Parkman v. O'Connor et al
Plaintiff: Robert Parkman
Defendant: John Doe, William O'Connor and Justin Quick
Case Number: 3:2018cv01358
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Windham
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation during this case. Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 10/9/2018. (Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The clerk is directed to reopen this case. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/9/18.(Dooley, Kari)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Parkman. (Payton, R.)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing the Complaint. Plaintiff failed to cure the deficiency in #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as ordered August 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/27/18. (Dooley, Kari)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 9/20/18.(Walker, J.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. You must submit the attached Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis Form. Also, you must submit a Ledger Sheet showing at least the past Six Months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 9/12/2018 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 8/21/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Parkman. (Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against John Doe, William O'Connor, Justin Quick, filed by Robert Parkman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hernandez, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkman v. O'Connor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Parkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?