USA v. $4,160.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $4,160.00 in United States Currency and 1963 Cadillac Deville, VIN 63J024489
Claimant: Julie Cestaro and Pasquale Cestaro
Case Number: 3:2018cv01274
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay time to plead and discovery by Julie Cestaro, Pasquale Cestaro.Responses due by 10/16/2018 (Kores, Noah)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Jon Kores on behalf of Julie Cestaro, Pasquale Cestaro (Kores, Noah)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Julie Cestaro by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sullivan, David)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Pasquale Cestaro, Jr. by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sullivan, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Order re: Discovery, #2 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 1, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $4,160.00 in United States Currency, One 1963 Cadillac Deville, VIN 63J024489, filed by USA.(Sullivan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $4,160.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,160.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1963 Cadillac Deville, VIN 63J024489
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Julie Cestaro
Represented By: Noah Jon Kores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pasquale Cestaro
Represented By: Noah Jon Kores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: David X. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?