Sagastume et al v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sagastume, Oscar Sagastume, Kevin Gibson, Lucas Pfleegor and Andrew Dohme
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00776
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2016 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fernandez, C.)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice to reopening by motion filed on or before 1/3/2017. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/25/2016. (Hoffman, S)
August 24, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Paolo C. Meireles on behalf of Andrew Dohme, Kevin Gibson, Lucas Pfleegor, Oscar Sagastume (Meireles, Paolo)
August 24, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Palitz on behalf of Andrew Dohme, Kevin Gibson, Lucas Pfleegor, Oscar Sagastume (Palitz, Michael)
August 24, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Andrew Dohme, Kevin Gibson, Lucas Pfleegor, Oscar Sagastume (Shavitz, Gregg)
August 19, 2016 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc., filed by Oscar Sagastume, Kevin Gibson, Andrew Dohme, Lucas Pfleegor.(Swartz, Justin)
August 18, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume Consent to Join (Swartz, Justin)
August 17, 2016 Filing 60 Docket Entry Correction - REPLACEMENT PDF of minute form. (Fernandez, C.)
August 17, 2016 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Status Conference held on 8/17/2016, Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2016 re #55 MOTION to Reopen Case for Purpose of Filing Amended Complaint and Consent to Join Forms filed by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. 6 minutes(Court Reporter F. Velez, ECRO). (Fernandez, C.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2016: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Fernandez, C.).
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/17/16. (Fernandez, C.)
August 3, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Status Conference set for 8/17/16 at 03:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Fernandez, C.)
August 2, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION to Reopen Case for Purpose of Filing Amended Complaint and Consent to Join Forms by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume.Responses due by 8/23/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Amended Complaint], #2 Exhibit B [Consent to Join Form])(Goodbaum, Joshua)
July 14, 2016 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fernandez, C.)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, without prejudice to reopening by either party on or before December 1, 2016, as the parties have that they intend to seek a private resolution of this matter at a later date. Rather than stay this action and keep this file open, the Clerk is directed to close this file immediately. Should one or both parties move to reopen this matter, the Court will set aside time to conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 16(b), either telephonically or in chambers. The Court typically holds such conferences on Thursday afternoons - any Motion to Reopen should include several mutually-agreeable proposed dates and times. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/13/16. (Shechter, N.)
July 11, 2016 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Stay re #45 MOTION to Certify Class (Joint Motion To Stay Briefing And To Stay Discovery Pending Mediation) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..Responses due by 8/1/2016 (Siebert, Melissa)
July 11, 2016 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..(Siebert, Melissa)
July 11, 2016 Filing 51 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shavitz, Gregg)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Attorney Nicholas A. Migliaccio to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #49 Motion for Attorney Jason S. Rathod to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 7/6/2016. (Shafer, J.)
July 5, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason S. Rathod to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4056952) by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jason S. Rathod, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodbaum, Joshua)
July 5, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Migliaccio to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4056916) by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nicholas Migliaccio, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodbaum, Joshua)
July 1, 2016 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT re #45 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Justin M. Swartz filed by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I (1 of 2), #10 Exhibit I (2 of 2), #11 Supplement J, #12 Exhibit K)(Swartz, Justin)
July 1, 2016 Filing 46 Memorandum in Support re #45 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Swartz, Justin)
July 1, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION to Certify Class by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume.Responses due by 7/22/2016 (Swartz, Justin)
June 24, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume [Consent form of Lucas Pfleegor] (Goodbaum, Joshua)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Attorney Bonnie L. Keane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2016. (Shafer, J.)
