In re: Frontier Communications, Corp. Stockholders Litigation
Plaintiff: Chris Bray and Gene R. Wills
Defendant: Donald W. Daniels, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Frontier Communications Corporation, Daniel J. McCarthy and Edward Fraioli
Petitioner: Kevin Demet, John Dubois, Raymond East, Jr., Danny Raff, Mary Jane M. Demet, Edward Hopkins, Carlos Lagomarsino, Sam Raff, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Wayne County Employees' Retirement System, Russell Smith, Anthony Lattarulo, Richard Linke, Francis L. Ingram, Orah Raff, Scott Bugbee, Stephen Doo, Michael Holub and ATM Four, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Larraine D. Segil, Larisa Rosenberg, St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund and Lisa R. Morrow
Consolidated Defendant: Daniel McCarthy, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Mark Shapiro, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Barclays Capital Inc, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mary Agnes Wilderotter, Myron A. Wick, III, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Diana S. Ferguson, Donald Daniels, John Gianukakis, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Leroy T. Barnes, Jr., Howard L. Schrott and Virginia P. Ruesterholz
In Re: Frontier Communications, Corp. Stockholders Litigation
Case Number: 3:2017cv01617
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 180 REPLY to Response to #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Sinderson, Katherine)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #178 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Susan S. Murphy is terminated from the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/23/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
July 22, 2019 Filing 178 MOTION for Susan S. Murphy to Withdraw as Attorney by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Murphy, Susan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy (Fahey, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Motion for Extension of Time until August 12, 2019 for Plaintiffs to file their reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/18/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 175 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 12, 2019 for Plaintiffs to file their reply memorandum in further support of their motion for leave to amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint #173 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Sinderson, Katherine)
July 15, 2019 Filing 174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy re #173 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #172 Affidavit,, (Ingber, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 173 Memorandum in Opposition -DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy. (Ingber, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 172 AFFIDAVIT re #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber Signed By Matthew D. Ingber filed by Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Frontiers Form 10-Q, dated August 8, 2016, #2 Exhibit 2 - Frontiers Form 10-Q, dated November 3, 2016, #3 Exhibit 3 - J.P. Morgan Report on Frontier, #4 Exhibit 4 - Citi Report on Frontier, #5 Exhibit 5 - Cowen and Company Report on Frontier, #6 Exhibit 6 - Deutsche Bank Markets Research Report on Frontier, #7 Exhibit 7 - Jefferies Report on Frontier, #8 Exhibit 8 - Goldman Sachs Research Report)(Ingber, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #169 Motion for Extension of Time until July 15, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the consolidated class action complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/24/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy re #169 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 15, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the consolidated class action complaint #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Ingber, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 169 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 15, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the consolidated class action complaint #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy. (Ingber, Matthew)
May 11, 2019 Filing 168 Memorandum in Support re #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Sinderson, Katherine)
May 10, 2019 Filing 167 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino.Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline)(Sinderson, Katherine)
March 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2019 or Dismissal due by 5/10/2019 (Perez, J.)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #143 Motion to Dismiss; granting #146 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 03/08/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER directing the Clerk to amend the caption of this case to: In re Frontier Communications, Corp. Stockholders Litigation. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/25/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
February 19, 2019 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on 2/7/19 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2019. (Montini, S.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2019 re #143 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Total Time: 2 hours and 12 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Ryan, Sarah)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER moving the start time for the 2/07/19 hearing to 2:00pm. If any party is inconvenienced by this scheduling change, the party should note that inconvenience on the docket by 11:59p.m. today (02/06/19) and the Court will honor the currently scheduled start time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/06/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
December 20, 2018 Filing 161 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET Hearing previously set for 1/2/19. Hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Ryan, Sarah)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 First MOTION for Extension of Time for the Hearing on Defendants' Pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/20/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
December 17, 2018 Filing 159 First MOTION for Extension of Time until Week of 1/28/2019 or 2/4/2019 Hearing on Defendants' Pending Motions to Dismiss 158 Calendar Entry,, Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings, by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Sinderson, Katherine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing on all pending motions set for 1/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Ryan, Sarah)
December 12, 2018 Filing 157 RESPONSE re #156 Notice of Additional Authority, by Barclays Capital Inc, Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Donald W. Daniels, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, UBS Securities LLC, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Ingber, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 156 Notice of Additional Authority re #143 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, joining #144 Memorandum of Law and #145 Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sinderson, Katherine)
