Securities and Exchange Commission v. Westport Capital Markets, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Securities and Exchange Commission |
Defendant: |
Westport Capital Markets, LLC and Christopher E. McClure |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv02064 |
Filed: |
December 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Connecticut |
Office: |
New Haven Office |
County: |
Fairfield |
Presiding Judge: |
Jeffrey A. Meyer |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 26, 2020 |
Filing
151
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR FOR A NEW TRIAL (Doc. # 143 ). For the reasons stated in the attached opinion, the Court DENIES defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50 or in the alternative their motion for a new trial pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/26/2020. (DeBot, B.)
|
February 27, 2020 |
Filing
105
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF SEC'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING COMPLIANCE CONSULTANT. For the reasons stated in the attached opinion, the SEC's motion in limine to preclude evidence of defendants' reliance on the advice of Regulatory Compliance (Doc. # 79 ) is GRANTED insofar as it precludes defendants' ninth affirmative defense, GRANTED insofar as it seeks to preclude evidence concerning the work and knowledge of Walter Costenbader and Stacy Peters, but otherwise DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/27/2020. (Webley, A)
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN PART. For the reasons stated in the attached opinion, the SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 47 ) is GRANTED as to Counts Two, Three, and Four and DENIED as to Counts One and Five. The SEC 9;s request to preclude any advice-of-consultant evidence or defense, as well as its request for the imposition of sanctions or penalties, are both DENIED without prejudice to renewal at trial. The parties shall file their Joint Trial Memorandum by November 1, 2019, and the Court shall thereafter set a date for a jury trial. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/30/2019. (Webley, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?