Erhardt v. American Honda Motor Co. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helmut Erhardt
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc., Mazda Motor of America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc., TMD Friction Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Kelsey-Hayes Company, General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, Certain-Teed Corporation, Porsche Cars North America Inc., Luk Aftermarket Service LLC, Genuine Parts Company, Nissan North America, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, American Honda Motor Co. Inc., BWDAC Inc., BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Pneumo Abex LLC, Fiat USA Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, ZF North America, Inc., Worldpac, Inc., BMW of North America, LLC, TRW Automotive U.S., LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., CBS Corporation, Renault Corporation, Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Certain-Teed Corp, Union Carbide Corp, ZF North American, Inc., Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Borgwarner Morse, TEC, LLC, Kelsey-Hayes Co, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. and Genuine Parts Co.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01327
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 84 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Craven, James)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/01/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
September 28, 2018 Filing 82 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 5, 2018 to File the 26(f) Report by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Craven, James)
September 27, 2018 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Maulucci, Jacqueline)
September 27, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Ann Maulucci on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Maulucci, Jacqueline)
September 18, 2018 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust against All Defendants by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust.(Tripicco, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scott Tripicco on behalf of Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Tripicco, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
August 30, 2018 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Audi of America, LLC.(Polglase, Holly)
August 30, 2018 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
August 30, 2018 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc..(Berglund, Curtis)
August 30, 2018 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Berglund, Curtis)
August 30, 2018 Filing 72 American Honda's Co., Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to All Cross-Claims by American Honda Motor Co. Inc..(Berglund, Curtis)
August 30, 2018 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Honda Motor Co. Inc.. (Berglund, Curtis)
August 22, 2018 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Szczesny, Brett)
August 21, 2018 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corp(individually and as successor to Amchem and Benjamin Foster). (Centeno, Christy)
August 21, 2018 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corp(individually and as successor to Amchem and Benjamin Foster).(Centeno, Christy)
August 21, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Christy E. Centeno on behalf of Union Carbide Corp(individually and as successor to Amchem and Benjamin Foster) (Centeno, Christy)
August 20, 2018 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Ing H.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG, Corporate Parent Porsche Ent Inc for Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Chafe, Marie)
August 17, 2018 Answer deadline updated for American Honda Motor Co. Inc. to 8/30/2018; Audi of America, LLC to 8/30/2018; Nissan North America, Inc. to 8/30/2018; Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. to 8/30/2018; Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. to 8/30/2018. (Torres, K.)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to Complaint due by 8/30/2018. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/17/2018. (Giammatteo, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TMD Friction Inc.. (Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 63 First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 30, 2018 to Respond to Complaint by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Berglund, Curtis)
August 16, 2018 Filing 62 First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 30, 2018 to Respond to Complaint by American Honda Motor Co. Inc.. (Berglund, Curtis)
August 16, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/30/18 to Respond to Complaint by Audi of America, LLC. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/30/18 to Respond to Complaint by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/30/18 to Respond to Complaint by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Sbarra, Jr on behalf of Audi of America, LLC (Sbarra, Anthony)
August 16, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Sbarra, Jr on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Sbarra, Anthony)
August 16, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Sbarra, Jr on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Sbarra, Anthony)
August 16, 2018 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Audi of America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Audi of America, LLC. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims and Third-Party Complaints, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRW Automotive U.S., LLC.(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims and Third Party Complaints, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ZF North American, Inc..(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims and Third Party Complaints, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Standard Motor Products, Inc..(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims and Third Party Complaints, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 47 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BMW of North America, LLC. (Chafe, Marie)
August 16, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Borgwarner Morse, TEC, LLC.(Mahoney, Brendan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Audi of America, LLC (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BMW of North America, LLC.(Chafe, Marie)
August 16, 2018 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims and Third Party Complaints, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Kelsey-Hayes Co.(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims and Third Party Complaints, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Dana Companies LLC.(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims and Third Pary Complaints, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Certain-Teed Corp.(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) by Borgwarner Morse, TEC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BorgWarner, Inc. for Borgwarner Morse, TEC, LLC. (Mahoney, Brendan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRW Automotive U.S., LLC. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan T. Mahoney on behalf of Borgwarner Morse, TEC, LLC (Mahoney, Brendan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZF North American, Inc.. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Motor Products, Inc.. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kelsey-Hayes Co identifying Other Affiliate ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. for Kelsey-Hayes Co. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies LLC. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain-Teed Corp. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Henry Balestracci on behalf of Certain-Teed Corp, Dana Companies LLC, Kelsey-Hayes Co, Pneumo Abex LLC, Standard Motor Products, Inc., TRW Automotive U.S., LLC, ZF North American, Inc. (Balestracci, Thomas)
August 16, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jason Zamaloff on behalf of Certain-Teed Corp, Dana Companies LLC, Kelsey-Hayes Co, Pneumo Abex LLC, Standard Motor Products, Inc., TRW Automotive U.S., LLC, ZF North American, Inc. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 28 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Chafe, Marie)
August 16, 2018 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Porsche Cars North America, Inc..(Chafe, Marie)
August 16, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Worldpac, Inc..(Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by TMD Friction Inc..(Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Genuine Parts Co..(Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Worldpac, Inc.. (Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Co.. (Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Margreta Vellucci on behalf of Worldpac, Inc. (Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Margreta Vellucci on behalf of TMD Friction Inc. (Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Margreta Vellucci on behalf of Genuine Parts Co. (Vellucci, Margreta)
August 16, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis A Berglund on behalf of American Honda Motor Co. Inc. (Berglund, Curtis)
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.(Craven, James)
August 15, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/28/2018 (Perez, J.)
August 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis A Berglund on behalf of Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Berglund, Curtis)
August 14, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. (Martin, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of CBS Corporation (Martin, Robert)
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Gasser on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA LLC (Gasser, Joseph)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #11 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #10 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 8/9/2018.(Perez, J.)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (LaBelle, Dan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan E. LaBelle on behalf of General Electric Company (LaBelle, Dan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Michael Szczesny on behalf of General Electric Company (Szczesny, Brett)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/9/2018.(Perez, J.)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/9/2018.(Perez, J.)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2018; Discovery due by 2/8/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/2018.(Perez, J.)
August 9, 2018 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC [Notice Regarding Planning Conference and Report] (Craven, James)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC [Notice of Pending Motions in State Case] (Craven, James)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC [Removal Statement] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Craven, James)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Craven on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA LLC (Craven, James)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC from Superior Court for the State of Connecticut, Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV-18-6076553-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4930509, filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Fortier v. Allis Chalmers verdict slip and jury award, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal filed in Superior Court, #5 Exhibit E - Process, Pleadings & Orders served upon MBUSA)(Craven, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erhardt v. American Honda Motor Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zamaloff
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMD Friction Inc.
Represented By: Margreta Vellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America, LLC
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Represented By: Anthony J Sbarra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Brett Michael Szczesny
Represented By: Dan E. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zamaloff
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Cars North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luk Aftermarket Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Represented By: Anthony J Sbarra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: James O. Craven
Represented By: Joseph Edward Gasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co. Inc.
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Michael Scott Tripicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zamaloff
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline Ann Maulucci
Represented By: Melicent B. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldpac, Inc.
Represented By: Margreta Vellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Marie E. Chafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive U.S., LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zamaloff
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Represented By: Anthony J Sbarra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renault Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Represented By: Marie E. Chafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corp
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zamaloff
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corp
Represented By: Christy E. Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF North American, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zamaloff
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse, TEC, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Co
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zamaloff
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Represented By: Trevor J. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Co.
Represented By: Margreta Vellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helmut Erhardt
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?