October 12, 2018 Filing 155 REPLY to Response to #143 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, joining #144 Memorandum of Law and #145 Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber, filed by Barclays Capital Inc, Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Donald W. Daniels, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Merrill Lynch, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, UBS Securities LLC, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber, #2 Supplemental Exhibit 1 Business Wire Article re: Michael Golob, #3 Supplemental Exhibit 2 Frontier Section14(a) Proxy Statement, #4 Supplemental Exhibit 3 Frontier Audit Committee Charter, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ingber, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Cagney on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC (Cagney, Craig)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/03/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 2, 2018 Filing 152 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Extension Of The Page Limit For Their Reply Memorandum In Support Of Dismissal by Barclays Capital Inc, Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Donald W. Daniels, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Merrill Lynch, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, UBS Securities LLC, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Ingber, Matthew)
August 28, 2018 Filing 151 Memorandum in Opposition re #143 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, joining #144 Memorandum of Law and #145 Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Sinderson, Katherine)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #149 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher M. Barrett terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/25/2018. (McDonough, S.)
July 24, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION for Christopher M. Barrett to Withdraw as Attorney by Wayne County Employees' Retirement System. (Barrett, Christopher)
June 29, 2018 Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter re #143 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Ingber, Matthew)
June 29, 2018 Filing 147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barclays Capital Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC re #146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, joining #144 Memorandum of Law and #145 Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber, (Duggan, Charles)
June 29, 2018 Filing 146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, joining #144 Memorandum of Law and #145 Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber, by Barclays Capital Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC.Responses due by 7/20/2018 (Duggan, Charles)
June 29, 2018 Filing 145 AFFIDAVIT re #144 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber Signed By Matthew D. Ingber filed by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. 1, #2 Exhibit EX. 2, #3 Exhibit EX. 3, #4 Exhibit EX. 4, #5 Exhibit EX. 5, #6 Exhibit EX. 6, #7 Exhibit EX. 7, #8 Exhibit EX. 8, #9 Exhibit EX. 9, #10 Exhibit EX. 10, #11 Exhibit EX. 11, #12 Exhibit EX. 12, #13 Exhibit EX. 13, #14 Exhibit EX. 14, #15 Exhibit EX. 15, #16 Exhibit EX. 16, #17 Exhibit EX. 17, #18 Exhibit EX. 18, #19 Exhibit EX. 19, #20 Exhibit EX. 20, #21 Exhibit EX. 21, #22 Exhibit EX. 22, #23 Exhibit EX. 23, #24 Exhibit EX. 24, #25 Exhibit EX. 25, #26 Exhibit EX. 26, #27 Exhibit EX. 27, #28 Exhibit EX. 28, #29 Exhibit EX. 29, #30 Exhibit EX. 30, #31 Exhibit EX. 31, #32 Exhibit EX. 32, #33 Exhibit EX. 33, #34 Exhibit EX. 34, #35 Exhibit EX. 35, #36 Exhibit EX. 36, #37 Exhibit EX. 37, #38 Exhibit EX. 38, #39 Exhibit EX. 39, #40 Exhibit EX. 40, #41 Exhibit EX. 41, #42 Exhibit EX. 42, #43 Exhibit EX. 43, #44 Exhibit EX. 44, #45 Exhibit EX. 45, #46 Exhibit EX. 46, #47 Exhibit EX. 47, #48 Exhibit EX. 48, #49 Exhibit EX. 49, #50 Exhibit EX. 50, #51 Exhibit EX. 51, #52 Exhibit EX. 52, #53 Exhibit EX. 53)(Ingber, Matthew)
June 29, 2018 Filing 144 Memorandum in Support re #143 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Ingber, Matthew)
June 29, 2018 Filing 143 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter.Responses due by 7/20/2018 (Ingber, Matthew)
June 28, 2018 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #139 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael E. Rayfield to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4882904) by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Murphy, Susan)
June 28, 2018 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #137 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ilana D. Cohen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4881321) by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Murphy, Susan)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael E. Rayfield. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/27/2018. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
June 27, 2018 Filing 139 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael E. Rayfield to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4882904) by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Rayfield)(Murphy, Susan)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ilana D. Cohen. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/26/2018. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ilana D. Cohen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4881321) by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ilana D. Cohen)(Murphy, Susan)
June 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ross H. Garber terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
June 8, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION for Ross H. Garber to Withdraw as Attorney by Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Donald W. Daniels, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter. (Garber, Ross)
April 30, 2018 Filing 134 AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against Barclays Capital Inc, Leroy T. Barnes, Jr, Peter C.B. Bynoe, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Donald W. Daniels, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Diana S. Ferguson, Edward Fraioli, Frontier Communications Corporation, John Gianukakis, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Pamela D.A. Reeve, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Howard L. Schrott, Larraine D. Segil, Mark Shapiro, UBS Securities LLC, Myron A. Wick, III, Mary Agnes Wilderotter, filed by Carlos Lagomarsino, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System.(Sinderson, Katherine)
April 24, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nathan C. Favreau terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2018. (McDonough, S.)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Bree Burns terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2018. (McDonough, S.)
