Arch Insurance Company v. Centerplan Construction Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Defendant: Centerplan Construction Co., LLC, Robert Landino, Kelly Landino, Centerplan Development Co., LLC, RAL Investments, LLC, Walnut Hill Chase, LLC, Tinker House, LLC, Center Earth, LLC, Centerplan Communities, LLC and GH Development, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01891
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 160 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Third Amended Counterclaim for the reasons in the attached decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/15/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER regarding Dkt. 174 Defendants' "List of Receipts and Vouchers" and the filings in response. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/8/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment, Dkts. 81 and 82 . For the reasons in the attached Memorandum of Decision, the Court GRANTS Arch summary judgment as to Counts I, III, and VI and DISMISSES Counts II, IV, and V, and DEN IES as moot the motion for preliminary injunction. Defendants are ORDERED to serve on Plaintiff their financial disclosures by 02/27/2019. Defendants are further ORDERED to file a list of receipts and vouchers they assert Plaintiff has not a lready turned over by 02/27/2019. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an affidavit by 03/13/2019 affirming the production of the listed vouchers and receipts or stating why such production should not be made. Further, Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a schedule of losses it incurred after the filing of the Motions by 03/27/2019. Defendants will have until 04/10/2019 to object to an entry of an award in the amount of $39,107,334.47 plus the additional costs. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/13/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 94 Motion to Compel Mediation and Stay Litigation for the reasons in the attached ruling. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/12/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: The attached Memorandum of Decision articulates the bases for Dkt. 155 , the Court's 12/10/2018 Order granting 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaim and dismissing all counts of Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/11/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 57 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons set forth in the attached ruling. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/08/2017. (Lee, E.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arch Insurance Company v. Centerplan Construction Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew M. Horowitz
Represented By: William J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerplan Construction Co., LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Landino
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Landino
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerplan Development Co., LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAL Investments, LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walnut Hill Chase, LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinker House, LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center Earth, LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerplan Communities, LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GH Development, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?