Teachers Insurance Co, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., American Strategic Insurance Corp., Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, LM Insurance Corp, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Vermont Mutual Insurance Co., Praetorian Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American States Insurance Company, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AIU Ins Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Bunker Hill Ins Co, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Horace Mann Ins Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Universal North America Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Peerless Insurance Co., Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Trumbull Ins Co, Allstate Indemnity Co, Scheduling Conference held on 4/12/2016. Total Time: 42 minutes.(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Gould, K.)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #239 and #240 Motions for Case Management Order.Any motion for leave to file an amended complaint is due 5/6/2016. Oppositions are due 5/27/2016, and Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due 6/10/2016. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend, and defendants' oppositions, may address discovery issues. If the Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend, responses to the amended complaint are due 30 days after the Court's ruling. Discovery, and the parties' obligations under Rule 26(f), are stayed pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' motion to amend.Plaintiffs' #158 Motion to Certify Class is denied without prejudice to renewal following the Court's resolution of any motion to amend, and motions to dismiss directed at the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/12/2016. (LaPre, E.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Pearlman on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc. (Pearlman, Andrew)
April 11, 2016 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scheinkman on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc. (Scheinkman, Michael)
April 11, 2016 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Cohen on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc. (Cohen, Joel)
April 11, 2016 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley A. Noel on behalf of Armed Forces Insurance Exch. (Noel, Ashley)
April 11, 2016 Filing 249 RESPONSE re #248 Response,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Fenton, Richard)
April 11, 2016 Filing 248 RESPONSE re #239 First MOTION for Proposed Case Management Order Order filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Commerce Insurance Co, American Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American States Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Armed Forces Insurance Exch., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Casco Indemnity Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Continental Casualty Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Homesite Ins. Co., Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Integon National Insurance Co, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Meritplan Insurance Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Middlesex Insurance Company, National Surety Corp, Nationwide General Ins Co, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Pacific Indemnity Co, Peerless Insurance Co., Praetorian Insurance Company, Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch., Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Republic Franklin Ins Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Standard Fire Ins Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, Tower Insurance Company of New York, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Truck Insurance Exchange, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Service Automobile Association, Universal North America Insurance Company, Utica First Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co, Valley Forge Insurance Co., Vigilant Ins Co, 21st Century Premier Insurance Co., AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Aegis Security Insurance Co, Affiliated Fm Ins Co. (Pitblado, John)
April 11, 2016 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Fairbanks Flynn on behalf of Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut (Flynn, Elizabeth)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting #231 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ashley A. Noel. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/10/2016. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #224 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney William A. Schneider for American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/10/2016. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #223 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael F. Aylward for American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/10/2016. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 243 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Krieger, Greg)
April 11, 2016 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg S. Krieger on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Krieger, Greg)
April 8, 2016 Filing 241 Memorandum in Support re #240 MOTION for entry of proposed case management plan Order filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American States Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Armed Forces Insurance Exch., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Bunker Hill Ins Co, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Casco Indemnity Co, Chubb National Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Continental Casualty Company, Countryway Insurance Co, Danbury Ins Co, Economy Premier Assurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co, Homesite Ins. Co., Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Integon National Insurance Co, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., NGM Ins Co, National Surety Corp, Nationwide General Ins Co, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Co, Pacific Specialty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, Peerless Insurance Co., Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch., Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Standard Fire Ins Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, Tower Insurance Company of New York, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Truck Insurance Exchange, Trumbull Ins Co, Twin City Fire Ins Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Service Automobile Association, Universal North America Insurance Company, Utica First Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co, Valley Forge Insurance Co., Vermont Mutual Insurance Co., Vigilant Ins Co, 21st Century Premier Insurance Co., AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Aegis Security Insurance Co, Affiliated Fm Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pitblado, John)
April 8, 2016 Filing 240 MOTION for entry of proposed case management plan Order by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American States Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Armed Forces Insurance Exch., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Bunker Hill Ins Co, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Casco Indemnity Co, Chubb National Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Continental Casualty Company, Countryway Insurance Co, Danbury Ins Co, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co, Homesite Ins. Co., Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Integon National Insurance Co, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., NGM Ins Co, National Surety Corp, Nationwide General Ins Co, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Co, Pacific Specialty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, Peerless Insurance Co., Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch., Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Standard Fire Ins Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, Tower Insurance Company of New York, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Truck Insurance Exchange, Trumbull Ins Co, Twin City Fire Ins Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Service Automobile Association, Universal North America Insurance Company, Utica First Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co, Valley Forge Insurance Co., Vermont Mutual Insurance Co., Vigilant Ins Co, 21st Century Premier Insurance Co., AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Aegis Security Insurance Co, Affiliated Fm Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pitblado, John)