March 6, 2018 Filing 130 MOTION for Nathan Favreau to Withdraw as Attorney by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Favreau, Nathan)
March 6, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION for Joseph B. Burns to Withdraw as Attorney by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Burns, Joseph)
March 5, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2018 (Perez, J.)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will adopt the parties' proposed schedule: The Amended Complaint is due on or before 4/30/2018; Any response to the Amended Complaint is due 60 days after the Amended Complaint is filed; Any opposition to the response to the Amended Complaint is due 60 days after the response is filed; Any reply is due 45 days after the opposition is filed. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/28/2018. (McDonough, S.)
February 28, 2018 Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2018. Total Time: 0 hours and 7 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (McDonough, S.)
February 22, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/28/2018 at 2:00 p.m. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/28/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 579-5562. (McDonough, S.)
February 21, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference to discuss parties' Joint Stipulation, ECF No. 123, set for 2/28/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 579-5562. (McDonough, S.)
February 7, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party by Chris Bray (Murray, Brian)
February 6, 2018 Filing 123 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Scheduling by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Jasinski, Mathew)
February 6, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew P. Jasinski on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino (Jasinski, Mathew)
January 30, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Jensen on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino (Jensen, Jesse)
January 30, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Sinderson on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino (Sinderson, Katherine)
January 30, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate W. Aufses on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino (Aufses, Kate)
January 30, 2018 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #110 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kate W. Aufses to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4689099) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Aufses, Kate)
January 30, 2018 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #109 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jesse L. Jensen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4689065) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Jensen, Jesse)
January 30, 2018 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #93 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott R. Foglietta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4676920) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Foglietta, Scott)
January 30, 2018 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #92 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katherine M. Sinderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4676918) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Sinderson, Katherine)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sean M. Fisher and David R. Schaefer terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/29/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 25, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION for Sean M. Fisher and David R. Schaefer to Withdraw as Attorney by Gene R. Wills. (Fisher, Sean)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kate W. Aufses. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/24/2018. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jesse L. Jensen. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/24/2018. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
January 22, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kate W. Aufses to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4689099) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Narwold, William)
January 22, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jesse L. Jensen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4689065) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Narwold, William)
January 22, 2018 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on 1/16/18 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: S. Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2018. (Montini, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #48 Motion to Consolidate Cases is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #46 Motion to Consolidate Cases is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #44 Motion to Consolidate Cases is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #40 Motion to Appoint Counsel and #40 Motion to Consolidate Cases are dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #37 Motion to Consolidate Cases is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #36 Motion to Consolidate Cases is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #31 Motion to Consolidate Cases is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: In light of the Court's Ruling, ECF No. 99, #28 Motion to Consolidate Cases is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Motion to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff, and Motion for Approval of Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 16, 2018 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2018 re #50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by Carlos Lagomarsino, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-1672 17-cv-1759 and 17-cv-1825 filed by Edward Hopkins, Danny Raff, Orah Raff, Sam Raff, #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with filed by John Dubois, #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith, Kevin Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Mary Jane M. Demet, #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of His Selection of Counsel filed by Raymond East, Jr., #72 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith, Kevin Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Mary Jane M. Demet, #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17CV1672-MPS; 3:17CV1759-MPS; & 3:17-cv-01825-SRU MOTION to Appoint Gene R. Wills as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Selection of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Lead Counsel and Brenner, Saltzman & Wallman LLP as Liaison Counsel for the class filed by Gene R. Wills, #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-01672; 17-cv-01759; 17-cv-01825 filed by Michael Holub, #48 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672; 3:17-cv-01759;17-cv-01825 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Wayne County Employees' Retirement System, #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Consolidate Cases filed by Scott Bugbee, Stephen Doo, #40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with No. 3:17-cv-01617-VAB; No. 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; No. 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; and No. 3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by ATM Four, LLC, #88 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Carlos Lagomarsino, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel filed by Richard Linke. Total Time: 0 hours and 39 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (McDonough, S.)
