Floodbreak, LLC v. Art Metal Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Floodbreak, LLC
Defendant: Art Metal Industries, LLC and Kevin F. Biebel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00503
Filed: March 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Litchfield
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER denying 130 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of No Lost Profits Damages; denying 135 Sealed Motion to Exclude Testimony; denying 157 Redacted Motion to Exclude Testimony; denying 160 Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment of No Lost Profits Damages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/13/2020. (Simon, K)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Direct or Indirect Infringement by Kevin Biebel and No Willful Infringement by Art Metal Industries or Kevin Biebel; granting in part and denying in part 162 Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Direct or Indirect Infringement by Kevin Biebel and No Willful Infringement by Art Metal Industries or Kevin Biebel. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/3/2020. (Simon, K)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying 147 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Invalidity; denying 165 Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Invalidity. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/6/2020. (Simon, K)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER regarding Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/8/2019. (Kaas, E.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floodbreak, LLC v. Art Metal Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floodbreak, LLC
Represented By: Edmond R. Bannon
Represented By: Monte E. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Metal Industries, LLC
Represented By: Alexander E. Andrews
Represented By: Brian E. Moran
Represented By: James Nault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin F. Biebel
Represented By: Alexander E. Andrews
Represented By: Brian E. Moran
Represented By: James Nault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?