Pal v. Cipolla et al
Plaintiff: Neelu Pal
Defendant: Robert Cipolla, Robert Smaldone, Michael Tyler, Scott Sear, Daniel Monahan, Richard Janes, Town of Wilton and Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv00616
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 502) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 6/3/2024. (Bassali, D)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER. The attached ruling sets forth in more detail the reasons for dismissing this case under Rule 41(b). Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/29/2024. (Bassali, D)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, the Court DENIES in part and DENIES without prejudice in part the defendants' motions 289 291 292 . As noted in the ruling, if the defendants wish to file time entries reflecting time - and any expenses - incurred on the afternoon and evening of January 19 and the morning of January 20, they must do so by August 25, 2023. By September 1, 2023, the plaintiff shall pay to the Clerk of the Court a total of $3,599.35 as reimbursement of the funds the Court paid for prospective jurors' mileage and attendance. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/11/23. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (Constantine, A.)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the plaintiff's motion to amend or alter judgment 202 is denied. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/14/2021. (Constantine, A.)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Daniel Monahan's and Richard Janes' motion for summary judgment 147 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/23/20. (Constantine, A.)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Preserve Right to Depose Plaintiff's Medical Providers and Minor Children; granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion joining 108 Motion to Preserve Right to Depose Plaintiff's Medical Providers and Minor Children; and granting 112 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 02/05/2020. (Thomason, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER regarding discovery dispute. Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Letter, # 2 Defendants' Letter. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/2/2019.(Constantine, A.)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached, Defendants' 44 motion to dismiss is DENIED as to the state law claims and GRANTED as to the municipal liability claim. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/8/2019. (Ram, Megha)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pal v. Cipolla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neelu Pal
Represented By: William Sylvester Palmieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cipolla
Represented By: James Newhall Tallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smaldone
Represented By: James Newhall Tallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tyler
Represented By: James Newhall Tallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sear
Represented By: James Newhall Tallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Janes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Wilton
Represented By: James Newhall Tallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?