April 8, 2016 Filing 239 First MOTION for Proposed Case Management Order Order by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio. (Spinella, Anthony)
April 8, 2016 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek E. Donnelly on behalf of Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. (Donnelly, Derek)
April 8, 2016 Filing 237 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trumbull Ins Co. (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 236 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd. (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 235 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Underwriters Ins Co. (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 234 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast. (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 233 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Fire Insurance Co.. (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co.. (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 231 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ashley A. Noel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3959939) by Armed Forces Insurance Exch.. (Scannell, Timothy)
April 8, 2016 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Mullins on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Trumbull Ins Co (Mullins, Michael)
April 8, 2016 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. Goldman on behalf of Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co (Goldman, Stephen)
April 8, 2016 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Raccuia on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Trumbull Ins Co (Raccuia, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Trumbull Ins Co (Cerreta, John)
April 8, 2016 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas O. Farrish on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Trumbull Ins Co (Farrish, Thomas)
April 8, 2016 Filing 225 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Kelly, William)
April 8, 2016 Filing 224 MOTION for Attorney(s) William A. Schneider to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3959436) by American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for PRO HAC VICE Admission of William A. Schneider with Affidavit (Exhibit A))(Keller, Michael)
April 8, 2016 Filing 223 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael F. Aylward to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3959392) by American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for PRO HAC VICE Admission of Michael F. Aylward with Affidavit (Exhibit A))(Keller, Michael)
April 8, 2016 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Scapellati on behalf of Countryway Insurance Co (Scapellati, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Scapellati on behalf of Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Scapellati, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Pitblado on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Pitblado, John)
April 8, 2016 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co (Ackerman, Wystan)
April 8, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen C. Rodriguez on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Rodriguez, Kristen)
April 7, 2016 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L Hanover on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Hanover, Mark)
April 7, 2016 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Kelly on behalf of Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co. (Kelly, William)
April 7, 2016 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Keller on behalf of American Commerce Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Integon National Insurance Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Middlesex Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Tower Insurance Company of New York (Keller, Michael)
April 7, 2016 Filing 214 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Co, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Co, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co. (Ackerman, Wystan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 213 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Insurance Company. (Ackerman, Wystan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 212 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peerless Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Peerless Insurance Co.. (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 211 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 210 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LM Insurance Corp identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for LM Insurance Corp. (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 209 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.. (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 208 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Insurance Corp identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Liberty Insurance Corp. (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 207 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Insurance Company Of Amercia identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for General Insurance Company Of Amercia. (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 206 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American States Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for American States Insurance Company. (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran W Leary on behalf of American States Insurance Company (Leary, Kieran)
April 7, 2016 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip T. Newbury, Jr on behalf of American States Insurance Company (Newbury, Philip)
April 7, 2016 Filing 203 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs (Spinella, Anthony)
April 6, 2016 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #182 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shannon McGovern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3952254) by Affiliated Fm Ins Co. (Cohen, Evan)
April 6, 2016 Filing 201 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #181 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryce L. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3952242) by Affiliated Fm Ins Co. (Cohen, Evan)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #197 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William J. Kelly III.. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #194 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark L. Hanover.. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
April 5, 2016 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Fenton on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Fenton, Richard)
April 5, 2016 Filing 197 MOTION for Attorney(s) William J. Kelly III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3955350) by Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of William Kelly III, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Ponziani, Peter)
April 5, 2016 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen F. Adams on behalf of Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co. (Adams, Kathleen)
April 5, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Ponziani on behalf of Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co. (Ponziani, Peter)
April 5, 2016 Filing 194 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark L. Hanover to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3955149) by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Flynn, Elizabeth)
April 5, 2016 Filing 193 Docket Entry Correction re #186 MOTION for Attorney(s) KRISTEN C. RODRIGUEZ to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3952972) Added REPLACEMENT PDF:original pdf had incorrect attorney's name. (Gould, K.)
April 4, 2016 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon K. McGovern on behalf of Affiliated Fm Ins Co (McGovern, Shannon)
April 4, 2016 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce L. Friedman on behalf of Affiliated Fm Ins Co (Friedman, Bryce)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #186 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 04/04/16. (Gould, K.)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #185 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 04/04/16. (Gould, K.)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #182 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/3/2016. Signed by Clerk on 04/04/16. (Gould, K.)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #181 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/3/2016. Signed by Clerk on 04/04/16. (Gould, K.)
