Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Pension Fund et al v. Innova Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 424, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Apprentice Training Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Annuity Fund and Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Extended Benefit Fund
Defendant: Innova Global, Inc., Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company and Atlantic Specialty Ins. Co.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01454
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses by Atlantic Specialty Ins. Co..(Regan, Todd)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd R. Regan on behalf of Atlantic Specialty Ins. Co. (Regan, Todd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Apprentice Training Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Extended Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Annuity Fund, Iron Workers Local 424. Atlantic Specialty Ins. Co. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Lovejoy, Alexander)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Atlantic Specialty Ins. Co., Innova Global, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander Steven Lovejoy* *Robert M. Cheverie & Associates, P.C.* *333 East River Drive Suite 101* *East Hartford, CT 06108*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 29, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Atlantic Specialty Ins. Co., Innova Global, Inc.. (Lovejoy, Alexander)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint,, filed by Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Extended Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Annuity Fund, Iron Workers Local 424, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Apprentice Training Fund, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/29/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/28/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/28/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/27/2018 Discovery due by 2/27/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2019 Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
August 28, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Innova Global, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4949818.), filed by Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Apprentice Training Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Extended Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Annuity Fund, Iron Workers Local 424. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lovejoy, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Pension Fund et al v. Innova Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 424
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Pension Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Apprentice Training Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Iron Workers' Locals 15 and 424 Extended Benefit Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innova Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Ins. Co.
Represented By: Todd R. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?