June 15, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bonnie L. Keane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4035218) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bonnie L. Keane, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 15, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume [Consent form of David Dykes] (Goodbaum, Joshua)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregg I. Shavitz. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/16. (Sundie, T)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Palitz. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/16. (Sundie, T)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paolo C. Meireles. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/16. (Sundie, T)
June 14, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregg I. Shavitz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4032974) by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregg I. Shavitz, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodbaum, Joshua)
June 14, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Palitz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4032951) by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michael J. Palitz, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodbaum, Joshua)
June 14, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paolo C. Meireles to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4032923) by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paolo C. Meireles, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodbaum, Joshua)
June 13, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume [Consent forms of Andrew Dohme, Scott Herrin] (Goodbaum, Joshua)
June 8, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. McIlwee on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (McIlwee, John)
June 8, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Griswold on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Griswold, Joel)
June 8, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Siebert on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Siebert, Melissa)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2016. (Shafer, J.)
June 7, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Mcllwee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4025568) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John C. Mcllwee, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 7, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa A. Siebert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4025565) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melissa A. Siebert, #2 Exhibit Certifcate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 7, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joel Griswold to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4025562) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Joel Griswold, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Siebert; denying #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney McIlwee; denying #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Griswold. Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) requires a party seeking admission pro hac vice in this District to provide the bar numbers for every jurisdiction in which the attorney is admitted to practice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/7/16. (Shechter, N.)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Attorney Justin M. Swartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Gibson and Oscar Sagastume. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2016. (Shafer, J.)
June 6, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin M. Swartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4022771) by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Justin M. Swartz, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodbaum, Joshua)
June 1, 2016 Answer deadline updated for Ruby Tuesday, Inc. to 7/11/2016. (Shafer, J.)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time until July 11, 2016 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 6/1/2016. (Shafer, J.)
May 31, 2016 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 11, 2016 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (LeVasseur, Anne)
May 26, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Casey LeVasseur on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (LeVasseur, Anne)
May 26, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joel Griswold to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick)
May 26, 2016 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Mcllwee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4013322) Signed By John C. Mcllwee filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick)
May 26, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Mcllwee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4013322) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick)
May 26, 2016 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT re #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joel Griswold to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4013309) Signed By Joel Griswold filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick)
May 26, 2016 Filing 16 ENTERED IN ERROR MOTION for Attorney(s) Joel Griswold to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4013309) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick) Modified to reflect incorrect document on 5/27/2016 (Shafer, J.).
May 26, 2016 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa A. Siebert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4013254) Signed By Melissa A. Siebert filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick)
May 26, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa A. Siebert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4013254) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick)
May 25, 2016 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oscar Sagastume, Kevin Gibson. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. served on 5/20/2016, answer due 6/10/2016. (Goodbaum, Joshua)
May 24, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume [Consent form of Todd Suave] (Goodbaum, Joshua)
May 23, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE by Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume re #7 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols (Goodbaum, Joshua)
May 20, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Garrison on behalf of Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume (Garrison, Joseph)
May 20, 2016 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ruby Tuesday, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joshua R. Goodbaum* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Shafer, J.)
May 20, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Gibson and Oscar Sagastume, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #7 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint filed by Kevin Gibson and Oscar Sagastume. Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2016. (Shafer, J.)
May 19, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Identification of Initial Discovery Protocol for Employment Cases) (Shafer, J.)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/19/2016. (Shafer, J.)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/19/2016. (Shafer, J.)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/19/2016. (Shafer, J.)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/19/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2016. Discovery due by 11/18/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2016. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2016. (Shafer, J.)
May 19, 2016 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Basha, D.)
May 19, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Goodbaum on behalf of Kevin Gibson, Oscar Sagastume (Goodbaum, Joshua)
May 19, 2016 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Goodbaum, Joshua)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4005284.), filed by Oscar Sagastume, Kevin Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Sagastume, Consent Form, #2 Gibson, Consent Form)(Goodbaum, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sagastume et al v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: John C. McIlwee
Represented By: Melissa A. Siebert
Represented By: Bonnie L. Keane
Represented By: Patrick F. Lennon
Represented By: Anne Casey LeVasseur
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sagastume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Sagastume
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Joshua R. Goodbaum
Represented By: Joseph D. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gibson
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Joshua R. Goodbaum
Represented By: Joseph D. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Pfleegor
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dohme
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?