Brown v. Milford Associates

Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Defendant: Milford Associates
Case Number: 3:2018cv01161
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2018 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milford Associates. (Tougias, Ryan)
August 14, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Milford Associates to 9/17/2018. (Lewis, D)
August 14, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/17/2018 file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/14/2018. (Lewis, D)
August 13, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/24/2018 (DeRubeis, B.)
August 10, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher E. Brown. Milford Associates served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Mussman, Louis)
August 10, 2018 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/17/2018 file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint by Milford Associates. (Tougias, Ryan)
August 10, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Stephen Tougias on behalf of Milford Associates (Tougias, Ryan)
August 10, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Jones on behalf of Milford Associates (Jones, Michael)
August 8, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ioannis A. Kaloidis on behalf of Christopher E. Brown (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
July 16, 2018 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Milford Associates* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Louis I. Mussman* *Ku & Mussman,-FL* *18501 Pines Blvd* *Pembroke Pines, FL 33029*. (Anastasio, F.)
July 13, 2018 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Order re: Discovery, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Christopher E. Brown Signed by Clerk on 7/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
July 13, 2018 5 Featured Case Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
July 13, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
July 13, 2018 3 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
July 13, 2018 2 Featured Case Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/13/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2018 Discovery due by 1/12/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2019 Signed by Clerk on 7/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
July 13, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
July 13, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Milford Associates. (Mussman, Louis)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Milford Associates ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4900138.), filed by Christopher E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Milford Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Ioannis A. Kaloidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford Associates
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Ryan Stephen Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?