January 16, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Favreau on behalf of Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith (Favreau, Nathan)
January 12, 2018 Filing 96 Supplemental Memorandum in Support re #50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply Declaration of William H. Narwold, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Carlos Lagomarsino, #3 Exhibit B - Corrected Certification, #4 Exhibit C - Corrected Loss Chart)(Narwold, William)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott R. Foglietta. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/13/2018. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine M. Sinderson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/13/2018. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott R. Foglietta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4676920) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Narwold, William)
January 11, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katherine M. Sinderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4676918) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Narwold, William)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/11/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 11, 2018 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avi Josefson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651994) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Josefson, Avi)
January 11, 2018 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gerald H. Silk to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651871) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Silk, Gerald)
January 11, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Sur-Reply, #2 [Proposed] Narwold Sur-Reply Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Carlos Lagomarsino [Proposed], #4 Exhibit B - Corrected Certification [Proposed], #5 Exhibit C - Corrected Loss Chart [Proposed])(Narwold, William)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Kuznicki. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Clerk on 1/11/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
January 10, 2018 Filing 86 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Burns, Joseph)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: in light of movant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions, ECF No. 56, movant's motion to appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead counsel, ECF No. 33, is moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 10, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel Kuznicki to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4674726) by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burns, Joseph)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER in light of movant's Notice of Withdrawal, ECF No. 52, movant's motion to appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead counsel, ECF No. 48, is moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: in light of movant's Notice of Withdrawal, ECF No. 65, movant's motion to appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead counsel, ECF No. 46, is moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.) Modified on 1/10/2018 (Perez, J.).
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: in light of movant's Notice of Withdrawal, ECF No. 54, this motion for appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of lead counsel, ECF No. 28, is moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER in light of movant's Notice of Withdrawal, ECF No. 55, movant's motion to appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead counsel, ECF No. 23, is moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.) Modified on 1/10/2018 to correct ruling(Perez, J.).
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 9, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION for Neal L. Moskow, Esquire to Withdraw motion for lead counsel by Michael Holub. (Moskow, Neal) Modified on 1/10/2018 to correct relief requested (Perez, J.).
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/5/2018. (McDonough, S.)
January 5, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burns, Joseph)
January 2, 2018 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT re #70 Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of William H. Narwold in Further Support of Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel Signed By William H. Narwold filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Narwold, William)
January 2, 2018 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to #50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU Reply in Further Support of Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Narwold, William)
December 30, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Consolidate Cases, #65 MOTION to Withdraw, #40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with No. 3:17-cv-01617-VAB; No. 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; No. 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; and No. 3:17-cv-01825-SRU , #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17CV1672-MPS; 3:17CV1759-MPS; & 3:17-cv-01825-SRU MOTION to Appoint Gene R. Wills as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Selection of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Lead Counsel and Brenner, Saltzman & Wallman LLP as Liaison Counsel for the class, #52 MOTION to Withdraw, #54 MOTION to Withdraw, #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-01672; 17-cv-01759; 17-cv-01825 , #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel, #48 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672; 3:17-cv-01759;17-cv-01825 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU , #55 MOTION to Withdraw, #50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU , #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with , #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of His Selection of Counsel, #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-1672 17-cv-1759 and 17-cv-1825. (Motion Hearing on all motions to consolidate and motions for lead plaintiff and lead counsel set for 1/16/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden) (McDonough, S.)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Avi Josefson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/27/2018. Signed by Clerk on 12/29/2017. (Fazekas, J.)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gerald H. Silk. Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/27/2018. Signed by Clerk on 12/29/2017. (Fazekas, J.)
