Hybrid Athletics, LLC v. Hylete, LLC
Plaintiff: Hybrid Athletics, LLC
Defendant: Hylete, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01767
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Victor A. Bolden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying 211 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling and Order on Hylete, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Regarding Proposed Counterclaim 6. See attached order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/8/2019. (Conde, Djenab)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 163 Motion to Quash by Hybrid & 165 Motion to Quash by CrossFit.For the reasons explained in the attached Ruling and Order, the motions to quash are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.Th e motions are granted in part on relevance grounds, but only to the extent consistent with the rulings in the attached Ruling and Order, and with respect to the four documents specifically identified as containing attorney work product. The motions a re otherwise denied with respect to the claimed application of the attorney-client privilege, the common interest rule, and the work product doctrine.Because of the unique importance of the attorney-client privilege in our system of justice, the d enial on privilege grounds is without prejudice to renewal, subject to an evidentiary showing of the existence of either an attorney-client relationship or a joint litigation strategy between Hybrid and Cross-Fit's in-house counsel, consistent w ith the cases cited in this ruling.Any re-filed motion to quash must be filed in this Court by September 20, 2019. Moreover, before any such motion is re-filed, the parties must meet and confer to develop an expedited briefing schedule to ensure the speedy and efficient completion of all outstanding pre-trial discovery. See attached Ruling and Order for full details. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/30/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RULING AND ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND THE AMENDMENT OF THE PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE: On April 17, 2019, the Court held a telephonic discovery conference to address several pending discovery disputes in this trademark infringement action. Minute Entry, dated Apr. 17, 2019, ECF No. 155.For the reasons explained in the attached Ruling and Order, the Court makes several discovery rulings but reserves decision on others. In addition, as discussed below, the Court has determined that it must adopt a more focused schedule to manage discovery in this case.Accordingly, by May 3, 2019, the parties shall meet, confer, and propose a new, realistic schedule for the completion of discovery and the briefing of dispositive motions in light of t he rulings in the attached Ruling and Order, the still-pending discovery issues to be resolved, and any additional issues that may require changes to the schedule. See attached Ruling and Order for full details. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/17/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 76 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/10/2018. (McDonough, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hybrid Athletics, LLC v. Hylete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hybrid Athletics, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Kosma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hylete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?