Alderman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Susan Alderman
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01344
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 03:30 PM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Counsel must be prepared to discuss, in detail, the claims, defenses, and anticipated discovery (including scope and scheduling). This conference call is to be arranged between counsel. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (203) 773-2428. (DeRubeis, B.)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susan Alderman. (Hall, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hall, John)
September 11, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/24/2018 (Lewis, D)
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Mortgage)(Higgins, Sean)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..Responses due by 9/26/2018 (Higgins, Sean)
August 17, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 9/7/2018. (Lewis, D)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/17/2018. (Lewis, D)
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 7, 2018 To Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Higgins, Sean)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Higgins, Sean)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Higgins, Sean)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. STATEMENT REQUIRED BY STANDING ORDER FOR REMOVED CASES (Higgins, Sean)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Higgins, Sean)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #5 Standing Order re: Discovery, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Anastasio, F.)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/10/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/10/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/10/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2018 Discovery due by 2/9/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2019 Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 10, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Superior Court for the Judicial District of Stamford/Norwalk, case number FST-CV18-6037469-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4931518, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Return of Service), #3 Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Higgins, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alderman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Alderman
Represented By: John R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?