December 28, 2017 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Consolidate Cases filed by Scott Bugbee, Stephen Doo. (Hopkins, Shannon) Modified on 12/29/2017 to reflect corrected filer (Caffrey, A.).
December 28, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION by Edward Hopkins, Danny Raff, Sam Raff, Orah Raff of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion re: #46 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff (Egleston, Gregory) Modified on 12/29/2017 to correct event and edit text (Fazekas, J.).
December 28, 2017 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU of Arkkansas Teacher Retirement System and Carlos Lagomarsino filed by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Burns, Joseph)
December 22, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE by Richard Linke of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions (Veno, Nicole)
December 19, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avi Josefson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651994) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Narwold, William)
December 19, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gerald H. Silk to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651871) by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Narwold, William)
December 18, 2017 Filing 60 Memorandum in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with , #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-1672 17-cv-1759 and 17-cv-1825, #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU , #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of His Selection of Counsel, #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17CV1672-MPS; 3:17CV1759-MPS; & 3:17-cv-01825-SRU MOTION to Appoint Gene R. Wills as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Selection of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Lead Counsel and Brenner, Saltzman & Wallman LLP as Liaison Counsel for the class, #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-01672; 17-cv-01759; 17-cv-01825 , #48 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672; 3:17-cv-01759;17-cv-01825 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Consolidate Cases, #40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with No. 3:17-cv-01617-VAB; No. 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; No. 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; and No. 3:17-cv-01825-SRU , #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino. (Hollander, Adam)
December 18, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Hollander on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino (Hollander, Adam)
December 18, 2017 Filing 58 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU With Exhibits 1-5 Signed By Joseph B. Burns filed by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Burns, Joseph)
December 18, 2017 Filing 57 Supplemental Memorandum in Support re #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Burns, Joseph)
December 18, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE by Raymond East, Jr. 's Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions (Rubinow, Laurie)
December 18, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION by John Dubois re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with WITHDRAWAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTION OF JOHN DUBOIS, DKT#23 (Faxon, Joel) Modified on 12/19/2017 (Fazekas, J.).
December 18, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION to Withdraw by Gene R. Wills re #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17CV1672-MPS; 3:17CV1759-MPS; & 3:17-cv-01825-SRU MOTION to Appoint Gene R. Wills as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Selection of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Lead Counsel and Brenner, Saltzman & Wallman LLP as Liaison Counsel for the class Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Fisher, Sean) Modified on 12/19/2017 (Fazekas, J.).
December 15, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE by Scott Bugbee, Stephen Doo re #50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU STEPHEN DOO AND SCOTT BUGBEES NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO COMPETING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTION (Hopkins, Shannon)
December 11, 2017 Filing 52 MOTION by Wayne County Employees' Retirement System of WITHDRAWAL of Its Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (Barrett, Christopher) Modified on 12/13/2017 to correct event (Fazekas, J.).
