Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Admiral Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Admiral Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Gemini Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Berkley Assurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Main Street America Assurance Company, Netherlands Insurance Company and Harleysville Preferred Insurance
Case Number: 3:2018cv01568
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion extension of time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/23/2019. (Welles, T.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Employers Mutual Casualty Co.Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Noel, Ashley)
April 30, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd D. Kremin on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance dated April 30, 2019 (Kremin, Todd)
April 25, 2019 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #79 MOTION for Attorney(s) Todd D. Kremin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5249502) by Harleysville Preferred Insurance. (Sheehy, John)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Todd D. Kremin Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Attorney(s) Todd D. Kremin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5249502) by Harleysville Preferred Insurance. (Sheehy, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by John O'Neil Sheehy on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance (Sheehy, John)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. granting #76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Troy A Bataille and Michael F Lettiero terminated;. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/26/2019. (LaMura, K.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for Troy Bataille to Withdraw as Attorney by Harleysville Preferred Insurance. (Lettiero, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for Michael Lettiero to Withdraw as Attorney by Harleysville Preferred Insurance. (Lettiero, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian McDonough on behalf of Gemini Insurance Company (McDonough, Brian)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David W. Zizik terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/16/2019. (LaMura, K.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for David W Zizik to Withdraw as Attorney by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Zizik, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian P. McDonough to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5120144) by Gemini Insurance Company. (Krevolin, Andrew)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian P. McDonough. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/16/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian P. McDonough to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5120144) by Gemini Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian McDonough)(Krevolin, Andrew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Admiral Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W. R. Berkley Corporation for Admiral Insurance Company. (Ciollo, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER approving re #59 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, ( Discovery due by 7/15/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019) Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/27/2018.(LaMura, K.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gemini Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Gemini Insurance Company. (Krevolin, Andrew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkley Assurance Company. (Koosa, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Berkley Assurance Company.(Koosa, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Admiral Insurance Company.(Ciollo, Joseph)
December 14, 2018 Filing 62 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Gemini Insurance Company.(Krevolin, Andrew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company Without Prejudice by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Evans, Beth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Krevolin on behalf of Gemini Insurance Company (Krevolin, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 59 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Evans, Beth)
December 5, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Defendant Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company Without Prejudice by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Evans, Beth)
December 5, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Ciollo on behalf of Admiral Insurance Company (Corrected) (Ciollo, Joseph)
December 5, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Ciollo on behalf of Admiral Insurance Company (Ciollo, Joseph)
December 4, 2018 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State National Companies, Inc. for United Specialty Insurance Company. (Zizik, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Zizik on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company (Zizik, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Peerless Insurance Company.(Steigelfest, Jack)
November 30, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Netherlands Insurance Company.(Steigelfest, Jack)
November 28, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Netherlands Insurance Company to 11/30/2018; Peerless Insurance Company to 11/30/2018. (LaMura, K.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/28/2018. (LaMura, K.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Koosa on behalf of Berkley Assurance Company (Koosa, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Baldwin on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance (Baldwin, Andrew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Preferred Insurance. (Lettiero, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F Lettiero on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance (Lettiero, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Harleysville Preferred Insurance.(Lettiero, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 45 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/18 to file an answer or other response to the plaintiffs complaint #1 Complaint by Netherlands Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company. (Steigelfest, Jack)
November 19, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Arch Insurance Company.(Levin, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd., Other Affiliate Arch Reinsurance Company for Arch Insurance Company. (Levin, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Levin on behalf of Arch Insurance Company (Levin, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Garrett S. Flynn terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/19/2018. (Welles, T.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Employers Mutual Casualty Co.(Noel, Ashley)
November 15, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Garrett S. Flynn to Withdraw as Attorney (OTHER COUNSEL HAS APPEARED FOR CLIENT) by Employers Mutual Casualty Co. (Flynn, Garrett)
November 13, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley A. Noel on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Co (Noel, Ashley)
November 8, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Scannell on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Co (Scannell, Timothy)
November 7, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/5/2018 (LaMura, K.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/7/2018. (LaMura, K.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 5, 2018 to File Rule 26(f) Report by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Evans, Beth)
November 1, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Hassett on behalf of Main Street America Assurance Company (Hassett, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Employers Mutual Casualty Co. (Flynn, Garrett)
October 30, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Evans on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Evans, Beth)
October 30, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee H Ogburn on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Ogburn, Lee)
October 23, 2018 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Affiliate AGCs International Holding B.V. for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Reilly, Lawrence) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text(Fazekas, J.).
October 22, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company to 11/19/2018; Employers Mutual Casualty Co to 11/17/2018. (Gould, K.)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/22/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Beth P. Evans to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5016000) by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carannante, Megan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lee H. Ogburn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5015976) by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carannante, Megan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Ober, Scott)
October 18, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Main Street America Assurance Company.(Ober, Scott)
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Ober on behalf of Main Street America Assurance Company (Ober, Scott)
October 18, 2018 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/17/2018 RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Employers Mutual Casualty Co. (Flynn, Garrett)
October 18, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/19/2018 file responsive pleading by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Reilly, Lawrence)
October 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett S. Flynn on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Co (Flynn, Garrett)
October 18, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence F. Reilly on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Reilly, Lawrence)
October 16, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Harleysville Preferred Insurance to 11/17/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/16/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Continental Casualty by All Plaintiffs (Carannante, Megan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/17/2018 To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on Consent by Harleysville Preferred Insurance. (Bataille, Troy)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A Bataille on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance (Bataille, Troy)
October 11, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Continental Casualty Company to 11/19/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 10, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Netherlands Insurance Company to 11/18/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 10, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Continental Casualty Company to 11/9/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/10/2018. (LaMura, K.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to file an answer or other response to the Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Complaint by Netherlands Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company. (Steigelfest, Jack)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack G. Steigelfest on behalf of Netherlands Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company (Steigelfest, Jack)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. (Meehan, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/19/2018 responding to the complaint by Continental Casualty Company. (Meehan, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Meehan on behalf of Continental Casualty Company (Meehan, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. All Defendants. (Carannante, Megan)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Admiral Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkley Assurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Co, Gemini Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance, Main Street America Assurance Company, Netherlands Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joshua A. Hawks-Ladds* *Pullman & Comley* *90 State House Square* *Hartford, CT 06103-3702*. (Fazekas, J.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Megan Youngling Carannante on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2018. Discovery due by 3/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Youngling Carannante on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Carannante, Megan)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Hawks-Ladds, Joshua)
September 18, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Hawks-Ladds, Joshua)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4972550.), filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawks-Ladds, Joshua)
September 17, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Admiral Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: William A. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph R. Ciollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack G. Steigelfest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Co
Represented By: Ashley A. Noel
Represented By: Timothy R. Scannell
Represented By: Garrett S. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew W. Krevolin
Represented By: Brian McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: David W. Zizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Assurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Koosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence F. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: David F. Hassett
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netherlands Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack G. Steigelfest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance
Represented By: Troy A Bataille
Represented By: John O'Neil Sheehy
Represented By: Andrew L Baldwin
Represented By: Todd D. Kremin
Represented By: Michael F Lettiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Youngling Carannante
Represented By: Beth Evans
Represented By: Joshua A. Hawks-Ladds
Represented By: Lee H Ogburn
Represented By: Beth Patricia Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Youngling Carannante
Represented By: Lee H Ogburn
Represented By: Beth Evans
Represented By: Joshua A. Hawks-Ladds
Represented By: Beth Patricia Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?