USA v. Brasfield

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Joe D. Brasfield
Case Number: 3:2018cv01194
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Joe D. Brasfield by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sciarrino, Christine)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 10/10/2018. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. Signed by Clerk on 9/10/18. (Johnson, D.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Joe D. Brasfield by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sciarrino, Christine)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Joe D. Brasfield served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Re: Military Service)(Sciarrino, Christine)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Joe D. Brasfield* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christine L. Sciarrino* *U.S. Attorney's Office-NH* *157 Church St., 25th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 07/20/2018. (Peterson, M)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/19/2018. (Peterson, M)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/19/2018. (Peterson, M)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/19/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2018. Discovery due by 1/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/19/2018. (Peterson, M)
July 19, 2018 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 19, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Joe D Brasfield. (Sciarrino, Christine)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe D Brasfield (Filing fee $400.), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sciarrino, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Brasfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe D. Brasfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Christine L. Sciarrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?