Scott v. Walt Disney Company et al
Plaintiff: Kimberley Scott
Defendant: Walt Disney Company, Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC and The Stuart O. Scott Family Trust dated September 19, 2003, and Kimberley Scott
Case Number: 3:2018cv01441
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FMR LLC for Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walt Disney Company. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against The Stuart O. Scott Family Trust dated September 19, 2003, and Kimberley Scott by Walt Disney Company, Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC.(McKenna, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. McKenna on behalf of Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, Walt Disney Company (McKenna, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, Walt Disney Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dori B. Hightower* *The Law Office of Dori B. Hightower, LLC* *1127 High Ridge Road, Suite # 309* *Stamford, CT 06905*. (Enderlin, M.)
September 13, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Hightower, Dori)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Kimberley Scott, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/24/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/24/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2018 Discovery due by 2/23/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2019 Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
August 24, 2018 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4946722.), filed by Kimberley Scott. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Bye, Dori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Walt Disney Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Elizabeth R. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth R. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stuart O. Scott Family Trust dated September 19, 2003, and Kimberley Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Scott
Represented By: Dori N. Bye
Represented By: Dori B. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?