November 28, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany S. Cates on behalf of John Dubois (Cates, Brittany)
November 27, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino.Responses due by 12/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of William H. Narwold, #3 Exhibit A - Certifications, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #5 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #6 Exhibit D - Bray Notice, #7 Exhibit E - Morrow Notice, #8 Exhibit F - St. Lucie Firefighters Notice, #9 Exhibit G - BLB&G Resume, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
November 27, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Narwold on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Carlos Lagomarsino (Narwold, William)
November 27, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672; 3:17-cv-01759;17-cv-01825 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff (Responses due by 12/18/2017, ), MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Wayne County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Christopher M. Barrett in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Barrett Decl. (PSLRA Notice), #4 Exhibit B to Barrett Decl. (Certification), #5 Exhibit C to Barrett Decl. (Estimate of losses), #6 Exhibit D to Barrett Decl. (Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd firm resume), #7 Exhibit E to Barrett Decl. (Izard Kindall & Raabe firm resume), #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrett, Christopher)
November 27, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barrett on behalf of Wayne County Employees' Retirement System (Barrett, Christopher)
November 27, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-1672 17-cv-1759 and 17-cv-1825 (Responses due by 12/18/2017, ) by Sam Raff, Orah Raff, Danny Raff, Edward Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Egleston, Gregory)
November 27, 2017 Filing 45 Memorandum in Support re #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith. (Burns, Joseph)
November 27, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS;3:17-cv-01825-SRU by Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Anthony Lattarulo, Russell Smith.Responses due by 12/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney Joseph B. Burns, with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order)(Burns, Joseph)
November 27, 2017 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT re #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Consolidate Cases Signed By Shannon L. Hopkins filed by Scott Bugbee, Stephen Doo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hopkins, Shannon)
November 27, 2017 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT re #40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with No. 3:17-cv-01617-VAB; No. 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; No. 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; and No. 3:17-cv-01825-SRU Signed By Brian P. Murray filed by ATM Four, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume)(Murray, Brian)
November 27, 2017 Filing 41 Memorandum in Support re #40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with No. 3:17-cv-01617-VAB; No. 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; No. 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; and No. 3:17-cv-01825-SRU filed by ATM Four, LLC. (Murray, Brian)
November 27, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with No. 3:17-cv-01617-VAB; No. 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; No. 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; and No. 3:17-cv-01825-SRU (Responses due by 12/18/2017, ) by ATM Four, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Brian)
November 27, 2017 Filing 39 Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Consolidate Cases filed by Scott Bugbee, Stephen Doo. (Hopkins, Shannon)
November 27, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Bree Burns on behalf of Kevin Demet, Mary Jane M. Demet, Francis L. Ingram, Russell Smith, Anthony Lattarulo (Burns, Joseph)
November 27, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Consolidate Cases by Stephen Doo, Scott Bugbee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Shannon)
November 27, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-01672; 17-cv-01759; 17-cv-01825 by Michael Holub.Responses due by 12/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Moskow, Neal)
November 27, 2017 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of His Selection of Counsel Signed By Laurie Rubinow filed by Raymond East, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rubinow, Laurie)
November 27, 2017 Filing 34 Memorandum in Support re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of His Selection of Counsel filed by Raymond East, Jr.. (Rubinow, Laurie)
November 27, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of His Selection of Counsel by Raymond East, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubinow, Laurie)
November 27, 2017 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel filed by Richard Linke. (Veno, Nicole)
November 27, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17-cv-01672-MPS; 3:17-cv-01759-MPS; 3:17-cv-01825-SRU and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel by Richard Linke.Responses due by 12/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Nicole A. Veno, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Veno, Nicole)
November 27, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Fisher on behalf of Gene R. Wills (Fisher, Sean)
November 27, 2017 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17CV1672-MPS; 3:17CV1759-MPS; & 3:17-cv-01825-SRU MOTION to Appoint Gene R. Wills as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Selection of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Lead Counsel and Brenner, Saltzman & Wallman LLP as Liaison Counsel for the class filed by Gene R. Wills. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Schaefer in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David R. Schaefer, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David R. Schaefer, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of David R. Schaefer, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of David R. Schaefer)(Schaefer, David)
November 27, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:17CV1672-MPS; 3:17CV1759-MPS; & 3:17-cv-01825-SRU, MOTION to Appoint Gene R. Wills as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Selection of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Lead Counsel and Brenner, Saltzman & Wallman LLP as Liaison Counsel for the class by Gene R. Wills.Responses due by 12/18/2017 (Schaefer, David)
November 27, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Schaefer on behalf of Gene R. Wills (Schaefer, David)
November 27, 2017 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with by John Dubois. (Faxon, Joel)
November 27, 2017 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion Signed By Joel T. Faxon filed by John Dubois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Faxon, Joel)
November 27, 2017 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with filed by John Dubois. (Faxon, Joel)
November 27, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with by John Dubois.Responses due by 12/18/2017 (Faxon, Joel)
November 27, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thomas Faxon on behalf of John Dubois (Faxon, Joel)
November 20, 2017 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Garber, Ross)
November 17, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Niketa Patel on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation (Patel, Niketa)
November 1, 2017 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Niketa K. Patel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4582433), #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Archis A. Parasharami to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4582423), #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew D. Ingber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4582413). (Attachments: #1 Matthew David Ingber, #2 Archis A. Parasharami, #3 Niketa K. Patel) (Peterson, M)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Attorney Niketa K. Patel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/26/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2017. (Oliver, T.)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Attorney Archis A. Parasharami to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Archis A. Parasharami for Donald W. Daniels, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/26/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2017. (Oliver, T.)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Attorney Matthew D. Ingber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew D. Ingber for Donald W. Daniels, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/26/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2017. (Oliver, T.)
