Wylie v. Powerscreen International Distribution, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Graham Wylie
Defendant: Powerscreen International Distribution, Ltd and Powerscreen USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00464
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Haight
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RULING (see attached) granting in part and denying in part 60 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Contractual Indemnity Claim. Defendants make this indemnity claim in their 44 Amended Third-Party Complaint. The Court fin ds that Third Party Defendant Powerscreen Connecticut, Inc., is contractually obligated to indemnify Powerscreen USA, LLC, but not Powerscreen International Distribution, Ltd. Accordingly, the parties are directed to conduct further litigation in the case in a manner consistent with this Ruling. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 10/05/2018. (Chen, C.)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER (see attached) granting Defendants' unopposed 40 Motion for Leave to Amend Third Party Complaint. Defendants must file and serve the amended third party complaint, as proposed, by Wednesday, May 31, 2017. Once the amended t hird party complaint has been filed, the clerk is instructed to amend the caption of this case to reflect the correct name of corporate Third Party Defendant. Third Party Defendant's 42 Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot. Th ird Party Defendant must respond to the amended third party complaint on or before Friday, June 16, 2017. If Third Party Defendant requires any extension of time to respond, such request must comply with Loc. R. Civ. P. 7(b). Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 24, 2017. (Pskowski, R.)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULING (see attached) granting Defendants' unopposed 31 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. For the reasons described in the attached Ruling, Defendants may serve their third-party complaint forthwith and must e-file said third-party complaint on or before February 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on January 30, 2017. (Kahl, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wylie v. Powerscreen International Distribution, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graham Wylie
Represented By: Timothy Brignole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerscreen International Distribution, Ltd
Represented By: Cullen W. Guilmartin
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Represented By: Steven J Zakrzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerscreen USA, LLC
Represented By: Cullen W. Guilmartin
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Represented By: Steven J Zakrzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?