April 1, 2016 Filing 186 MOTION for Attorney(s) KRISTEN C. RODRIGUEZ to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3952972) by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Flynn, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2016: #3 Affidavit Corrected PDF) (Gould, K.).
April 1, 2016 Filing 185 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard L. Fenton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3952968) by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Flynn, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2016 Filing 184 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of First American Property & Casualty Company by All Plaintiffs (Spinella, Anthony)
April 1, 2016 Filing 183 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affiliated Fm Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent Factory Mutual Insurance Company for Affiliated Fm Ins Co. (English, Michael)
April 1, 2016 Filing 182 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shannon McGovern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3952254) by Affiliated Fm Ins Co. (English, Michael)
April 1, 2016 Filing 181 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryce L. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3952242) by Affiliated Fm Ins Co. (English, Michael)
April 1, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan I. Cohen on behalf of Affiliated Fm Ins Co (Cohen, Evan)
April 1, 2016 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Q English on behalf of Affiliated Fm Ins Co (English, Michael)
March 31, 2016 Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #72 MOTION for Attorney(s) William P. Lalor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3922892) by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Co.. (Lalor, William)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #170 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel M. Cohen.. Signed by Clerk on 3/31/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 31, 2016 Filing 176 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Republic Franklin Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co. (Levin, Daniel)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #169 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew J. Pearlman. Signed by Clerk on 3/31/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #168 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Scheinkman.. Signed by Clerk on 3/31/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 31, 2016 Filing 173 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American States Insurance Company, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Covenant Ins Co, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Trumbull Ins Co* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Joseph Spinella* *Barry & Barall, LLC* *202 West Center Street, 1st Floor* *Manchester, CT 06040*. (Fazekas, J.)
March 30, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden (Perez, J.)
March 30, 2016 Filing 171 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch.. (Wagner, Matthew)
March 30, 2016 Filing 170 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joel M. Cohen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3949220) by Insurance Services Office, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grossman, Lawrence)
March 30, 2016 Filing 169 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew J. Pearlman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3949204) by Insurance Services Office, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grossman, Lawrence)
March 30, 2016 Filing 168 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Scheinkman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3949174) by Insurance Services Office, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grossman, Lawrence)
March 30, 2016 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to American States Insurance Company, Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT, Covenant Ins Co, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co., Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Ins Co, Middlesex Mutual Assurance Co., New London County Mutual Insurance Company, Sentinel Ins Co, Ltd, Standard Fire Ins Co, Travelers Home & Marine Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Personal Security Ins Co, Trumbull Ins Co. (Spinella, Anthony)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference and to Stay Filings. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall consult with counsel for as many of the defendants as possible and submit a proposed case management plan by 4/08/2016. The parties shall be prepared to address all topics listed in Plaintiffs' Motion, see Doc. No. #154 at 1-2, and the proposed case management plan. This case, and all existing deadlines, is stayed until the conclusion of the Scheduling Conference on 4/12/2016. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/29/2016. (Shin, D.)
March 29, 2016 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Amos Hugh Scott on behalf of American States Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America (Scott, Amos)
March 29, 2016 Filing 164 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armed Forces Insurance Exch.. (Scannell, Timothy)
March 29, 2016 Filing 163 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Sickinger, Robert)
March 29, 2016 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B Arnould on behalf of General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America and American States Insurance Company (Arnould, Matthew)
March 29, 2016 Filing 161 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
March 29, 2016 Filing 160 Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Casualty Indemnity Exch.. (Johnson, Mark)
March 29, 2016 Filing 159 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Modern Home Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Midland-Guardian Co., Corporate Parent The Midland Company, Corporate Parent Munich American Holding Corp. for American Modern Home Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
March 28, 2016 Filing 158 MOTION to Certify Class by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio.Responses due by 4/18/2016 (Barry, Ryan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Kole on behalf of General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America and American States Insurance Company (Kole, Robert)
March 28, 2016 Filing 156 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Broudy, Joshua)
March 28, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P Broudy on behalf of Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co (Broudy, Joshua)
March 25, 2016 Filing 154 First MOTION for Stay Filings and Rule 16 Pretrial Conference by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio. (Spinella, Anthony)
March 25, 2016 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #121 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew B. Arnould to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3936412) by General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Atty. Arnould)(Newbury, Philip)
March 25, 2016 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #53 MOTION for Attorney(s) Amos Hugh Scott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3916392) by General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Atty. Scott)(Newbury, Philip)
March 25, 2016 Filing 151 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert A. Kole to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3916347) by General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Atty. Kole)(Newbury, Philip)
March 23, 2016 Filing 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Insurance Exchange. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 23, 2016 Filing 149 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Truck Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange for Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 23, 2016 Filing 148 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 21st Century Premier Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Truck Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent 21st Century Premier Insurance Co. for 21st Century Premier Insurance Co.. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 23, 2016 Filing 147 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Truck Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange for Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co.. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 23, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Scannell on behalf of Armed Forces Insurance Exch. (Scannell, Timothy)
