In re: Kupersmith
Defendant: Kupersmith
Appellee: Ronald Chorches
Undetermined: US Trustee
Appellant: Corey Kupersmith
Interested Party: Karin Stern
Case Number: 3:2018cv01494
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2018 to file Brief by Corey Kupersmith. (Plotkin, Ellery)
October 22, 2018 Reset Deadline as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal. Responses due by 11/5/2018. (Gould, K.)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal Responses due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/22/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply On Consent as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal until November 5, 2018 by Corey Kupersmith. (Plotkin, Ellery)
October 18, 2018 Filing 14 USBC Transmittal Form (Anastasio, F.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 EXHIBIT (Amended Order #150) by Corey Kupersmith re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Anastasio, F.)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/17/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 EXHIBIT A by Ronald Chorches re #10 Joint MOTION for to Permit the Bankruptcy Court to Modify its Order Granting the Trustee Authority to Settle with the Estate of Mark Stern to Correct Clerical Error Order. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hellman, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for to Permit the Bankruptcy Court to Modify its Order Granting the Trustee Authority to Settle with the Estate of Mark Stern to Correct Clerical Error Order by Ronald Chorches. (Hellman, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Karin Stern.Responses due by 10/25/2018 (Harrington, Scott)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Held on 4/26/2018 before Judge Julie A Manning. Court Reporter: Christine Fiore. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court if availible. (Fanelle, N.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 9/28/2018.(Fanelle, N.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/5/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/5/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 12-52303, 16-05033 filed by Corey Kupersmith. (Attachments: #1 Order #125)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Kupersmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kupersmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ronald Chorches
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Corey Kupersmith
Represented By: Ellery E. Plotkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Karin Stern
Represented By: Scott M. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?