Edelstein v. Lucas Brand Equity, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven J. Edelstein
Defendant: Lucas Brand Equity, LLC, HYD USA, LLC and Jay Lucas
Case Number: 3:2016cv01353
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Warren W. Eginton
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 49 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/11/17. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RULING granting in large part (Dkt. #21) Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Remedy, and Motion for Disclosure of Property and Assets. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/2/2017. (Watson, M.)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RULING denying in part 31 Defendant Lucas' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/1/2017. (Watson, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edelstein v. Lucas Brand Equity, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Edelstein
Represented By: William G. Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Brand Equity, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Peikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYD USA, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Peikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Lucas
Represented By: Lawrence Peikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?