March 23, 2016 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey E. Blatchley on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange, 21st Century Premier Insurance Co. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 22, 2016 Filing 144 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Antonellis, Anthony)
March 22, 2016 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rodger L. Eckelberry, Mark A. Johnson, Robert J. Tucker, Andrew E. Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3929991) by American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Samuels, Andrew)
March 22, 2016 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rodger L. Eckelberry, Mark A. Johnson, Robert J. Tucker, Andrew E. Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3929991) by American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Tucker, Robert)
March 22, 2016 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rodger L. Eckelberry, Mark A. Johnson, Robert J. Tucker, Andrew E. Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3929991) by American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Eckleberry, Rodger)
March 22, 2016 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rodger L. Eckelberry, Mark A. Johnson, Robert J. Tucker, Andrew E. Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3929991) by American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying without prejudice #130 Motion to Appear, #131 Motion to Appear, #132 Motion to Appear, for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(d). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/22/2016. (Shin, D.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 138 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co. (Dunn, Philip)
March 21, 2016 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger Eckleberry on behalf of American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company (Eckleberry, Rodger)
March 21, 2016 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Samuels on behalf of American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company (Samuels, Andrew)
March 21, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Tucker on behalf of American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company (Tucker, Robert)
March 21, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Johnson on behalf of American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company (Johnson, Mark)
March 21, 2016 Filing 133 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Insurance Services Office, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verisk Analytics, Inc. for Insurance Services Office, Inc.. (Slossberg, David)
March 21, 2016 Filing 132 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kristen C. Rodriguez to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3939023) by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Flynn, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2016 Filing 131 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark L. Hanover to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3939007) by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Flynn, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2016 Filing 130 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard L. Fenton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3938987) by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Flynn, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2016 Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Western Service Contract Corporation for Pacific Specialty Insurance Company. (Wojcik, Michele)
March 18, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Cole on behalf of Graphic Arts Mutual Co. , Republic-Franklin Insurance Co., and Utica Mutual Insurance Co. (Cole, James)
March 18, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke L. French on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (French, Brooke)
March 18, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc. (Grossman, Lawrence)
March 18, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Slossberg on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc. (Slossberg, David)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #121 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew B. Arnould Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/17/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/18/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Gerber on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Co (Gerber, Daniel)
March 17, 2016 Filing 122 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6a, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6b, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8a, #10 Exhibit Ex. 8b, #11 Exhibit Ex. 9, #12 Exhibit Ex. 10a, #13 Exhibit Ex. 10b, #14 Exhibit Ex. 11)(Spinella, Anthony)
March 17, 2016 Filing 121 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew B. Arnould to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3936412) by General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Matthew B. Arnould, Esq.))(Newbury, Philip)
March 17, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Reilly on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing (Reilly, Christopher)
March 17, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Spinella on behalf of Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio (Spinella, Anthony)
March 17, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica A.R. Hamilton on behalf of American Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Electric Insurance Company, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, National Surety Corp, Pacific Indemnity Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Service Automobile Association, Universal North America Insurance Company, Vigilant Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co (Hamilton, Jessica)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #115 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brooke L. French. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 16, 2016 Filing 116 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homesite Ins. Co. identifying Corporate Parent Homesite Securities Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Homesite Group, Inc. for Homesite Ins. Co.. (Klaffky, Stephen)
March 16, 2016 Filing 115 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brooke L. French to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3934367) by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brooke French, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Helfand, Robert)
March 16, 2016 Filing 114 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Interfinancial Inc, Corporate Parent Assurant Inc, Corporate Parent American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Helfand, Robert)
March 16, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Lalor on behalf of Valley Forge Insurance Co. and Continental Casualty Company (Lalor, William)
March 16, 2016 Filing 112 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aegis Security Insurance Co. (Lettiero, Michael)
March 15, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Farm Family Casualty Ins Co (Ackerman, Wystan)
March 15, 2016 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Klaffky on behalf of Homesite Ins. Co. (Klaffky, Stephen)
March 15, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Fairbanks Flynn on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Flynn, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark A. Johnson for American Modern Home Insurance Company, Mark A. Johnson for California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Mark A. Johnson for Cincinnati Insurance Company, added and Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney for Rodger Eckelberry, Robert J. Tucker and Andrew Samuels Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/14/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NGM Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent Main Street America Group, Inc. for NGM Ins Co. (Ober, Scott)
