USA v. Morgan
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: John A. Morgan
Case Number: 3:2018cv01647
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The motion to extend the deadline for amended pleadings (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED until March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/30/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Deadline to Amend Pleadings by USA. (Wicks, Marie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *John A. Morgan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Marie Elizabeth Wicks* *U.S. Department Of Justice Tax Div Box 55* *PO Box 550 Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044-0055*. (Fanelle, N.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 10/3/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/2/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/2/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2018 Discovery due by 4/3/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/8/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 2, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
October 2, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to John A Morgan. (Wicks, Marie)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John A Morgan, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wicks, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Wicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?