Wankowicz v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Peter Wankowicz
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01609
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/1/2018 filed by Peter Wankowicz. (Ramos, Ivan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bennici, Gregory)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Peter Wankowicz, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 09/26/2018.(Peterson, M)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/25/2018. (Peterson, M)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/25/2018. (Peterson, M)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2018 Discovery due by 3/27/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2019 Signed by Clerk on 09/25/2018.(Peterson, M)
September 25, 2018 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4983355.), filed by Peter Wankowicz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wankowicz v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Wankowicz
Represented By: Ivan A. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?