Powell v. Jones-Soderman et al
Plaintiff: Scott Powell
Defendant: Jill Jones-Soderman and Foundation for the Child Victims of the Family Courts
Case Number: 3:2016cv01653
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Alvin W. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RULING denying the defendant's 91 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings. Judgment shall enter in favor of the plaintiff in the amount of $100,000. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 1/14/2020. (Watson, M.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached, Powell has alleged facts sufficient to plead his claims of defamation per se, invasion of privacy, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and negligent infliction of emotional distress. Jones-Sodermans motion for judgment on the pleadings, (ECF No. 39), is therefore DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/15/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The defendants' motion to quash proof of service (Doc. No. 11 ) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part for the reasons set forth in the attached document. The motion is being granted as to defendant Foundation for the Child Victims of the Family Courts and denied as to defendant Jill Jones-Soderman. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/24/17. (Mata, E.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Jones-Soderman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Powell
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Jones-Soderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation for the Child Victims of the Family Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?