Torrez v. Mulligan et al
Plaintiff: Jose Anthony Torrez
Defendant: William Mulligan, Laprey, Collier, James Delpesio, Parfumi, Hafner, Wochomurka, Sanchez, Paul Balatka, Barbra Savoie and Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2017cv00677
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Tolland
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/24/18. (Kaas, E.)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying without prejudice 35 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 42 Motion for Disclosure; denying without prejudice 43 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy; denying 44 Motion for Order; denying 45 Motion for Sanctions; denying without prejudice 46 Motion for Default Entry 55(a); denying without prejudice 46 Motion to Compel; granting 47 Motion for Conference; denying as moot 52 Motion for Order; denying without prejudice 56 Motion for Disclosure; denying wit hout prejudice 56 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy; denying without prejudice 57 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 59 Motion to Compel; granting 62 Motion for Conference; granting 64 Motion for Conference.. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/22/18. (Kaas, E.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 12 Motion for Writ of Mandamus; denying 17 Motion for Sanctions/Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/6/17. (Kaas, E.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/5/17. (Kaas, E.)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Compel; denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Copy(s); granting 25 Motion for Order; denying without prejudice 26 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/31/2017. (Landman, M)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Discovery due by 1/15/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/16/2017. (Landman, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrez v. Mulligan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Anthony Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laprey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Delpesio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parfumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hafner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wochomurka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Balatka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Savoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?