March 14, 2016 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel W. Gerber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3922580) by Aegis Security Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lettiero, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rodger L. Eckelberry, Mark A. Johnson, Robert J. Tucker, Andrew E. Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3929991) by American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit-Rodger Eckelberry, #2 Exhibit Affidaviit-Mark Johnson, #3 Exhibit Affidavit-Robert Tucker, #4 Exhibit Affidavit-Andrew Samuels)(Etlinger, Deborah)
March 11, 2016 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Eddy on behalf of American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company (Eddy, Eric)
March 11, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Etlinger on behalf of American Modern Home Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cincinnati Insurance Company (Etlinger, Deborah)
March 11, 2016 Filing 102 NOTICE by Casco Indemnity Co of Certificate of Good Standing (Pingpank, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2016 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Citizens Insurance Company of America (Ackerman, Wystan)
March 9, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele C. Wojcik on behalf of Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Wojcik, Michele)
March 9, 2016 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Defendant AIU Insurance Company by AIU Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIUH LLC, Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty International, LLC for AIU Ins Co. (Haas, Marc)
March 9, 2016 Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company by AIG Property Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIUH LLC, Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty Inc. for AIG Property Casualty Company. (Haas, Marc)
March 9, 2016 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by John Warren Herrington on behalf of First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co (Herrington, John)
March 9, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Pitblado on behalf of First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co (Pitblado, John)
March 9, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Helfand on behalf of First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co (Helfand, Robert)
March 9, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Helfand on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Helfand, Robert)
March 9, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of American Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, Great Northern Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, National Surety Corp, Pacific Indemnity Co, Universal North America Insurance Company, Vigilant Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co (Ackerman, Wystan)
March 9, 2016 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Homesite Ins. Co. waiver sent on 2/29/2016, answer due 4/29/2016; Insurance Services Office, Inc. waiver sent on 2/17/2016, answer due 4/17/2016 filed by Patricia Brozek; Steven Brozek; Michael Dyer; Joyce Halloran; Michael Halloran; Kenneth Masciovecchio; Victoria Masciovecchio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barry, Ryan)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #88 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James H. Cole.. Signed by Clerk on 3/9/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 9, 2016 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Guyon H. Knight to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3914326) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sickinger, Robert)
March 9, 2016 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas W. Dunham to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3914297) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sickinger, Robert)
March 8, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION for Attorney(s)James H. Cole to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3924382) by Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Republic Franklin Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cole Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Levin, Daniel) Modified on 3/9/2016 edit text (Fazekas, J.).
March 8, 2016 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Ins Co. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Worcester Ins Co. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nationwide General Ins Co. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harleysville Worcester Ins Co. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Michael Blouin on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Nationwide General Ins Co, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Blouin, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Haas on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co (Haas, Marc)
March 8, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Klein on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co (Klein, Lawrence)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William P. Lalor. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/7/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel W. Gerber. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/7/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 7, 2016 Filing 72 MOTION for Attorney(s) William P. Lalor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3922892) by Valley Forge Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of William P. Lalor)(Renner, Darren)
March 7, 2016 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. (Renner, Darren)
March 7, 2016 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley Forge Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent American Casualty Company of Reading,PA for Valley Forge Insurance Co.. (Renner, Darren)
March 7, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel W. Gerber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3922580) by Aegis Security Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Daniel W. Gerber)(Lettiero, Michael)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marc Haas.. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lawrence Klein for AIG Property Casualty Company, Lawrence Klein for AIU Ins Co, added.. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Drew H. Campbell for Casco Indemnity Co, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/6/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 7, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Stonington Insurance Company (Ackerman, Wystan)
March 7, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co (Ackerman, Wystan)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher M. Reilly for Amica Mutual Ins. Co, added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/6/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 4, 2016 Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marc Haas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3920808) by AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Marc Haas in Support of Motion for Admission as a Visiting Attorney, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Seybert, John)
March 4, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lawrence J. Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3920801) by AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lawrence J. Klein in Support of Motion for Admission As Visiting Attorney, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Satnding, #3 Certificate of Service)(Seybert, John)
March 4, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Seybert on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co (Seybert, John)
March 4, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Danbury Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co (Cerreta, John)
March 4, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Drew Campbell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3919827) by Casco Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Drew Campbell)(Pingpank, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher M. Reilly to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3919427) by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Antonellis, Anthony)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/2/2016. Signed by Clerk on 03/03/16. (Gould, K.)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/2/2016. Signed by Clerk on 03/03/16. (Gould, K.)