October 26, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE by Donald W. Daniels, Frontier Communications Corporation, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy re #9 Notice of Appearance, #8 Notice of Appearance of Filing of Pro Hac Vice Motions (Garber, Ross)
October 26, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Niketa K. Patel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4582433) by Donald W. Daniels, Frontier Communications Corporation, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
October 26, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Archis A. Parasharami to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4582423) by Donald W. Daniels, Frontier Communications Corporation, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
October 26, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew D. Ingber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4582413) by Donald W. Daniels, Frontier Communications Corporation, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
October 26, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan S. Murphy on behalf of Donald W. Daniels, Frontier Communications Corporation, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy (Murphy, Susan)
October 26, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross H. Garber on behalf of Donald W. Daniels, Frontier Communications Corporation, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy (Garber, Ross)
October 17, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Archis A. Parasharami on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation (Parasharami, Archis)
October 17, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Ingber on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation (Ingber, Matthew)
September 28, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE by Chris Bray re #1 Complaint Corrected Plaintiff Certification (Murray, Brian)
September 26, 2017 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Donald W. Daniels, Frontier Communications Corporation, John M. Jureller, Ralph Perley McBride, Daniel J. McCarthy* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian P. Murray* *Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP - NY* *122 East 42nd Street, Suite 2920* *New York, NY 10168*. (Fazekas, J.)
September 26, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Chris Bray, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2017.(Fazekas, J.)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/26/2017.(Fazekas, J.)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/26/2017.(Fazekas, J.)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 12/26/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2017. Discovery due by 3/28/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 4/27/2018. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2017.(Fazekas, J.)
September 26, 2017 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2017 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Murray, Brian)
September 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4546809.), filed by Chris Bray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Frontier Communications, Corp. Stockholders Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Daniels
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Jureller
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Perley McBride
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Communications Corporation
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. McCarthy
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Fraioli
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Bray
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene R. Wills
Represented By: David R. Schaefer
Represented By: Sean M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Demet
Represented By: Nathan C. Favreau
Represented By: Joseph Bree Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Dubois
Represented By: Brittany S. Cates
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raymond East, Jr.
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Raff
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mary Jane M. Demet
Represented By: Nathan C. Favreau
Represented By: Joseph Bree Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Hopkins
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Lagomarsino
Represented By: Katherine Sinderson
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Kate W. Aufses
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Jesse Jensen
Represented By: Adam Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sam Raff
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arkansas Teacher Retirement System
Represented By: Katherine Sinderson
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Kate W. Aufses
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Jesse Jensen
Represented By: Adam Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wayne County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Smith
Represented By: Nathan C. Favreau
Represented By: Joseph Bree Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Lattarulo
Represented By: Nathan C. Favreau
Represented By: Joseph Bree Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Linke
Represented By: Nicole Anne Veno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francis L. Ingram
Represented By: Nathan C. Favreau
Represented By: Joseph Bree Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Orah Raff
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Bugbee
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Doo
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Holub
Represented By: Neal Lewis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ATM Four, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Larraine D. Segil
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Larisa Rosenberg
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lisa R. Morrow
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Daniel McCarthy
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Peter C.B. Bynoe
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mizuho Securities USA Inc.
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mark Shapiro
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Pamela D.A. Reeve
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Merrill Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mary Agnes Wilderotter
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Myron A. Wick, III
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Diana S. Ferguson
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Donald Daniels
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Gianukakis
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Leroy T. Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Howard L. Schrott
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Virginia P. Ruesterholz
Represented By: Niketa Patel
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Ross H. Garber
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Frontier Communications, Corp. Stockholders Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?