Borderud v. Riverside Motorcars, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mark Borderud
Defendant: Riverside Motorcars, LLC, Christian Salinardi and Joseph Salinardi
Case Number: 3:2018cv01291
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as to Riverside Motorcars,LLC and Joseph Salinardi. Motion for default judgment due by 11/2/2018. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. Signed by Clerk on 10/3/2018. (Perez, J.)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Riverside Motorcars,LLC and Joseph Salinardi by Mark Borderud. (Pantuso, Anthony)
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Borderud. Joseph Salinardi served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Pantuso, Anthony)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Borderud. Christian Salinardi served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Pantuso, Anthony)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Borderud. (Pantuso, Anthony)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Christian Salinardi. Responses due by 9/19/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Borderud. Riverside Motorcars, LLC served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Pantuso, Anthony)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Joseph Salinardi* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *4 Research Drive Suite 402* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Christian Salinardi* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *4 Research Drive Suite 402* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 24, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Joseph Salinardi. (Pantuso, Anthony)
August 24, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Christian Salinardi. (Pantuso, Anthony)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Riverside Motorcars, LLC, Christian Salinardi, Joseph Salinardi* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *4 Research Drive Suite 402* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mark Borderud* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *4 Research Drive Suite 402* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 8/7/2018 (Fazekas, J.).
August 6, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Riverside Motorcars, LLC, Christian Salinardi, Joseph Salinardi. (Pantuso, Anthony)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Mark Borderud, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 8/6/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/6/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/6/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2018. Discovery due by 2/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/6/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2018 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4924983.), filed by Mark Borderud. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pantuso, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borderud v. Riverside Motorcars, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Motorcars, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Salinardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Salinardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Borderud
Represented By: Anthony J. Pantuso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?