Gilead Community Services, Inc. et al v. Cromwell et al
Plaintiff: Gilead Community Services, Inc., Rainbow Housing Corp. and Connecticut Fair Housing Center, Inc.
Defendant: Town of Cromwell, Enzo Faienza, Anthony Salvatore and Jillian Massey
Case Number: 3:2017cv00627
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Victor A. Bolden
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 110 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/20/2019. (Leon, Noel)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Document 117 , which ruled on 75 Motion for Summary Judgment, 76 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 110 Motion for Summary Judgment, contained a technical error and is replaced by the attached ruling. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/30/2019. (Leon, Noel)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/26/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilead Community Services, Inc. et al v. Cromwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilead Community Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Allen
Represented By: Michael Gerhart Allen
Represented By: Greg J. Kirschner
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainbow Housing Corp.
Represented By: Michael Allen
Represented By: Michael Gerhart Allen
Represented By: Greg J. Kirschner
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut Fair Housing Center, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Allen
Represented By: Michael Gerhart Allen
Represented By: Greg J. Kirschner
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Cromwell
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Represented By: Winifred B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enzo Faienza
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Represented By: Winifred B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Salvatore
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Represented By: Winifred B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Massey
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Represented By: Winifred B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?