March 3, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anthony Donovan, III on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co (Donovan, John)
March 2, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION for Attorney(s) Amos Hugh Scott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3916392) by General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Newbury, Philip)
March 2, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert A. Kole to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3916347) by General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Newbury, Philip)
March 2, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran W Leary on behalf of General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America (Leary, Kieran)
March 2, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip T. Newbury, Jr on behalf of General Insurance Company Of Amercia, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Peerless Insurance Co., Safeco Insurance Company of America (Newbury, Philip)
March 2, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Mullins on behalf of Danbury Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co (Mullins, Michael)
March 2, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Raccuia on behalf of Danbury Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co (Raccuia, Daniel)
March 2, 2016 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Farrish, Thomas)
March 2, 2016 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Danbury Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent Danbury Holding Co, Corporate Parent Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co, Corporate Parent Danbury Ins Co for Danbury Ins Co. (Farrish, Thomas)
March 2, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas O. Farrish on behalf of Danbury Ins Co, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co (Farrish, Thomas)
March 2, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Pingpank on behalf of Casco Indemnity Co (Pingpank, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Guyon H. Knight. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/1/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/2/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Douglas W. Dunham. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/1/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/2/2016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 1, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Dunn, Jr on behalf of Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co (Dunn, Philip)
March 1, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. O'Keefe on behalf of Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co (O'Keefe, Peter)
March 1, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Busher, Jr on behalf of Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co (Busher, Joseph)
March 1, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Guyon H. Knight to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3914326) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sickinger, Robert)
March 1, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas W. Dunham to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3914297) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sickinger, Robert)
March 1, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren P. Renner on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Co. (Renner, Darren)
March 1, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Chomiak, Jr on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Co (Chomiak, Robert)
February 26, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F Lettiero on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Co (Lettiero, Michael)
February 26, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F Lettiero on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Co (Lettiero, Michael)
February 25, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Mullins on behalf of Bunker Hill Ins Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Twin City Fire Ins Co (Mullins, Michael)
February 25, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart G. Blackburn on behalf of Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Blackburn, Stuart)
February 25, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Balboa Ins Co, Electric Insurance Company, General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, Hanover Insurance Co, Horace Mann Ins Co, Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Service Automobile Association (Ackerman, Wystan)
February 24, 2016 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; American Commerce Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; American Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; American Modern Home Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; American Strategic Insurance Corp. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Amica Mutual Ins. Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Armed Forces Insurance Exch. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Aspen American Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Associated Indemnity Corporation waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Balboa Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Bankers Standard Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Bedivere Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Bunker Hill Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; California Casualty Indemnity Exch. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Casco Indemnity Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Central Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Chubb National Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Cincinnati Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Citizens Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Continental Casualty Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Countryway Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Danbury Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Economy Premier Assurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Electric Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Employers Mutual Casualty Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Encompass Indemnity Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Encompass Ins Co of Amer waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Farm Family Casualty Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Federal Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Fireman's Fund Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; General Casualty Co of Wisconsin waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; General Insurance Company Of Amercia waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Graphic Arts Mutual Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Great Northern Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Hanover Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Harleysville Worcester Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Hartford Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Horace Mann Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; IDS Property Casualty Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Indemnity Ins Co of North America waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Insurance Co of North America waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Integon National Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Kemper Independence Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; LM Insurance Corp waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Liberty Insurance Corp waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Massachusetts Bay Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Merastar Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Meritplan Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Middlesex Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; NGM Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; National Surety Corp waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Nationwide General Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Pacific Indemnity Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Pacific Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Peerless Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Praetorian Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Republic Franklin Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Safeco Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; State Farm Fire & Casualty Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Stonington Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Teachers Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Tower Insurance Company of New York waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Truck Insurance Exchange waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Twin City Fire Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; USAA Casualty Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; USAA General Indemnity Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; United Service Automobile Association waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Universal North America Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Utica First Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Utica Mutual Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Valley Forge Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Vigilant Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; 21st Century Premier Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; AIG Property Casualty Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; AIU Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Ace American Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Aegis Security Insurance Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Affiliated Fm Ins Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; AllState Insurance Co of America waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Allstate Indemnity Co waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016; Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/10/2016, answer due 4/10/2016 filed by Patricia Brozek; Steven Brozek; Michael Dyer; Joyce Halloran; Michael Halloran; Kenneth Masciovecchio; Victoria Masciovecchio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barry, Ryan)
February 24, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Catherine Christie on behalf of Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch. (Christie, Jane)
February 24, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Wagner on behalf of Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch. (Wagner, Matthew)
February 24, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Whitcomb on behalf of Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
February 24, 2016 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twin City Fire Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Raccuia, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2016 to add corporate parents (Fazekas, J.).
