SIR Construction, LLC v. Falzone Development Co., LLC et al

Plaintiff: SIR Construction, LLC
Defendant: William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc., Julie Falzone, Paul Falzone, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC and Falzone Development Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01537
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Answer deadline updated for William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc. to 12/3/2018. (Lewis, D)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 3, 2018 to Respond to Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/7/2018. (Lewis, D)
November 6, 2018 Answer deadline updated for 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC to 11/15/2018; 9 Dexter Road, LLC to 11/15/2018; Paul Falzone to 11/15/2018; Julie Falzone to 11/15/2018; Falzone Development Co., LLC to 11/15/2018; William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc. to 11/15/2018. (Lewis, D)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 15, 2018 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint.. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/6/2018. (Lewis, D)
November 6, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Benjamin C. White and Benjamin J. Lehberger to Withdraw as Attorney by 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC. (White, Benjamin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 3, 2018 to Respond to Complaint by William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc.. (Burke, Liam)
November 2, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam S. Burke on behalf of William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc. (Burke, Liam)
November 1, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 15, 2018 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC. (Ingraham, Betsy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Ingraham on behalf of 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC (Ingraham, Betsy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Vermette, Jr on behalf of 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC (Vermette, Charles)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIR Construction, LLC. William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc. served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Handal, Anthony)
October 16, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adina Nechama Loewy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by SIR Construction, LLC. (Handal, Anthony)
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph Sofer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by SIR Construction, LLC. (Handal, Anthony)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Sofer on behalf of SIR Construction, LLC (Sofer, Joseph)
October 2, 2018 Answer deadline updated for 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC to 11/3/2018; 9 Dexter Road, LLC to 11/3/2018; Paul Falzone to 11/3/2018; Julie Falzone to 11/3/2018; Falzone Development Co., LLC to 11/3/2018. (Lewis, D)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 3, 2018 To Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/2/2018. (Lewis, D)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2018. (Anastasio, F.)
October 1, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/12/2018 (DeRubeis, B.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adina Nechama Loewy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by SIR Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Handal, Anthony)
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph Sofer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by SIR Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Handal, Anthony)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Lehberger on behalf of 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC (Lehberger, Benjamin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 3, 2018 To Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC. (White, Benjamin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. White on behalf of 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC (White, Benjamin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony H. Handal* *83 East Avenue* *Suite 308* *Norwalk, CT 06851*. (Anastasio, F.)
September 21, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc.. (Handal, Anthony)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Appear and #9 Motion to Appear, for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/20/2018. (Lewis, D)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC, 9 Dexter Road, LLC, Paul Falzone, Julie Falzone, Falzone Development Co., LLC, William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony H. Handal* *Handal & Morofsky* *501 Kings Highway East* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Anastasio, F.)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) ADINA NECHAMA LOEWY to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4976675) by SIR Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION)(Handal, Anthony)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) JOSEPH SOFER to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4976674) by SIR Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION)(Handal, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Julie Falzone. (Handal, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Paul Falzone. (Handal, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 9 Dexter Road, LLC. (Handal, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC. (Handal, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Falzone Development Co., LLC. (Handal, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc.. (Handal, Anthony)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Anastasio, F.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Order re: Discovery, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by SIR Construction, LLC, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/11/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/11/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/11/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2018 Discovery due by 3/13/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2019 Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 11, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4965173.), filed by SIR Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 7.1 Statement, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Handal, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIR Construction, LLC v. Falzone Development Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pitt Sothebys International Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Falzone
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Represented By: Benjamin C. White
Represented By: Charles E. Vermette, Jr.
Represented By: Betsy Ingraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Falzone
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Represented By: Benjamin C. White
Represented By: Charles E. Vermette, Jr.
Represented By: Betsy Ingraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Dexter Road, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Represented By: Benjamin C. White
Represented By: Charles E. Vermette, Jr.
Represented By: Betsy Ingraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19 Bauer Place Ext, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Represented By: Benjamin C. White
Represented By: Charles E. Vermette, Jr.
Represented By: Betsy Ingraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falzone Development Co., LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Represented By: Benjamin C. White
Represented By: Charles E. Vermette, Jr.
Represented By: Betsy Ingraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIR Construction, LLC
Represented By: Anthony H. Handal
Represented By: Joseph Sofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?