Sherlach v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: William Sherlach
Defendant: Infowars, LLC, Cory T. Sklanka, Alex Emric Jones, Infowars Health, LLC, Genesis Communications Network, Inc., Midas Resources, Inc., Prison Planet TV, LLC, Wolfgang Halbig and Free Speech Systems, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01269
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 39 OBJECTION re #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Midas Resources, Inc.. (Brown, Stephen)
September 28, 2018 Filing 38 Memorandum in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Infowars Health, LLC, Infowars, LLC, Alex Emric Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Halbig Affidavit regarding Cory Sklanka)(Wolman, Jay)
September 28, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wolfgang Halbig. (Anastasio, F.)
August 23, 2018 Filing 36 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 9/28/2018 (Lewis, D)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/23/2018. (Lewis, D)
August 21, 2018 Filing 34 Memorandum in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted filed by Cory T. Sklanka. (Connelli, Lawrence)
August 21, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by Cory T. Sklanka.Responses due by 9/11/2018 (Connelli, Lawrence)
August 21, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2018 to Respond to Motion to Remand #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Midas Resources, Inc.. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time #27 MOTION for Extension of Time and Entry of Scheduling Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/17/2018. (Lewis, D)
August 17, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2018 to respond to the Motion to Remand by Free Speech Systems, LLC, Genesis Communications Network, Inc., Wolfgang Halbig, Infowars Health, LLC, Infowars, LLC, Alex Emric Jones, Midas Resources, Inc., Prison Planet TV, LLC, Cory T. Sklanka. (Wolman, Jay)
August 15, 2018 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by William Sherlach. (Bloss, William)
August 15, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand to State Court by William Sherlach.Responses due by 9/5/2018 (Bloss, William)
August 15, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time and Entry of Scheduling Order by William Sherlach. (Bloss, William)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re: Jurisdiction Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/9/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 10, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence L. Connelli on behalf of Cory T. Sklanka (Connelli, Lawrence)
August 7, 2018 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Free Speech Systems, LLC, Infowars Health, LLC, Infowars, LLC, Alex Emric Jones, Prison Planet TV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FBI Crime Statistics, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lafferty Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - CT Post Article)(Wolman, Jay)
August 7, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Free Speech Systems, LLC, Infowars Health, LLC, Infowars, LLC, Alex Emric Jones, Prison Planet TV, LLC.Responses due by 8/28/2018 (Wolman, Jay)
August 7, 2018 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Midas Resources, Inc.. (Brown, Stephen)
August 7, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Midas Resources, Inc..Responses due by 8/28/2018 (Brown, Stephen)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/1/18.(Johnson, D.)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. In light of related case Lafferty et al v. Jones et al, 18-cv-1156, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to Chief Judge Janet C. Hall. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/1/2018. (Barclay, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole R Cuglietto on behalf of Midas Resources, Inc. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
August 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Brown on behalf of Midas Resources, Inc. (Brown, Stephen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alex Emric Jones re #8 Notice (Other), #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Notice of Related Case, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Notice (Other), #12 Electronic Filing Order, #14 Electronic Service Documents,,,, #1 Notice of Removal,,, #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #6 Notice (Other), #11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #13 Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Wolman, Jay)
August 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Bloss on behalf of William Sherlach (Bloss, William)
August 1, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Notice (Other) filed by Alex Emric Jones, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Prison Planet TV, LLC, #10 Notice of Related Case filed by Alex Emric Jones, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Infowars Health, LLC, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Free Speech Systems, LLC, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Alex Emric Jones, #12 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Infowars, LLC, Infowars Health, LLC, Free Speech Systems, LLC, Prison Planet TV, LLC, Alex Emric Jones, #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wolfgang Halbig, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Alex Emric Jones, #11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #13 Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Infowars, LLC Signed by Clerk on 08/01/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/31/2018. (Peterson, M)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/31/2018. (Peterson, M)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2018. Discovery due by 1/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/31/2018. (Peterson, M)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case by Alex Emric Jones (Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss with legal authority incorporated by Wolfgang Halbig.Responses due by 8/21/2018. Pending in State Court at time of removal.(Walker, J.)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Alex Emric Jones Notice to Counsel Re: Local Rule 5(b) (Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Alex Emric Jones Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Alex Emric Jones Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Halbig Motion to Dismiss)(Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prison Planet TV, LLC. (Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infowars Health, LLC. (Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Free Speech Systems, LLC. (Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infowars, LLC. (Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prison Planet TV, LLC, Infowars, LLC, Alex Emric Jones, Free Speech Systems, LLC, Infowars Health, LLC from Superior Court, Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, Connecticut, case number FBT-CV18-6076475-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4919590, filed by Prison Planet TV, LLC, Infowars, LLC, Alex Emric Jones, Free Speech Systems, LLC, Infowars Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wolman Appearance, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Supplemental Return of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jones Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Halbig Consent to Removal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Midas Consent to Removal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Genesis Consent to Removal, #9 Exhibit - Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolman, Jay)
July 31, 2018 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherlach v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infowars, LLC
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory T. Sklanka
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Represented By: Lawrence L. Connelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Emric Jones
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infowars Health, LLC
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Communications Network, Inc.
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midas Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Represented By: Nicole R Cuglietto
Represented By: Stephen P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Planet TV, LLC
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfgang Halbig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Speech Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sherlach
Represented By: Matthew Blumenthal
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?