February 24, 2016 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Raccuia, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2016 to add corporate parent(Fazekas, J.).
February 24, 2016 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Raccuia, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2016 to add corporate parent (Fazekas, J.).
February 24, 2016 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Corporate Patent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Raccuia, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2016 to add corporate parents (Fazekas, J.).
February 24, 2016 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Bunker Hill Insurance Company by Bunker Hill Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent Plymouth Rock Company, Other Affiliate Central Securities Corporation (Raccuia, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2016 to add corporate parant and other affiliate (Fazekas, J.).
February 24, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Raccuia on behalf of Bunker Hill Ins Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Twin City Fire Ins Co (Raccuia, Daniel)
February 24, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Bunker Hill Ins Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Twin City Fire Ins Co (Cerreta, John)
February 24, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas O. Farrish on behalf of Bunker Hill Ins Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Twin City Fire Ins Co (Farrish, Thomas)
February 23, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Levin on behalf of Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Republic Franklin Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co and Certificate of Service (Levin, Daniel)
February 22, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Ranks on behalf of Utica First Ins Co (Ranks, Andrew)
February 22, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Stephen Papa on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Papa, John)
February 22, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Kennedy on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co (Kennedy, Matthew)
February 22, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Antonellis on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co (Antonellis, Anthony)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court reminds counsel to comply with all requirements of Local Rule 7(b) when moving for extensions of time in the future. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/22/2016. (Shin, D.)
February 19, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Karpie on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Karpie, Karen)
February 19, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Sickinger on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Sickinger, Robert)
February 19, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2016 to file Answer/Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint,, by NGM Ins Co. (Ober, Scott)
February 17, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Ober on behalf of NGM Ins Co (Ober, Scott)
February 17, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart G. Blackburn on behalf of Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 29, 2016 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American Automobile Association, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Commerce Insurance Co, American Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Amica Mutual Ins. Co, Armed Forces Insurance Exch., Aspen American Insurance Co, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Balboa Ins Co, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Bedivere Insurance Co, Bunker Hill Ins Co, CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exch., Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Casco Indemnity Co, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Continental Casualty Company, Countryway Insurance Co, Danbury Ins Co, Economy Premier Assurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Ins Co of Amer, Farm Family Casualty Ins Co, Federal Insurance Co, Fireman's Fund Ins Co, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co., General Casualty Co of Wisconsin, General Insurance Company Of Amercia, Graphic Arts Mutual Co., Great Northern Ins Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Ins Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hingham Mutual Fire Ins Co, Homesite Ins. Co., Horace Mann Ins Co, IDS Property Casualty Ins Co, Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Insurance Co of North America, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Integon National Insurance Co, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corp, Liberty Insurance Corp, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Massachusetts Bay Ins Co, Massachusetts Homeland Ins. Co., Merastar Ins Co, Meritplan Insurance Co, Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, Metropolitan Group Property & Casualty Ins Co, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Middlesex Insurance Company, NGM Ins Co, National Surety Corp, Nationwide General Ins Co, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, OneBeacon Amer Ins Co, Pacific Indemnity Co, Pacific Specialty Insurance Company, Patrons Mutual Insurance Copany of Connecticut, Peerless Insurance Co., Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Co, Praetorian Insurance Company, Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch., Property & Casualty Ins Co of Hartford, Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co, Republic Franklin Ins Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Stonington Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Co, Tower Insurance Company of New York, Truck Insurance Exchange, Twin City Fire Ins Co, USAA Casualty Ins Co, USAA General Indemnity Company, Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Service Automobile Association, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Co, Unitrin Preferred Insurance Co., Universal North America Insurance Company, Utica First Ins Co, Utica Mutual Ins Co, Valley Forge Insurance Co., Vermont Mutual Insurance Co., Vigilant Ins Co, 21st Century Premier Insurance Co., AIG Property Casualty Company, AIU Ins Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Aegis Security Insurance Co, Affiliated Fm Ins Co, AllState Insurance Co of America, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan P. Barry* *Barry & Barall, LLC* *202 West Center Street, 1st Floor* *Manchester, CT 06040*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 29, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint,, filed by Joyce Halloran, Patricia Brozek, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Michael Halloran, Michael Dyer, Steven Brozek, Victoria Masciovecchio, #3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2016.(Fazekas, J.)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/28/2016.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 1/29/2016 to correct date (Fazekas, J.).
