Nowacki v. New Canaan et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Nowacki
Defendant: Town of New Canaan, State of Connecticut, Kevin Casey, James Cole, William Ferri, Joseph Farenga, Pamela Flynn, Louis Gannon, Christian Gray, Daniel Gulino, Leon Krolikowski, Robert E. Mallozzi, III, Edward Nadriczny and Thomas Swindon
Case Number: 3:2016cv00407
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A. Meyer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RULING GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the New Canaan defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. # 106 ) and the State of Connecticut's motion to dismiss (Doc. # 119 ) are GRANTED. The second amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for defendants State of Connecticut, Town of New Canaan, Kevin Casey, James Cole, William Ferri, Joseph Farenga, Louis Gannon, Christian Gray, Daniel Gulino, Leon Krolikowski, Edward Nadriczny, Thomas Swindon, and Jason Kim, and close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/28/2017. (Levenson, C.)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Doc. # 145 ) is DENIED. The Court has previously granted plaintiff two extensions of time to file a response to t he State's motion to dismiss. See Docs. #126, #140. Rather than filing more collateral motions, plaintiff should focus his efforts on timely preparing and filing a response to the State's motion to dismiss by January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/5/2017. (Levenson, C.)
December 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, plaintiff's pending motions (Docs. # 128 , # 129 & # 130 ) are DENIED. Plaintiff shall file his response to the States motion to dismiss by December 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/4/2016. (Levenson, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowacki v. New Canaan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Nowacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of New Canaan
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Casey
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cole
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ferri
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Farenga
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Flynn
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Gannon
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Gray
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gulino
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Krolikowski
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Mallozzi, III
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Nadriczny
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Swindon
Represented By: Winifred E. Binda
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?