Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv01367
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after the Rule 26(f) conference and the discovery deadline be extended to 6 months after the Rule 26(f) conference, and the dispositive motion deadline be extended to 7 months after the Rule 26(f) conference Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 29, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re #15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief of Service of Third Party Subpoena on Subscribers ISP (Conway, Kevin)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion For Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/22/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Withdraw. Documents uploaded on the docket cannot be removed. The motion for leave, ECF #9 has been denied as moot in light of the filing of the corrected motion for leave #11 . So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/21/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion For Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena in light of the filing of the corrected motion, ECF No. 11. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/21/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw Document from Docket by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 9/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin)
August 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 9/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 Docket Entry Correction re #7 Report on Copyright Form. Replacement Form for Main PDF added. (Hernandez, T.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Hernandez, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2018: #2 Replacement PDF) (Hernandez, T.).
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/15/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2018. Discovery due by 2/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
August 13, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4933862.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?