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/28/2016.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 1/29/2016 to correct date (Fazekas, J.).
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 4/28/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2016. Discovery due by 7/29/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2016. Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2016.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 1/29/2016 to correct date (Fazekas, J.).
January 29, 2016 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Barry, Ryan)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3877927.), filed by Patricia Brozek, Steven Brozek, Michael Dyer, Joyce Halloran, Michael Halloran, Kenneth Masciovecchio, Victoria Masciovecchio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6A, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6B, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8A, #10 Exhibit Ex. 8B, #11 Exhibit Ex. 9, #12 Exhibit Ex. 10A, #13 Exhibit Ex. 10B, #14 Exhibit Ex. 11)(Barry, Ryan)
January 28, 2016 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halloran et al v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Darren P. Renner
Represented By: William Patrick Lalor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllState Insurance Co of America
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark L Hanover
Represented By: Elizabeth Fairbanks Flynn
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Brooke L. French
Represented By: John C. Pitblado
Represented By: Robert D. Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Indemnity Corporation
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Services Office, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scheinkman
Represented By: Lawrence S. Grossman
Represented By: Andrew J. Pearlman
Represented By: Joel M Cohen
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Ins Co of Hartford, CT
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Charles F. Modzelewski
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Small
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: John C. Pitblado
Represented By: John Warren Herrington
Represented By: Robert D. Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Ins Co
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indemnity Ins Co of North America
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers Insurance Co
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Surety Corp
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corp
Represented By: Robert A. Kole
Represented By: Matthew B Arnould
Represented By: Amos Hugh Scott
Represented By: Philip T. Newbury, Jr.
Represented By: Kieran W Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark L Hanover
Represented By: Elizabeth Fairbanks Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Ins Co
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Michael Blouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Service Automobile Association
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Amer Ins Co
Represented By: Taylore E. Karpa
Represented By: Michael R. Keller
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIU Ins Co
Represented By: Lawrence J. Klein
Represented By: John T Seybert
Represented By: Marc E. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co
Represented By: Taylore E. Karpa
Represented By: Michael R. Keller
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark L Hanover
Represented By: Elizabeth Fairbanks Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Ins Co of Amer
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark L Hanover
Represented By: Elizabeth Fairbanks Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedivere Insurance Co
Represented By: Taylore E. Karpa
Represented By: Michael R. Keller
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal North America Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Commerce Insurance Co
Represented By: Taylore E. Karpa
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael R. Keller
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert J. Chomiak, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel W. Gerber
Represented By: Michael F Lettiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigilant Ins Co
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica Mutual Ins Co
Represented By: Daniel W. Levin
Represented By: James H. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Charles F. Modzelewski
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Small
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Co
Represented By: Taylore E. Karpa
Represented By: Michael R. Keller
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Ins Co
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel Michael Blouin
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Premier Assurance Company
Represented By: Daniel P. Scapellati
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark L Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGM Ins Co
Represented By: Joseph H. Carlisle
Represented By: Kelly E. Petter
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co
Represented By: Tara Lynn Trifon
Represented By: Joshua P. Broudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: Guyon H. Knight
Represented By: Robert J. Sickinger
Represented By: Douglas W. Dunham
Represented By: Karen L. Karpie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Personal Security Ins Co
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Taylore E. Karpa
Represented By: Michael R. Keller
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Co
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corp
Represented By: Robert A. Kole
Represented By: Amos Hugh Scott
Represented By: Philip T. Newbury, Jr.
Represented By: Kieran W Leary
Represented By: Matthew B Arnould
Represented By: Margaret J. Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Mutual Fire Ins Co
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert A. Kole
Represented By: Matthew B Arnould
Represented By: Amos Hugh Scott
Represented By: Choity Khan
Represented By: Philip T. Newbury, Jr.
Represented By: Kieran W Leary
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Lindsey Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Ins Co
Represented By: Daniel Michael Blouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privilege Underwriter's Reciprocal Exch.
Represented By: Jane Catherine Christie
Represented By: Matthew C. Wagner
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Represented By: Ingrid Clarice Festin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica A.R. Hamilton
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michele C. Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Randall A. Hack
Represented By: Adam D. Lewis
Represented By: Brian I. Hays
Represented By: Aubrey E. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch |